EP1506313 - Methods of screening for modulators of the mitochondrial NAD-dependent deacetylase SIRT3 [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2005/07] | METHODS OF MODULATING MITOCHONDRIAL NAD-DEPENDENT DEACETYLASE | ||
[2010/22] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.12.2011 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Regents of the University of California 1111 Franklin Street, 12th Floor Oakland, CA 94607 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2011/04] | For all designated states The Regents of The University of California 12th Floor 1111 Franklin Street Oakland, CA 94607-5200 / US | ||
Former [2005/07] | For all designated states The Regents of the University of California 12th Floor, 1111 Franklin Street Oakland, California 94607-5200 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VERDIN, Eric J. David Gladstone Institutes, 365 Vermont Street San Francisco, CA 94103 / US | 02 /
NORTH, Brian, J. 1021 Jones Street San Francisco, CA 94109 / US | 03 /
SCHWER, Bjoern 3741 Market Street B San Francisco, CA 94131 / US | [2011/04] |
Former [2005/07] | 01 /
VERDIN, Eric c/o J. David Gladstone Institutes 365 Vermont Street San Francisco, CA 94103 / US | ||
02 /
NORTH, Brian, J. 1021 Jones Street San Francisco, CA 94109 / US | |||
03 /
SCHWER, Bjoern 3741 Market Street B San Francisco, CA 94131 / US | Representative(s) | Brasnett, Adrian Hugh, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/07] | Brasnett, Adrian Hugh, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 03736714.1 | 22.05.2003 | [2005/07] | WO2003US16499 | Priority number, date | US20020383069P | 23.05.2002 Original published format: US 383069 P | [2005/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03100089 | Date: | 04.12.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1506313 | Date: | 16.02.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.12.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1506313 | Date: | 26.01.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 04.12.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.02.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/34, C12Q1/48, C12Q1/68 | [2007/10] | CPC: |
C12Q1/48 (EP,US);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C12Q1/34 (EP,US);
G01N2500/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2005/07] | C12Q1/37 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/07] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Auswählen von Modulatoren der mitochondrialen NAD-abhängigen Deacetylase, SIRT3 | [2010/22] | English: | Methods of screening for modulators of the mitochondrial NAD-dependent deacetylase SIRT3 | [2010/22] | French: | Méthodes de sélecter de modulateurs de la deacetylase mitochondriale NAD-dépendante SIRT3. | [2010/22] |
Former [2005/07] | VERFAHREN ZUR MODULATION MITOCHONDRIALER NAD-ABHÄNGIGER DEACETYLASE | ||
Former [2005/07] | METHODS OF MODULATING MITOCHONDRIAL NAD-DEPENDENT DEACETYLASE | ||
Former [2005/07] | METHODES DE MODULATION DE LA DESACETYLASE MITOCHONDRIALE NAD-DEPENDANTE | Entry into regional phase | 13.12.2004 | National basic fee paid | 13.12.2004 | Search fee paid | 13.12.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.12.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.10.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 29.11.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.12.2004 | Examination requested [2005/07] | 25.09.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.03.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.11.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.03.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.08.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.12.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 08.12.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.10.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 26.01.2011 | BE | 26.01.2011 | CY | 26.01.2011 | CZ | 26.01.2011 | EE | 26.01.2011 | FI | 26.01.2011 | HU | 26.01.2011 | IT | 26.01.2011 | NL | 26.01.2011 | RO | 26.01.2011 | SI | 26.01.2011 | SK | 26.01.2011 | TR | 26.01.2011 | BG | 26.04.2011 | GR | 27.04.2011 | ES | 07.05.2011 | LU | 22.05.2011 | PT | 26.05.2011 | MC | 31.05.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 26.01.2011 | |
BE | 26.01.2011 | ||
CY | 26.01.2011 | ||
CZ | 26.01.2011 | ||
EE | 26.01.2011 | ||
FI | 26.01.2011 | ||
IT | 26.01.2011 | ||
NL | 26.01.2011 | ||
RO | 26.01.2011 | ||
SI | 26.01.2011 | ||
SK | 26.01.2011 | ||
TR | 26.01.2011 | ||
BG | 26.04.2011 | ||
GR | 27.04.2011 | ||
ES | 07.05.2011 | ||
LU | 22.05.2011 | ||
PT | 26.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 26.01.2011 | |
BE | 26.01.2011 | ||
CY | 26.01.2011 | ||
CZ | 26.01.2011 | ||
EE | 26.01.2011 | ||
FI | 26.01.2011 | ||
IT | 26.01.2011 | ||
NL | 26.01.2011 | ||
RO | 26.01.2011 | ||
SI | 26.01.2011 | ||
SK | 26.01.2011 | ||
BG | 26.04.2011 | ||
GR | 27.04.2011 | ||
ES | 07.05.2011 | ||
LU | 22.05.2011 | ||
PT | 26.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
Former [2012/23] | AT | 26.01.2011 | |
BE | 26.01.2011 | ||
CY | 26.01.2011 | ||
CZ | 26.01.2011 | ||
EE | 26.01.2011 | ||
FI | 26.01.2011 | ||
IT | 26.01.2011 | ||
NL | 26.01.2011 | ||
RO | 26.01.2011 | ||
SI | 26.01.2011 | ||
SK | 26.01.2011 | ||
BG | 26.04.2011 | ||
GR | 27.04.2011 | ||
ES | 07.05.2011 | ||
PT | 26.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
Former [2012/05] | AT | 26.01.2011 | |
BE | 26.01.2011 | ||
CY | 26.01.2011 | ||
CZ | 26.01.2011 | ||
EE | 26.01.2011 | ||
FI | 26.01.2011 | ||
NL | 26.01.2011 | ||
RO | 26.01.2011 | ||
SI | 26.01.2011 | ||
SK | 26.01.2011 | ||
BG | 26.04.2011 | ||
GR | 27.04.2011 | ||
ES | 07.05.2011 | ||
PT | 26.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | AT | 26.01.2011 | |
BE | 26.01.2011 | ||
CY | 26.01.2011 | ||
CZ | 26.01.2011 | ||
EE | 26.01.2011 | ||
FI | 26.01.2011 | ||
NL | 26.01.2011 | ||
RO | 26.01.2011 | ||
SI | 26.01.2011 | ||
SK | 26.01.2011 | ||
BG | 26.04.2011 | ||
GR | 27.04.2011 | ||
ES | 07.05.2011 | ||
PT | 26.05.2011 | ||
Former [2011/48] | AT | 26.01.2011 | |
BE | 26.01.2011 | ||
CY | 26.01.2011 | ||
EE | 26.01.2011 | ||
FI | 26.01.2011 | ||
NL | 26.01.2011 | ||
SI | 26.01.2011 | ||
BG | 26.04.2011 | ||
GR | 27.04.2011 | ||
ES | 07.05.2011 | ||
PT | 26.05.2011 | ||
Former [2011/39] | AT | 26.01.2011 | |
BE | 26.01.2011 | ||
CY | 26.01.2011 | ||
FI | 26.01.2011 | ||
NL | 26.01.2011 | ||
SI | 26.01.2011 | ||
BG | 26.04.2011 | ||
GR | 27.04.2011 | ||
ES | 07.05.2011 | ||
PT | 26.05.2011 | ||
Former [2011/37] | BE | 26.01.2011 | |
CY | 26.01.2011 | ||
FI | 26.01.2011 | ||
SI | 26.01.2011 | ||
BG | 26.04.2011 | ||
GR | 27.04.2011 | ||
ES | 07.05.2011 | ||
PT | 26.05.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | GR | 27.04.2011 | |
ES | 07.05.2011 | ||
PT | 26.05.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO0140506 ; | EP1243658 [ ] (CYCLEX CO LTD [JP]); | [PX]WO02102981 (UNIV COLUMBIA [US], et al) [PX] 1-13 * pages 32,34 *; | [PX]WO03004621 (ELIXIR PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US], et al) [PX] 1-13 * figure 19; claim 15 *; | [E]WO03099210 (UNIV CALIFORNIA [US], et al) [E] 1-13 * example 2; claim 1 *; | [E]WO2004055169 (ELIXIR PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US], et al) [E] 1-13 * example 2; claims 6,8,13 *; | [Y] - FRYE ROY A, "Characterization of five human cDNAs with homology to the yeast SIR2 gene: Sir-2-like proteins (Sirtuins) metabolized NAD and may have protein ADP-ribosyltransferase activity", BIOCHEMICAL AND BIOPHYSICAL RESEARCH COMMUNICATIONS, ACADEMIC PRESS INC. ORLANDO, FL, US, (1999), vol. 260, no. 1, ISSN 0006-291X, pages 273 - 279, XP002963940 [Y] 1-13 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/bbrc.1999.0897 | [Y] - GROZINGER C M ET AL, "Indentification of a Class of Small molecule Inhibitors of the Sirtuin Family of NAD-dependent Deacetylases by Phenotype Screening", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN SOCIETY OF BIOLOCHEMICAL BIOLOGISTS, BIRMINGHAM,, US, (20010801), vol. 276, no. 42, ISSN 0021-9258, pages 38837 - 38843, XP002392947 [Y] 1-13 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.M106779200 | [Y] - "Method for detecting the level of acetylation of a peptide by using peptidase activity as a marker", DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, Database accession no. 2001-374853, XP002417122 & WO0140506 A 20010607 (CYCLEX CO LTD [JP];) [Y] 1-13 * column A * | [Y] - LANDRY J ET AL, "Role of NAD+ in the deacetylase activity of the SIR2-like proteins", BIOCHEMICAL AND BIOPHYSICAL RESEARCH COMMUNICATIONS, ACADEMIC PRESS INC. ORLANDO, FL, US, (20001130), vol. 278, no. 3, ISSN 0006-291X, pages 685 - 690, XP002963942 [Y] 1-13 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/bbrc.2000.3854 | [PX] - ONYANGO PATRICK ET AL, "SIRT3, a human SIR2 homologue, is an NAD-dependent deacetylase localized to mitochondria", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, (20021015), vol. 99, no. 21, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 13653 - 13658, XP002417107 [PX] 1-13 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.222538099 | [PX] - SCHWER BJOERN ET AL, "The human silent information regulator (Sir)2 homologue hSIRT3 is a mitochondrial nicotinamide adenine dinucleotide-dependent deacetylase", JOURNAL OF CELL BIOLOGY, (20020819), vol. 158, no. 4, ISSN 0021-9525, pages 647 - 657, XP002417108 [PX] 1-13 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1083/jcb.200205057 | International search | [XP]US2002120008 (BENZER SEYMOUR [US], et al); | [XP]US2003082668 (TAMAI KATSUYUKI [JP], et al) | by applicant | - YANG, Y. H.; CHEN, Y. H.; ZHANG, C. Y.; NIMMAKAYALU, M. A.; WARD, D. C.; WEISSMAN, S., GENOMICS, (2000), vol. 69, no. 3, pages 355 - 69 | - ZEMZOUMI, K.; SERENO, D.; FRANCOIS, C.; GUILVARD, E.; LEMESRE, J. L.; OUAISSI, A., BIOL CELL, (1998), vol. 90, no. 3, pages 239 - 45 | - TISCHLER, M. E.; FRIEDRICHS, D.; COLL, K.; WILLIAMSON, J. R., ARCH BIOCHEM BIOPHYS, (1977), vol. 184, no. 1, pages 222 - 36 | - DI LISA, F.; MENABO, R.; CANTON, M.; BARILE, M.; BERNARDI, P., JBIOL CHEM, (2001), vol. 276, no. 4, pages 2571 - 5 | - DEVIN, A.; GUERIN, B.; RIGOULET, M., FEBS LETT, (1997), vol. 410, no. 2-3, pages 329 - 32 | - VINOGRADOV, A.; SCARPA, A.; CHANCE, B., ARCH BIOCHEM BIOPHYS, (1972), vol. 152, no. 2, pages 646 - 54 | - BERNARDI, P., PHYSIOL REV, (1999), vol. 79, no. 4, pages 1127 - 55 | - BERNARDI, P.; SCORRANO, L.; COLONNA, R.; PETRONILLI, V.; DI LISA, F., EUR J BIOCHEM, (1999), vol. 264, no. 3, pages 687 - 701 | - ZIEGLER, M.; JORCKE, D.; SCHWEIGER, M., BIOCHEM J, (1997), vol. 326, pages 401 - 5 | - LENAZ, G., BIOCHIM BIOPHYS ACTA, (1998), vol. 1366, no. 1-2, pages 53 - 67 | - JACKSON, M. D.; DENU, J. M., PERSONAL COMMUNICATION | - WEKSBERG, R.; TESHIMA, I.; WILLIAMS, B. R.; GREENBERG, C. R.; PUESCHEL, S. M.; CHERNOS, J. E.; FOWLOW, S. B.; HOYME, E.; ANDERSON,, HUM MOL GENET, (1993), vol. 2, no. 5, pages 549 - 56 | - HENRY, I.; BONAITI-PELLIE, C.; CHEHENSSE, V.; BELDJORD, C.; SCHWARTZ, C.; UTERMANN, G.; JUNIEN, C., NATURE, (1991), vol. 351, no. 6328, pages 665 - 7 | - FEINBERG, A. P., CURR TOP MICROBIOL IMMUNOL, (2000), vol. 249, pages 87 - 99 | - FERGUSON-SMITH, A. C.; CATTANACH, B. M.; BARTON, S. C.; BEECHEY, C. V.; SURANI, M. A., NATURE, (1991), vol. 351, no. 6328, pages 667 - 70 |