EP1896525 - MOULDABLE MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.04.2011 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.05.2011 | Change - representative | published on 15.06.2011 [2011/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FormFormForm Ltd Unit 10 51 Derbyshire Street London E2 6JQ / GB | [2008/24] |
Former [2008/11] | For all designated states Formerol Limited Unit 10, 51 Derbyshire Street London E2 6JQ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DELEHANTY, Jane 1d Hyde Park Mansions, Chapel Street London NW1 5BN / GB | [2008/11] | Representative(s) | Nieuwenhuys, William Francis, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/24] | Nieuwenhuys, William Francis, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | ||
Former [2008/11] | Tubby, David George Marks & Clerk 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 06743997.6 | 26.05.2006 | [2008/11] | WO2006GB01926 | Priority number, date | GB20050010949 | 27.05.2005 Original published format: GB 0510949 | GB20050026179 | 22.12.2005 Original published format: GB 0526179 | [2008/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006125995 | Date: | 30.11.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1896525 | Date: | 12.03.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.11.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.11.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C08J5/18 | [2008/11] | CPC: |
C08L83/04 (EP,US);
C09J7/38 (EP,US);
A63B60/06 (EP,US);
A63B60/08 (EP,US);
A63B60/10 (EP,US);
A63B60/18 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C08L83/04, C08L83/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/11] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FORMBARES MATERIAL | [2008/11] | English: | MOULDABLE MATERIAL | [2008/11] | French: | MATERIAU MOULABLE | [2008/11] | Entry into regional phase | 21.12.2007 | National basic fee paid | 21.12.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.12.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.12.2007 | Examination requested [2008/11] | 22.05.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | 01.12.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/21] | 10.01.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2011/21] | Request for further processing for: | Loss of rights: Claims | 13.06.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 13.06.2008 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 10.07.2008 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2009 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   25.09.2009 | 31.05.2010 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JP2003010793 ; | [A]JP2003094346 ; | [A]JP2001276689 ; | [X]US3943091 (AKIYAMA TAICHIRO) [X] 1-13 * examples 1-7 *; | [A]US4418697 (TAMA FRANCINE [US]) [A] 1-13* column 1, line 59 - column 2, line 10 *; | [X]US5346940 (BRASSARD DAVID M [US], et al) [X] 1-13 * examples 1-3 *; | [A]JP2001276689 (HATANA MICHIMASA) [A] 1-13 * figures 1,3,5 *; | [A]JP2003010793 (HATANA MICHIMASA) [A] 1-13 * figures 6,10,12 *; | [A]JP2003094346 (HATANA MICHIMASA) [A] 1-13 * figures 3,5 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20030512), vol. 2003, no. 05, & JP2003010793 A 20030114 (HATANA MICHIMASA) [A] 1-13 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20030806), vol. 2003, no. 08, & JP2003094346 A 20030403 (HATANA MICHIMASA) [A] 1-13 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20020402), vol. 2002, no. 02, & JP2001276689 A 20011009 (HATANA MICHIMASA) [A] 1-13 * abstract * |