EP1599671 - FUEL INJECTOR FOR AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.05.2007 Database last updated on 10.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.11.2013 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: IT | published on 04.12.2013 [2013/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Magneti Marelli Motopropulsion France SAS 9/11 rue Maurice Ravel 61200 Argentan / FR | [2006/44] |
Former [2005/48] | For all designated states Magneti Marelli Motopropulsion France SAS 19, rue Lavoisier 92000 Nanterre / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PONTOPPIDAN, Michael 19, avenue d'Epinay F-92700 Colombes / FR | [2006/06] |
Former [2005/48] | 01 /
PONTOPPIDAN, Micha[l 19, avenue d'Epinay F-92700 Colombes / FR | Representative(s) | Burbaud, Eric Cabinet Plasseraud ATTENTION : ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2005/48] | Burbaud, Eric Cabinet Plasseraud 65/67 rue de la Victoire 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 04715357.2 | 27.02.2004 | [2005/48] | WO2004FR00459 | Priority number, date | FR20030002466 | 28.02.2003 Original published format: FR 0302466 | [2005/48] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004079178 | Date: | 16.09.2004 | Language: | FR | [2004/38] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1599671 | Date: | 30.11.2005 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.09.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1599671 | Date: | 19.07.2006 | Language: | FR | [2006/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.10.2004 | Classification | IPC: | F02M61/18 | [2005/48] | CPC: |
F02M61/1826 (EP,US);
F02M61/1806 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/48] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KRAFTSTOFFEINSPRITZVENTIL FÜR BRENNKRAFTMASCHINE | [2005/48] | English: | FUEL INJECTOR FOR AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE | [2005/48] | French: | INJECTEUR DE CARBURANT POUR MOTEUR A COMBUSTION INTERNE | [2005/48] | Entry into regional phase | 25.08.2005 | National basic fee paid | 25.08.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.08.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.08.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.08.2005 | Examination requested [2005/48] | 02.01.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.04.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 24.04.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.04.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 19.07.2006 | CY | 19.07.2006 | CZ | 19.07.2006 | EE | 19.07.2006 | FI | 19.07.2006 | IE | 19.07.2006 | NL | 19.07.2006 | RO | 19.07.2006 | SI | 19.07.2006 | SK | 19.07.2006 | TR | 19.07.2006 | BG | 19.10.2006 | DK | 19.10.2006 | GR | 20.10.2006 | PT | 19.12.2006 | HU | 20.01.2007 | LU | 27.02.2007 | BE | 28.02.2007 | MC | 28.02.2007 | [2013/49] |
Former [2009/44] | AT | 19.07.2006 | |
CY | 19.07.2006 | ||
CZ | 19.07.2006 | ||
EE | 19.07.2006 | ||
FI | 19.07.2006 | ||
IE | 19.07.2006 | ||
IT | 19.07.2006 | ||
NL | 19.07.2006 | ||
RO | 19.07.2006 | ||
SI | 19.07.2006 | ||
SK | 19.07.2006 | ||
TR | 19.07.2006 | ||
BG | 19.10.2006 | ||
DK | 19.10.2006 | ||
GR | 20.10.2006 | ||
PT | 19.12.2006 | ||
HU | 20.01.2007 | ||
LU | 27.02.2007 | ||
BE | 28.02.2007 | ||
MC | 28.02.2007 | ||
Former [2009/41] | AT | 19.07.2006 | |
CY | 19.07.2006 | ||
CZ | 19.07.2006 | ||
EE | 19.07.2006 | ||
FI | 19.07.2006 | ||
IE | 19.07.2006 | ||
IT | 19.07.2006 | ||
NL | 19.07.2006 | ||
RO | 19.07.2006 | ||
SI | 19.07.2006 | ||
SK | 19.07.2006 | ||
BG | 19.10.2006 | ||
DK | 19.10.2006 | ||
GR | 20.10.2006 | ||
PT | 19.12.2006 | ||
HU | 20.01.2007 | ||
LU | 27.02.2007 | ||
BE | 28.02.2007 | ||
MC | 28.02.2007 | ||
Former [2008/38] | AT | 19.07.2006 | |
CZ | 19.07.2006 | ||
EE | 19.07.2006 | ||
FI | 19.07.2006 | ||
IE | 19.07.2006 | ||
IT | 19.07.2006 | ||
NL | 19.07.2006 | ||
RO | 19.07.2006 | ||
SI | 19.07.2006 | ||
SK | 19.07.2006 | ||
BG | 19.10.2006 | ||
DK | 19.10.2006 | ||
GR | 20.10.2006 | ||
PT | 19.12.2006 | ||
BE | 28.02.2007 | ||
MC | 28.02.2007 | ||
Former [2008/21] | AT | 19.07.2006 | |
CZ | 19.07.2006 | ||
FI | 19.07.2006 | ||
IE | 19.07.2006 | ||
IT | 19.07.2006 | ||
NL | 19.07.2006 | ||
RO | 19.07.2006 | ||
SI | 19.07.2006 | ||
SK | 19.07.2006 | ||
BG | 19.10.2006 | ||
DK | 19.10.2006 | ||
GR | 20.10.2006 | ||
PT | 19.12.2006 | ||
BE | 28.02.2007 | ||
MC | 28.02.2007 | ||
Former [2008/04] | AT | 19.07.2006 | |
CZ | 19.07.2006 | ||
FI | 19.07.2006 | ||
IE | 19.07.2006 | ||
IT | 19.07.2006 | ||
NL | 19.07.2006 | ||
RO | 19.07.2006 | ||
SI | 19.07.2006 | ||
SK | 19.07.2006 | ||
BG | 19.10.2006 | ||
DK | 19.10.2006 | ||
PT | 19.12.2006 | ||
BE | 28.02.2007 | ||
MC | 28.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/50] | AT | 19.07.2006 | |
CZ | 19.07.2006 | ||
FI | 19.07.2006 | ||
IE | 19.07.2006 | ||
IT | 19.07.2006 | ||
NL | 19.07.2006 | ||
RO | 19.07.2006 | ||
SI | 19.07.2006 | ||
SK | 19.07.2006 | ||
BG | 19.10.2006 | ||
DK | 19.10.2006 | ||
PT | 19.12.2006 | ||
MC | 28.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/43] | AT | 19.07.2006 | |
CZ | 19.07.2006 | ||
FI | 19.07.2006 | ||
IE | 19.07.2006 | ||
IT | 19.07.2006 | ||
NL | 19.07.2006 | ||
RO | 19.07.2006 | ||
SI | 19.07.2006 | ||
SK | 19.07.2006 | ||
BG | 19.10.2006 | ||
DK | 19.10.2006 | ||
PT | 19.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/27] | AT | 19.07.2006 | |
CZ | 19.07.2006 | ||
FI | 19.07.2006 | ||
IE | 19.07.2006 | ||
NL | 19.07.2006 | ||
SI | 19.07.2006 | ||
SK | 19.07.2006 | ||
BG | 19.10.2006 | ||
DK | 19.10.2006 | ||
PT | 19.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/23] | AT | 19.07.2006 | |
CZ | 19.07.2006 | ||
FI | 19.07.2006 | ||
NL | 19.07.2006 | ||
SI | 19.07.2006 | ||
BG | 19.10.2006 | ||
DK | 19.10.2006 | ||
PT | 19.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/22] | CZ | 19.07.2006 | |
FI | 19.07.2006 | ||
NL | 19.07.2006 | ||
SI | 19.07.2006 | ||
BG | 19.10.2006 | ||
DK | 19.10.2006 | ||
PT | 19.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/21] | FI | 19.07.2006 | |
NL | 19.07.2006 | ||
SI | 19.07.2006 | ||
BG | 19.10.2006 | ||
PT | 19.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/15] | FI | 19.07.2006 | |
SI | 19.07.2006 | ||
BG | 19.10.2006 | ||
PT | 19.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/03] | SI | 19.07.2006 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5540200 (NAITOH KEN [JP], et al) [A] 1-5,8,10-15 * figures 1,17,30,34,68,72 *; | [A]EP1045136 (DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG [DE]) [A] 1* paragraphs [0030] , [0031]; figures 11,12; claim 4 *; | [A]US2002000483 (SHOJI TAKESHI [JP], et al) [A] 1,2,9 * abstract *; | [A]US2002083920 (KONIG GERHARD [DE], et al) [A] 1,6-8 * paragraphs [0009] , [0032] - [0038]; figures 3-6 * |