EP2022292 - EAR INSERT, IN PARTICULAR HEARING AID EAR INSERT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.05.2012 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.05.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.06.2012 [2012/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GEERS Hörakustik AG & Co. KG Otto-Hahn-Strasse 35 44227 Dortmund / DE | [2009/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MÜLLER, Thomas Robert-Koch-Strasse 11 47229 Duisburg / DE | [2009/07] | Representative(s) | Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Martin-Greif-Strasse 1 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/07] | Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR Martin-Greif-Strasse 1 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07725722.8 | 31.05.2007 | [2009/07] | WO2007EP04841 | Priority number, date | DE20061025718 | 01.06.2006 Original published format: DE102006025718 | [2009/07] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007137855 | Date: | 06.12.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2022292 | Date: | 11.02.2009 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.12.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.12.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H04R25/00, A61F11/08 | [2009/07] | CPC: |
H04R1/1016 (EP,US);
H04R25/656 (EP);
H04R2225/0216 (EP,US);
H04R2460/11 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/07] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | OHREINSATZ, INSBESONDERE HÖRGERÄTEOHREINSATZ | [2009/07] | English: | EAR INSERT, IN PARTICULAR HEARING AID EAR INSERT | [2009/07] | French: | ÉCOUTEUR, EN PARTICULIER ÉCOUTEUR POUR PROTHÈSES AUDITIVES | [2009/07] | Entry into regional phase | 29.09.2008 | National basic fee paid | 29.09.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.09.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.09.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.09.2008 | Examination requested [2009/07] | 01.12.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/25] | 11.01.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2012/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2011 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO0076271 (INSONUS MEDICAL INC [US]) [X] 1-21 * abstract * * claims 1-60 *; | [X]US6724902 (SHENNIB ADNAN [US], et al) [X] 1-4,14,15,17 * abstract *; | [X]US2005117765 (MEYER JOHN A [US], et al) [X] 1,2,12-14,17,21 * abstract *; | [X]US2002196958 (HALTEREN AART ZEGER VAN [NL], et al) [X] 1,2,12-14,17-21 * abstract *; | [X]GB925889 (LOUIS ULYSSE SANTI) [X] 1-4,7,8 * abstract * |