EP1039187 - Flame arresters [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2000/39] | Improvements in flame arresters | ||
[2004/44] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.02.2006 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 07.01.2009 [2009/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The BOC Group plc Chertsey Road Windlesham Surrey GU20 6HJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/39] | For all designated states The BOC Group plc Chertsey Road Windlesham Surrey GU20 6HJ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kusay, Roland Gregor Paul 14 Blackstone Hill, Redhill Surrey, RH1 6BE / GB | [2000/39] | Representative(s) | Bousfield, Roger James, et al The BOC Group plc Chertsey Road Windlesham Surrey GU20 6HJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/39] | Bousfield, Roger James, et al The BOC Group plc Chertsey Road Windlesham Surrey GU20 6HJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 00301546.8 | 28.02.2000 | [2000/39] | Priority number, date | GB19990006439 | 19.03.1999 Original published format: GB 9906439 | [2000/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1039187 | Date: | 27.09.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/39] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1039187 | Date: | 02.01.2002 | [2002/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1039187 | Date: | 20.04.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.11.2001 | Classification | IPC: | F16K3/312, F16K3/02 | [2000/39] | CPC: |
A62C4/02 (EP);
F16K3/0209 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/39] | Title | German: | Flammschutzeinrichtung | [2000/39] | English: | Flame arresters | [2004/44] | French: | Dispositif pare-flamme | [2000/39] |
Former [2000/39] | Improvements in flame arresters | Examination procedure | 31.05.2002 | Examination requested [2002/31] | 01.10.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.01.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 31.01.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.01.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 20.04.2005 | CH | 20.04.2005 | CY | 20.04.2005 | FI | 20.04.2005 | LI | 20.04.2005 | DK | 20.07.2005 | GR | 20.07.2005 | SE | 20.07.2005 | PT | 20.09.2005 | [2009/02] |
Former [2006/14] | AT | 20.04.2005 | |
CH | 20.04.2005 | ||
FI | 20.04.2005 | ||
LI | 20.04.2005 | ||
DK | 20.07.2005 | ||
GR | 20.07.2005 | ||
SE | 20.07.2005 | ||
PT | 20.09.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 20.04.2005 | |
FI | 20.04.2005 | ||
DK | 20.07.2005 | ||
SE | 20.07.2005 | ||
Former [2005/52] | FI | 20.04.2005 | |
SE | 20.07.2005 | ||
Former [2005/50] | SE | 20.07.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2402496 (RICKENBACH HUGO) [A] 1-4 * page 3, paragraph 2 * * figure . *; | [A]DE3218573 (BRANDSCHUTZ UND SERVICE VERTRI [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract ** figure - *; | [A]DE3538883 (GRONOWSKI ARTUR) [A] 1,3 * abstract * * figure - * |