EP1481292 - BATTERY-POWERED WRISTWATCH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.03.2007 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 08.10.2008 [2008/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Line, Henry 191 Ridge Drive Carlisls, PA 17013 / US | [2004/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2004/49] | Representative(s) | Lippich, Wolfgang, et al Samson & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Widenmayerstrasse 6 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/41] | Lippich, Wolfgang, et al Samson & Partner Patentanwälte Widenmayerstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/49] | Lippich, Wolfgang, et al Samson & Partner Widenmayerstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03737607.6 | 04.02.2003 | [2004/49] | WO2003US03246 | Priority number, date | US20020068063 | 05.02.2002 Original published format: US 68063 | [2004/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03067340 | Date: | 14.08.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/33] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1481292 | Date: | 01.12.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.08.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 13.11.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G04B1/00, G04B37/00, G04C3/00, A44C5/00 | [2004/49] | CPC: |
G04C10/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/49] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BATTERIEBETRIEBENE ARMBANDUHR | [2004/49] | English: | BATTERY-POWERED WRISTWATCH | [2004/49] | French: | MONTRE-BRACELET A PILES | [2004/49] | Entry into regional phase | 30.08.2004 | National basic fee paid | 30.08.2004 | Search fee paid | 30.08.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.08.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.08.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.08.2004 | Examination requested [2004/49] | 01.09.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/17] | 10.10.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2007/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2006 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US4095412 (BURKE ROGER A); | [X]US4407590 (OHNO HIDESHI [JP], et al); | [X]US5181192 (PARATTE DANIEL [CH], et al); | [Y]US5712553 (HALLBERG BRYAN SEVERT [US]) |