EP2176747 - UNIFIED PROVISIONING OF PHYSICAL AND VIRTUAL DISK IMAGES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2010/16] | UNIFIED PROVISIONING OF PHYSICAL AND VIRTUAL IMAGES | ||
[2017/25] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.09.2018 Database last updated on 10.08.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 13.10.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052 / US | [2015/12] |
Former [2010/16] | For all designated states Microsoft Corporation One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052-6399 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FRIES, Robert M c/o Microsoft Corporation One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 02 /
SCHAEFER, Stuart c/o Microsoft Corporation One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | [2017/46] |
Former [2010/16] | 01 /
FRIES, Robert M c/o Microsoft Corporation One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | ||
02 /
SCHAEFER, Stuart c/o Microsoft Corporation One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2017/46] |
Former [2010/16] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08770879.8 | 12.06.2008 | [2010/16] | WO2008US66763 | Priority number, date | US20070771371 | 29.06.2007 Original published format: US 771371 | [2010/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009005996 | Date: | 08.01.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2176747 | Date: | 21.04.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.01.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2176747 | Date: | 15.11.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 08.01.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.04.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/455, G06F9/44, G06F9/445 | [2017/25] | CPC: |
G06F8/63 (EP,BR,US);
G06F9/445 (BR);
G06F9/4416 (EP,BR,US);
G06F9/45558 (EP,BR,US);
G06F2009/4557 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2013/18] | G06F9/445, G06F9/455 | ||
Former IPC [2010/16] | G06F9/445 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/46] |
Former [2010/16] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | BEREITSTELLUNG VON PHYSISCHEN UND VIRTUELLEN DISK-IMAGES | [2017/25] | English: | UNIFIED PROVISIONING OF PHYSICAL AND VIRTUAL DISK IMAGES | [2017/25] | French: | APPROVISIONNEMENT UNIFIÉ D'IMAGES DE DISQUE PHYSIQUES ET VIRTUELLES | [2017/25] |
Former [2010/16] | VEREINIGTE BEREITSTELLUNG VON PHYSISCHEN UND VIRTUELLEN BILDERN | ||
Former [2010/16] | UNIFIED PROVISIONING OF PHYSICAL AND VIRTUAL IMAGES | ||
Former [2010/16] | APPROVISIONNEMENT UNIFIÉ D'IMAGES PHYSIQUES ET VIRTUELLES | Entry into regional phase | 25.01.2010 | National basic fee paid | 25.01.2010 | Search fee paid | 25.01.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.01.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.01.2010 | Examination requested [2010/16] | 22.10.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.09.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.11.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.06.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.09.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 28.09.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.09.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.09.2014 | Opposition(s) | 17.08.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 06.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 05.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 16.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 12.06.2008 | AT | 15.11.2017 | CY | 15.11.2017 | CZ | 15.11.2017 | DK | 15.11.2017 | EE | 15.11.2017 | ES | 15.11.2017 | FI | 15.11.2017 | HR | 15.11.2017 | IT | 15.11.2017 | LT | 15.11.2017 | LV | 15.11.2017 | MC | 15.11.2017 | PL | 15.11.2017 | PT | 15.11.2017 | RO | 15.11.2017 | SE | 15.11.2017 | SI | 15.11.2017 | SK | 15.11.2017 | TR | 15.11.2017 | BG | 15.02.2018 | NO | 15.02.2018 | GR | 16.02.2018 | IS | 15.03.2018 | IE | 12.06.2018 | LU | 12.06.2018 | MT | 12.06.2018 | BE | 30.06.2018 | CH | 30.06.2018 | LI | 30.06.2018 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/27] | HU | 12.06.2008 | |
AT | 15.11.2017 | ||
CY | 15.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 15.11.2017 | ||
DK | 15.11.2017 | ||
EE | 15.11.2017 | ||
ES | 15.11.2017 | ||
FI | 15.11.2017 | ||
HR | 15.11.2017 | ||
IT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LV | 15.11.2017 | ||
MC | 15.11.2017 | ||
PL | 15.11.2017 | ||
PT | 15.11.2017 | ||
RO | 15.11.2017 | ||
SE | 15.11.2017 | ||
SI | 15.11.2017 | ||
SK | 15.11.2017 | ||
TR | 15.11.2017 | ||
BG | 15.02.2018 | ||
NO | 15.02.2018 | ||
GR | 16.02.2018 | ||
IE | 12.06.2018 | ||
LU | 12.06.2018 | ||
MT | 12.06.2018 | ||
BE | 30.06.2018 | ||
CH | 30.06.2018 | ||
LI | 30.06.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 15.11.2017 | |
CY | 15.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 15.11.2017 | ||
DK | 15.11.2017 | ||
EE | 15.11.2017 | ||
ES | 15.11.2017 | ||
FI | 15.11.2017 | ||
HR | 15.11.2017 | ||
IT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LV | 15.11.2017 | ||
MC | 15.11.2017 | ||
PL | 15.11.2017 | ||
RO | 15.11.2017 | ||
SE | 15.11.2017 | ||
SI | 15.11.2017 | ||
SK | 15.11.2017 | ||
TR | 15.11.2017 | ||
BG | 15.02.2018 | ||
NO | 15.02.2018 | ||
GR | 16.02.2018 | ||
IE | 12.06.2018 | ||
LU | 12.06.2018 | ||
MT | 12.06.2018 | ||
BE | 30.06.2018 | ||
CH | 30.06.2018 | ||
LI | 30.06.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AT | 15.11.2017 | |
CY | 15.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 15.11.2017 | ||
DK | 15.11.2017 | ||
EE | 15.11.2017 | ||
ES | 15.11.2017 | ||
FI | 15.11.2017 | ||
HR | 15.11.2017 | ||
IT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LV | 15.11.2017 | ||
MC | 15.11.2017 | ||
PL | 15.11.2017 | ||
RO | 15.11.2017 | ||
SE | 15.11.2017 | ||
SI | 15.11.2017 | ||
SK | 15.11.2017 | ||
BG | 15.02.2018 | ||
NO | 15.02.2018 | ||
GR | 16.02.2018 | ||
IE | 12.06.2018 | ||
LU | 12.06.2018 | ||
MT | 12.06.2018 | ||
BE | 30.06.2018 | ||
CH | 30.06.2018 | ||
LI | 30.06.2018 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AT | 15.11.2017 | |
CY | 15.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 15.11.2017 | ||
DK | 15.11.2017 | ||
EE | 15.11.2017 | ||
ES | 15.11.2017 | ||
FI | 15.11.2017 | ||
HR | 15.11.2017 | ||
IT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LV | 15.11.2017 | ||
MC | 15.11.2017 | ||
PL | 15.11.2017 | ||
RO | 15.11.2017 | ||
SE | 15.11.2017 | ||
SI | 15.11.2017 | ||
SK | 15.11.2017 | ||
BG | 15.02.2018 | ||
NO | 15.02.2018 | ||
GR | 16.02.2018 | ||
IE | 12.06.2018 | ||
LU | 12.06.2018 | ||
BE | 30.06.2018 | ||
CH | 30.06.2018 | ||
LI | 30.06.2018 | ||
Former [2019/21] | AT | 15.11.2017 | |
CY | 15.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 15.11.2017 | ||
DK | 15.11.2017 | ||
EE | 15.11.2017 | ||
ES | 15.11.2017 | ||
FI | 15.11.2017 | ||
HR | 15.11.2017 | ||
IT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LV | 15.11.2017 | ||
MC | 15.11.2017 | ||
PL | 15.11.2017 | ||
RO | 15.11.2017 | ||
SE | 15.11.2017 | ||
SI | 15.11.2017 | ||
SK | 15.11.2017 | ||
BG | 15.02.2018 | ||
NO | 15.02.2018 | ||
GR | 16.02.2018 | ||
IE | 12.06.2018 | ||
LU | 12.06.2018 | ||
CH | 30.06.2018 | ||
LI | 30.06.2018 | ||
Former [2019/19] | AT | 15.11.2017 | |
CY | 15.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 15.11.2017 | ||
DK | 15.11.2017 | ||
EE | 15.11.2017 | ||
ES | 15.11.2017 | ||
FI | 15.11.2017 | ||
HR | 15.11.2017 | ||
IT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LV | 15.11.2017 | ||
MC | 15.11.2017 | ||
PL | 15.11.2017 | ||
RO | 15.11.2017 | ||
SE | 15.11.2017 | ||
SI | 15.11.2017 | ||
SK | 15.11.2017 | ||
BG | 15.02.2018 | ||
NO | 15.02.2018 | ||
GR | 16.02.2018 | ||
IE | 12.06.2018 | ||
LU | 12.06.2018 | ||
Former [2019/17] | AT | 15.11.2017 | |
CY | 15.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 15.11.2017 | ||
DK | 15.11.2017 | ||
EE | 15.11.2017 | ||
ES | 15.11.2017 | ||
FI | 15.11.2017 | ||
HR | 15.11.2017 | ||
IT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LV | 15.11.2017 | ||
MC | 15.11.2017 | ||
PL | 15.11.2017 | ||
RO | 15.11.2017 | ||
SE | 15.11.2017 | ||
SI | 15.11.2017 | ||
SK | 15.11.2017 | ||
BG | 15.02.2018 | ||
NO | 15.02.2018 | ||
GR | 16.02.2018 | ||
LU | 12.06.2018 | ||
Former [2019/15] | AT | 15.11.2017 | |
CY | 15.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 15.11.2017 | ||
DK | 15.11.2017 | ||
EE | 15.11.2017 | ||
ES | 15.11.2017 | ||
FI | 15.11.2017 | ||
HR | 15.11.2017 | ||
IT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LV | 15.11.2017 | ||
MC | 15.11.2017 | ||
PL | 15.11.2017 | ||
RO | 15.11.2017 | ||
SE | 15.11.2017 | ||
SI | 15.11.2017 | ||
SK | 15.11.2017 | ||
BG | 15.02.2018 | ||
NO | 15.02.2018 | ||
GR | 16.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 15.11.2017 | |
CY | 15.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 15.11.2017 | ||
DK | 15.11.2017 | ||
EE | 15.11.2017 | ||
ES | 15.11.2017 | ||
FI | 15.11.2017 | ||
HR | 15.11.2017 | ||
IT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LV | 15.11.2017 | ||
PL | 15.11.2017 | ||
RO | 15.11.2017 | ||
SE | 15.11.2017 | ||
SI | 15.11.2017 | ||
SK | 15.11.2017 | ||
BG | 15.02.2018 | ||
NO | 15.02.2018 | ||
GR | 16.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/41] | AT | 15.11.2017 | |
CY | 15.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 15.11.2017 | ||
DK | 15.11.2017 | ||
EE | 15.11.2017 | ||
ES | 15.11.2017 | ||
FI | 15.11.2017 | ||
HR | 15.11.2017 | ||
IT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LV | 15.11.2017 | ||
PL | 15.11.2017 | ||
RO | 15.11.2017 | ||
SE | 15.11.2017 | ||
SK | 15.11.2017 | ||
BG | 15.02.2018 | ||
NO | 15.02.2018 | ||
GR | 16.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 15.11.2017 | |
CY | 15.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 15.11.2017 | ||
DK | 15.11.2017 | ||
EE | 15.11.2017 | ||
ES | 15.11.2017 | ||
FI | 15.11.2017 | ||
HR | 15.11.2017 | ||
IT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LV | 15.11.2017 | ||
PL | 15.11.2017 | ||
SE | 15.11.2017 | ||
SK | 15.11.2017 | ||
BG | 15.02.2018 | ||
NO | 15.02.2018 | ||
GR | 16.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | AT | 15.11.2017 | |
CY | 15.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 15.11.2017 | ||
DK | 15.11.2017 | ||
EE | 15.11.2017 | ||
ES | 15.11.2017 | ||
FI | 15.11.2017 | ||
HR | 15.11.2017 | ||
LT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LV | 15.11.2017 | ||
PL | 15.11.2017 | ||
SE | 15.11.2017 | ||
SK | 15.11.2017 | ||
BG | 15.02.2018 | ||
NO | 15.02.2018 | ||
GR | 16.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | AT | 15.11.2017 | |
CY | 15.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 15.11.2017 | ||
DK | 15.11.2017 | ||
EE | 15.11.2017 | ||
ES | 15.11.2017 | ||
FI | 15.11.2017 | ||
HR | 15.11.2017 | ||
LT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LV | 15.11.2017 | ||
SE | 15.11.2017 | ||
SK | 15.11.2017 | ||
BG | 15.02.2018 | ||
NO | 15.02.2018 | ||
GR | 16.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/24] | AT | 15.11.2017 | |
ES | 15.11.2017 | ||
FI | 15.11.2017 | ||
HR | 15.11.2017 | ||
LT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LV | 15.11.2017 | ||
SE | 15.11.2017 | ||
BG | 15.02.2018 | ||
NO | 15.02.2018 | ||
GR | 16.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 15.11.2017 | |
ES | 15.11.2017 | ||
FI | 15.11.2017 | ||
HR | 15.11.2017 | ||
LT | 15.11.2017 | ||
SE | 15.11.2017 | ||
NO | 15.02.2018 | ||
GR | 16.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/22] | ES | 15.11.2017 | |
FI | 15.11.2017 | ||
LT | 15.11.2017 | ||
NO | 15.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/21] | FI | 15.11.2017 | |
LT | 15.11.2017 | ||
NO | 15.02.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US6804774 (LARVOIRE JEAN-FRANCOIS [FR], et al) [X] 1-4,8-13 * abstract * * column 1, line 1 - line 11 * * column 1, line 63 - column 2, line 38 * * column 3, line 32 - column 7, line 45 * * figures 1-4; claims 1-22 * [I] 5-7,14,15; | [I]GB2423168 (DELL PRODUCTS LP [US]) [I] 5-7,14,15 * abstract * * page 1, line 1 - page 7, line l *; | [IP]US2007214350 (ISAACSON SCOTT A [US]) [IP] 5-7,14,15 * abstract ** paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0012] * | International search | [A]US6715031 (CAMBLE PETER THOMAS [GB], et al); | [A]US6857069 (RISSMEYER CHARLES STEVEN [US], et al); | [A]US2005138346 (CAUTHRON DAVID M [US]); | [A]US2005228903 (LERNER DAVID M [US], et al); | [A]US7127602 (BAKKE MARK [US], et al); | [XP]US2008028034 (CURRID ANDREW [US], et al); | [E]US2008209196 (HERNANDEZ CAROL B [US], et al) | by applicant | US6804774 |