EP1484194 - TRANSFER METHOD AND TRANSFER SHEET [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.04.2009 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.04.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.05.2009 [2009/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sugino, Nobuo 76-6, Tokiwadai, Hodogaya-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 240-0067 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2004/50] | For all designated states Sugino, Nobuo 76-6, Tokiwadai, Hodogaya-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 240-0067 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUGINO, Nobuo 76-6, Tokiwadai, Hodogaya-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 240-0067 / JP | 02 /
SUGINO, Junko 76-6, Tokiwadai,Hodogaya-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 240-0067 / JP | [2004/50] | Representative(s) | Midgley, Jonathan Lee, et al Scott & York Intellectual Property Ltd 45 Grosvenor Road St. Albans Hertfordshire AL1 3AW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/50] | Midgley, Jonathan Lee, et al Scott & York Intellectual Property Limited 45 Grosvenor Road St. Albans, Hertfordshire AL1 3AW / GB | ||
Former [2005/49] | Midgley, Jonathan Lee, et al Marks & Clerk, 45 Grosvenor Road St. Albans, Herts AL1 3AW / GB | ||
Former [2004/50] | Chisholm, Geoffrey David Marks & Clerk 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields London WC2A 3LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 02807032.4 | 04.10.2002 | [2004/50] | WO2002JP10359 | Priority number, date | JP20020066569 | 12.03.2002 Original published format: JP 2002066569 | JP20020102529 | 04.04.2002 Original published format: JP 2002102529 | JP20020176616 | 18.06.2002 Original published format: JP 2002176616 | [2004/50] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03076209 | Date: | 18.09.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1484194 | Date: | 08.12.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.09.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 18.09.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.08.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B44C1/17, B44C1/165, B41M5/025 | [2008/36] | CPC: |
B41M5/0256 (EP,US);
B41M5/00 (KR);
B44C1/165 (EP,US);
B44C1/17 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2004/50] | B44C1/17 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/50] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TRANSFERVERFAHREN UND TRANSFERBOGEN | [2004/50] | English: | TRANSFER METHOD AND TRANSFER SHEET | [2004/50] | French: | PROCEDE DE TRANSFERT ET FEUILLE DE TRANSFERT | [2004/50] | Entry into regional phase | 12.10.2004 | Translation filed | 10.09.2004 | National basic fee paid | 10.09.2004 | Search fee paid | 10.09.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.09.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.12.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 13.09.2004 | Examination requested [2004/50] | 04.11.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/22] | 10.12.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2008 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE2109992 (NISSHA PRINTING CO.) [X] 1-10 * page 4, line 3 - page 5, line 1 ** page 5, line 34 - page 6, line 21 *; | [X]EP0858913 (HUNT EUROP LIMITED [GB]) [X] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [X]US6017636 (TADA JUNJI [JP], et al) [X] 1-10 * column 5, line 43 - column 7, line 39; figures 1a,1b,2-4 * | International search | [Y]JPH0811499 (TOMOE GIJUTSU KENKYUSHO, et al); | [A]US5555813 (HALE NATHAN [US], et al); | [A]JPH1035194 (KOOU KOGEI KK); | [Y]JPH11268493 (SHINZEN KK); | [Y]JP2000144584 (CHIISANA ROMANSU KK) |