EP1238088 - INSECTICIDE TARGETS AND METHODS OF USE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.06.2005 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.06.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.07.2005 [2005/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Genoptera, LLC P.O. Box 511, 170 Harbor Way South San Francisco, CA 94083-0511 / US | [2002/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EBENS, Allen, James, Jr. 1786 27th Avenue San Francisco, CA 94122 / US | 02 /
KEEGAN, Kevin, Patrick 8989 Renato Street San Diego CA 92129 / US | 03 /
STOUT, Thomas, J. 128 Galewood Circle San Francisco, CA 94131 / US | [2002/43] |
Former [2002/37] | 01 /
EBENS, Allen, James, Jr. 1786 27th Avenue San Francisco, CA 94122 / US | ||
02 /
KEEGAN, Kevin, Patrick 1408 Sayre Street San Leandro, CA 94579 / US | |||
03 /
STOUT, Thomas, J. 128 Galewood Circle San Francisco, CA 94131 / US | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/37] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00982530.8 | 07.12.2000 | [2002/37] | WO2000US33320 | Priority number, date | US19990169610P | 08.12.1999 Original published format: US 169610 P | US19990173228P | 28.12.1999 Original published format: US 173228 P | US19990173349P | 28.12.1999 Original published format: US 173349 P | [2002/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0142479 | Date: | 14.06.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/24] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1238088 | Date: | 11.09.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.06.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.12.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/61, C12N15/12, C12N15/60, C12N9/90, C07K14/435, C12N9/88, C12Q1/533, G01N33/68, C12Q1/527, A01K67/033, A01H5/00, C07K16/18, C07K16/40 | [2004/38] | CPC: |
C07K14/43581 (EP,US);
C12N9/88 (EP,US);
C12N9/90 (EP,US);
A01K2217/05 (EP,US);
A01K2217/075 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2002/37] | C12N15/61, C12N15/12, C12N15/60, C12N9/90, C07K14/435, C12N9/88, C12Q1/533, G01N33/68, C12Q1/527, A01K67/027, A01H5/00, C07K16/18, C07K16/40 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/37] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZIELE FÜR INSEKTIZIDE UND VERFAHREN ZU DEREN VERWENDUNG | [2002/37] | English: | INSECTICIDE TARGETS AND METHODS OF USE | [2002/37] | French: | CIBLES INSECTICIDES ET PROCEDES D'UTILISATION | [2002/37] | Entry into regional phase | 02.07.2002 | National basic fee paid | 02.07.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.07.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.06.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 02.07.2002 | Examination requested [2002/37] | 06.08.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.12.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/30] | 21.01.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2005/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2004 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9113167 (UNIV LELAND STANFORD JUNIOR [US]) [A] * the whole document *; | [A]WO9416071 (MASSACHUSETTS INST TECHNOLOGY [US]) [A] * the whole document *; | [A]WO9622307 (UNIV NEW YORK STATE RES FOUND [US]) [A] * the whole document *; | [PX]WO0047731 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES [JP], et al) [PX] 1,4-6,13,14,19,22,23,26* the whole document *; | [X] - ADAMS M AND VENTER J C, "Drosophila melanogaster HTG", EM_HTG, EMBL Heidelberg, Germany, (19991117), XP002170414 [X] 1,4-6,13,14,19 * abstract * | [X] - KANEMAKI M ET AL, "TIP49b, a new RuvB-like DNA helicase, is included in a complex together with another RuvB-like DNA helicase, TIP49a.", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (19990806), vol. 274, no. 32, ISSN 0021-9258, pages 22437 - 22444, XP002170411 [X] 1,4-6,13,14,19,22,23,26,27 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.274.32.22437 | [X] - GOHSHI T ET AL, "Molecular cloning of mouse p47, a second group mammalian RuvB DNA helicase-like protein: Homology with those from human and Saccharomyces cerevisiae.", JOURNAL OF BIOCHEMISTRY (TOKYO), (199905), vol. 125, no. 5, ISSN 0021-924X, pages 939 - 946, XP002170412 [X] 1,4-6,13,14,19 | [PX] - BAUER A ET AL, "Pontin52 and Reptin52 function as antagonistic regulators of beta-catenin signalling activity.", EMBO (EUROPEAN MOLECULAR BIOLOGY ORGANIZATION) JOURNAL, (20001115), vol. 19, no. 22, ISSN 0261-4189, pages 6121 - 6130, XP002170413 [PX] 1,4-6,13,14,19,22,23,26-31 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/emboj/19.22.6121 | [PX] - ADAMS M D ET AL., "CG9750 protein, rept, Drosophila melanogaster", SWALL, EMBL Heidelberg, Germany, (20000501), XP002170415 [PX] 22 * abstract * |