EP2094147 - DOMESTIC MACHINE PROVIDED WITH AN EXTERNAL INDICATOR DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2009/36] | INDICATING DEVICE FOR INDICATING STATUS IN A DOMESTIC MACHINE | ||
[2021/16] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.07.2022 Database last updated on 10.08.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.07.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.04.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.04.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.06.2023 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 19.07.2023 [2023/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gorenje d.d. Partizanska cesta 12 3320 Velenje / SI | [2021/34] |
Former [2015/48] | For all designated states Gorenje d.d. Partizanska cesta 12 3320 Velenje / SI | ||
Former [2009/36] | For all designated states ASKO CYLINDA AB 534 82 Vara / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STÅLFORS, Lennart Hindbyvägen 29 430 63 Hindås / SE | [2009/36] | Representative(s) | Zacco Sweden AB P.O. Box 5581 Löjtnantsgatan 21 114 85 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/34] | Zacco Sweden AB P.O. Box 5581 114 85 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2009/36] | Mossmark, Anders Lennart Albihns AB P.O. Box 142 401 22 Göteborg / SE | Application number, filing date | 07852266.1 | 14.12.2007 | [2009/36] | WO2007SE50995 | Priority number, date | SE20060002704 | 15.12.2006 Original published format: SE 0602704 | [2009/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008073049 | Date: | 19.06.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2094147 | Date: | 02.09.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.06.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2094147 | Date: | 25.08.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 19.06.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.05.2014 | Classification | IPC: | D06F34/32, D06F105/58, A47L15/42, F25D27/00, F25D29/00 | [2021/16] | CPC: |
A47L15/4293 (EP,SE,US);
A47L15/4257 (EP);
D06F34/32 (EP,SE,US);
F25D29/008 (EP);
D06F2105/58 (EP,SE,US);
F25D2400/18 (EP);
F25D27/005 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2014/23] | A47L15/42, D06F39/00, F25D29/00, F25D27/00 | ||
Former IPC [2009/36] | A47L15/42 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2021/34] |
Former [2009/36] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | HAUSHALTSMASCHINE MIT EXTERNEM ANZEIGEGERÄT | [2021/16] | English: | DOMESTIC MACHINE PROVIDED WITH AN EXTERNAL INDICATOR DEVICE | [2021/16] | French: | MACHINE DOMESTIQUE FOURNIE D'UN DISPOSITIF INDICATEUR EXTERNE | [2021/16] |
Former [2009/36] | ANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG ZUR STATUSANZEIGE BEI EINEM HAUSGERÄT | ||
Former [2009/36] | INDICATING DEVICE FOR INDICATING STATUS IN A DOMESTIC MACHINE | ||
Former [2009/36] | DISPOSITIF INDICATEUR PERMETTANT D'INDIQUER LE STATUT D'UN APPAREIL DOMESTIQUE | Entry into regional phase | 15.06.2009 | National basic fee paid | 15.06.2009 | Search fee paid | 15.06.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.06.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.06.2009 | Examination requested [2009/36] | 05.12.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.04.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.06.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.09.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.12.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.04.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.07.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 19.07.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.07.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.04.2020 | Opposition(s) | 27.05.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 26.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 22.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 30.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 28.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2015 | 09   M06   Fee paid on   25.02.2016 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.12.2007 | AT | 25.08.2021 | CY | 25.08.2021 | CZ | 25.08.2021 | DK | 25.08.2021 | EE | 25.08.2021 | ES | 25.08.2021 | FI | 25.08.2021 | LT | 25.08.2021 | LV | 25.08.2021 | MC | 25.08.2021 | NL | 25.08.2021 | RO | 25.08.2021 | SE | 25.08.2021 | SI | 25.08.2021 | SK | 25.08.2021 | BG | 25.11.2021 | GR | 26.11.2021 | GB | 14.12.2021 | IE | 14.12.2021 | LU | 14.12.2021 | IS | 25.12.2021 | PT | 27.12.2021 | BE | 31.12.2021 | CH | 31.12.2021 | FR | 31.12.2021 | LI | 31.12.2021 | [2023/29] |
Former [2023/24] | AT | 25.08.2021 | |
CY | 25.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 25.08.2021 | ||
DK | 25.08.2021 | ||
EE | 25.08.2021 | ||
ES | 25.08.2021 | ||
FI | 25.08.2021 | ||
LT | 25.08.2021 | ||
LV | 25.08.2021 | ||
MC | 25.08.2021 | ||
NL | 25.08.2021 | ||
RO | 25.08.2021 | ||
SE | 25.08.2021 | ||
SI | 25.08.2021 | ||
SK | 25.08.2021 | ||
BG | 25.11.2021 | ||
GR | 26.11.2021 | ||
GB | 14.12.2021 | ||
IE | 14.12.2021 | ||
LU | 14.12.2021 | ||
IS | 25.12.2021 | ||
PT | 27.12.2021 | ||
BE | 31.12.2021 | ||
CH | 31.12.2021 | ||
FR | 31.12.2021 | ||
LI | 31.12.2021 | ||
Former [2023/03] | AT | 25.08.2021 | |
CZ | 25.08.2021 | ||
DK | 25.08.2021 | ||
EE | 25.08.2021 | ||
ES | 25.08.2021 | ||
FI | 25.08.2021 | ||
LT | 25.08.2021 | ||
LV | 25.08.2021 | ||
MC | 25.08.2021 | ||
NL | 25.08.2021 | ||
RO | 25.08.2021 | ||
SE | 25.08.2021 | ||
SI | 25.08.2021 | ||
SK | 25.08.2021 | ||
BG | 25.11.2021 | ||
GR | 26.11.2021 | ||
GB | 14.12.2021 | ||
IE | 14.12.2021 | ||
LU | 14.12.2021 | ||
IS | 25.12.2021 | ||
PT | 27.12.2021 | ||
BE | 31.12.2021 | ||
CH | 31.12.2021 | ||
FR | 31.12.2021 | ||
LI | 31.12.2021 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AT | 25.08.2021 | |
CZ | 25.08.2021 | ||
DK | 25.08.2021 | ||
EE | 25.08.2021 | ||
ES | 25.08.2021 | ||
FI | 25.08.2021 | ||
LT | 25.08.2021 | ||
LV | 25.08.2021 | ||
MC | 25.08.2021 | ||
NL | 25.08.2021 | ||
RO | 25.08.2021 | ||
SE | 25.08.2021 | ||
SI | 25.08.2021 | ||
SK | 25.08.2021 | ||
BG | 25.11.2021 | ||
GR | 26.11.2021 | ||
GB | 14.12.2021 | ||
IE | 14.12.2021 | ||
LU | 14.12.2021 | ||
IS | 25.12.2021 | ||
PT | 27.12.2021 | ||
BE | 31.12.2021 | ||
FR | 31.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/48] | AT | 25.08.2021 | |
CZ | 25.08.2021 | ||
DK | 25.08.2021 | ||
EE | 25.08.2021 | ||
ES | 25.08.2021 | ||
FI | 25.08.2021 | ||
LT | 25.08.2021 | ||
LV | 25.08.2021 | ||
MC | 25.08.2021 | ||
NL | 25.08.2021 | ||
RO | 25.08.2021 | ||
SE | 25.08.2021 | ||
SI | 25.08.2021 | ||
SK | 25.08.2021 | ||
BG | 25.11.2021 | ||
GR | 26.11.2021 | ||
GB | 14.12.2021 | ||
IE | 14.12.2021 | ||
LU | 14.12.2021 | ||
IS | 25.12.2021 | ||
PT | 27.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AT | 25.08.2021 | |
CZ | 25.08.2021 | ||
DK | 25.08.2021 | ||
EE | 25.08.2021 | ||
ES | 25.08.2021 | ||
FI | 25.08.2021 | ||
LT | 25.08.2021 | ||
LV | 25.08.2021 | ||
MC | 25.08.2021 | ||
NL | 25.08.2021 | ||
RO | 25.08.2021 | ||
SE | 25.08.2021 | ||
SI | 25.08.2021 | ||
SK | 25.08.2021 | ||
BG | 25.11.2021 | ||
GR | 26.11.2021 | ||
GB | 14.12.2021 | ||
LU | 14.12.2021 | ||
IS | 25.12.2021 | ||
PT | 27.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/46] | AT | 25.08.2021 | |
CZ | 25.08.2021 | ||
DK | 25.08.2021 | ||
EE | 25.08.2021 | ||
ES | 25.08.2021 | ||
FI | 25.08.2021 | ||
LT | 25.08.2021 | ||
LV | 25.08.2021 | ||
MC | 25.08.2021 | ||
NL | 25.08.2021 | ||
RO | 25.08.2021 | ||
SE | 25.08.2021 | ||
SI | 25.08.2021 | ||
SK | 25.08.2021 | ||
BG | 25.11.2021 | ||
GR | 26.11.2021 | ||
LU | 14.12.2021 | ||
IS | 25.12.2021 | ||
PT | 27.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AT | 25.08.2021 | |
CZ | 25.08.2021 | ||
DK | 25.08.2021 | ||
EE | 25.08.2021 | ||
ES | 25.08.2021 | ||
FI | 25.08.2021 | ||
LT | 25.08.2021 | ||
LV | 25.08.2021 | ||
MC | 25.08.2021 | ||
NL | 25.08.2021 | ||
RO | 25.08.2021 | ||
SE | 25.08.2021 | ||
SI | 25.08.2021 | ||
SK | 25.08.2021 | ||
BG | 25.11.2021 | ||
GR | 26.11.2021 | ||
IS | 25.12.2021 | ||
PT | 27.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/33] | AT | 25.08.2021 | |
CZ | 25.08.2021 | ||
DK | 25.08.2021 | ||
EE | 25.08.2021 | ||
ES | 25.08.2021 | ||
FI | 25.08.2021 | ||
LT | 25.08.2021 | ||
LV | 25.08.2021 | ||
MC | 25.08.2021 | ||
NL | 25.08.2021 | ||
RO | 25.08.2021 | ||
SE | 25.08.2021 | ||
SK | 25.08.2021 | ||
BG | 25.11.2021 | ||
GR | 26.11.2021 | ||
IS | 25.12.2021 | ||
PT | 27.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/24] | AT | 25.08.2021 | |
CZ | 25.08.2021 | ||
DK | 25.08.2021 | ||
EE | 25.08.2021 | ||
ES | 25.08.2021 | ||
FI | 25.08.2021 | ||
LT | 25.08.2021 | ||
LV | 25.08.2021 | ||
NL | 25.08.2021 | ||
RO | 25.08.2021 | ||
SE | 25.08.2021 | ||
SK | 25.08.2021 | ||
BG | 25.11.2021 | ||
GR | 26.11.2021 | ||
IS | 25.12.2021 | ||
PT | 27.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 25.08.2021 | |
DK | 25.08.2021 | ||
ES | 25.08.2021 | ||
FI | 25.08.2021 | ||
LT | 25.08.2021 | ||
LV | 25.08.2021 | ||
NL | 25.08.2021 | ||
SE | 25.08.2021 | ||
BG | 25.11.2021 | ||
GR | 26.11.2021 | ||
IS | 25.12.2021 | ||
PT | 27.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/16] | AT | 25.08.2021 | |
ES | 25.08.2021 | ||
FI | 25.08.2021 | ||
LT | 25.08.2021 | ||
LV | 25.08.2021 | ||
NL | 25.08.2021 | ||
SE | 25.08.2021 | ||
BG | 25.11.2021 | ||
GR | 26.11.2021 | ||
IS | 25.12.2021 | ||
PT | 27.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/11] | AT | 25.08.2021 | |
ES | 25.08.2021 | ||
FI | 25.08.2021 | ||
LT | 25.08.2021 | ||
LV | 25.08.2021 | ||
SE | 25.08.2021 | ||
BG | 25.11.2021 | ||
GR | 26.11.2021 | ||
IS | 25.12.2021 | ||
PT | 27.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AT | 25.08.2021 | |
ES | 25.08.2021 | ||
FI | 25.08.2021 | ||
LT | 25.08.2021 | ||
SE | 25.08.2021 | ||
BG | 25.11.2021 | ||
PT | 27.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AT | 25.08.2021 | |
ES | 25.08.2021 | ||
FI | 25.08.2021 | ||
LT | 25.08.2021 | ||
SE | 25.08.2021 | ||
BG | 25.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AT | 25.08.2021 | |
LT | 25.08.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3520272 (BOSCH SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE [DE]); | [XA]EP1421893 (ELECTROLUX HOME PROD CORP [BE]); | [A]EP1702551 (V ZUG AG [CH]) | International search | [A]GB2256580 (ZANUSSI ELETTRODOMESTICI [IT]); | [A]DE10259763 (BSH BOSCH SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE [DE]); | [A]EP1532917 (ELECTROLUX HOME PROD CORP [BE]); | [A]US2006232997 (ROSENBAUER MICHAEL [DE], et al) |