EP1946800 - Fire protection system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.06.2009 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.07.2009 [2009/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Komvoort B.V. Celsiusstraat, 8 7701 BW Dedemsvaart / NL | [2008/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kommers, Gerardus Johannes Antonius Wilhelmus Reaganlaan 9 4463 WT, Goes / NL | 02 /
Hakvoort, Marcus Bernardus Joannes Drogteropslagen 46 7705 PH, Drogteropslagen / NL | [2008/30] | Representative(s) | Metman, Karel Johannes, et al De Vries & Metman Overschiestraat 180 1062 XK Amsterdam / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2008/30] | Metman, Karel Johannes, et al De Vries & Metman Overschiestraat 180 1062 XK Amsterdam / NL | Application number, filing date | 07100864.3 | 19.01.2007 | [2008/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1946800 | Date: | 23.07.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.06.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A62C19/00, A62C35/08, F42D1/04 | [2008/30] | CPC: |
A62C19/00 (EP);
A62C37/48 (EP);
F42D1/043 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2009/14] |
Former [2008/30] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Brandschutzeinrichtung | [2008/30] | English: | Fire protection system | [2008/30] | French: | Système de protection contre le feu | [2008/30] | Examination procedure | 24.01.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/30] | 04.03.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2009/30] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2009 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DX]DE1229849 (HERMANN JENTZSCH) [DX] 1,2 * column 2, line 26 - column 3, line 11 * * figures 1,2 *; | [A]FR2722780 (BOSSIAUX JOEL [FR]) [A] 3-5 * figures 1-3 * * page 3, lines 25-29 ** page 4, lines 2-6 *; | [X]ES2229923 (OJEDA ALVAREZ ENRIQUE [ES]) [X] 1-3,7,8 * column 1, lines 4-6 * * column 2, lines 20-59 * * figure 2 * |