EP2235240 - FIBRE BLENDS, YARNS AND FABRICS MADE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.12.2012 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lenzing AG Werkstrasse 2 4860 Lenzing / AT | [2010/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WENINGER, Friedrich Hochkreuzstrasse 13 A-5310 Mondsee / AT | 02 /
EICHINGER, Dieter Übersbach 208 A-8280 Fürstenfeld / AT | 03 /
FEILMAIR, Whilhelm Lacherwiese 30 A-4863 Seewalchen / AT | 04 /
LEITNER, Johann Haidbinderweg 10 A-4053 Haid / AT | 05 /
KÄMPF, Karin Teichterberg 5 A-4906 Eberschwang / AT | [2010/40] | Representative(s) | Hanemann, Otto Lenzing AG Werkstrasse 2 A-4860 Lenzing / AT | [2012/06] |
Former [2010/40] | Hanemann, Otto Lenzing AG Werkstrasse 2 A-4860 Lenzing / AT | Application number, filing date | 08870847.4 | 22.12.2008 | [2010/40] | WO2008AT00468 | Priority number, date | AT20080000064 | 16.01.2008 Original published format: AT 642008 | [2010/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009089556 | Date: | 23.07.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2235240 | Date: | 06.10.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.07.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2235240 | Date: | 08.02.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.07.2009 | Classification | IPC: | D01F2/00, D01F2/06 | [2010/40] | CPC: |
D01F11/02 (EP,US);
D02G3/04 (EP,KR,US);
D01F8/02 (KR);
D03D15/208 (KR);
D03D15/47 (KR);
D04B1/14 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/40] | Title | German: | FASERMISCHUNGEN SOWIE GARNE UND STOFFE DARAUS | [2010/40] | English: | FIBRE BLENDS, YARNS AND FABRICS MADE THEREOF | [2010/40] | French: | MÉLANGES DE FIBRES, FILS ET TISSUS FAITS À PARTIR DE CES MÉLANGES | [2010/40] | Entry into regional phase | 16.08.2010 | National basic fee paid | 16.08.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.08.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.08.2010 | Examination requested [2010/40] | 27.09.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.08.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.11.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 10.11.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.08.2011 | Opposition(s) | 09.11.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.12.2008 | BE | 08.02.2012 | CY | 08.02.2012 | CZ | 08.02.2012 | DK | 08.02.2012 | EE | 08.02.2012 | HR | 08.02.2012 | LT | 08.02.2012 | LV | 08.02.2012 | MT | 08.02.2012 | NL | 08.02.2012 | PL | 08.02.2012 | RO | 08.02.2012 | SE | 08.02.2012 | SI | 08.02.2012 | SK | 08.02.2012 | BG | 08.05.2012 | NO | 08.05.2012 | IS | 08.06.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2013/51] | BE | 08.02.2012 | |
CY | 08.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 08.02.2012 | ||
DK | 08.02.2012 | ||
EE | 08.02.2012 | ||
HR | 08.02.2012 | ||
LT | 08.02.2012 | ||
LV | 08.02.2012 | ||
MT | 08.02.2012 | ||
NL | 08.02.2012 | ||
PL | 08.02.2012 | ||
RO | 08.02.2012 | ||
SE | 08.02.2012 | ||
SI | 08.02.2012 | ||
SK | 08.02.2012 | ||
BG | 08.05.2012 | ||
NO | 08.05.2012 | ||
IS | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | BE | 08.02.2012 | |
CY | 08.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 08.02.2012 | ||
DK | 08.02.2012 | ||
EE | 08.02.2012 | ||
HR | 08.02.2012 | ||
LT | 08.02.2012 | ||
LV | 08.02.2012 | ||
NL | 08.02.2012 | ||
PL | 08.02.2012 | ||
RO | 08.02.2012 | ||
SE | 08.02.2012 | ||
SI | 08.02.2012 | ||
SK | 08.02.2012 | ||
BG | 08.05.2012 | ||
NO | 08.05.2012 | ||
IS | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | BE | 08.02.2012 | |
CY | 08.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 08.02.2012 | ||
DK | 08.02.2012 | ||
EE | 08.02.2012 | ||
HR | 08.02.2012 | ||
LT | 08.02.2012 | ||
LV | 08.02.2012 | ||
NL | 08.02.2012 | ||
PL | 08.02.2012 | ||
RO | 08.02.2012 | ||
SE | 08.02.2012 | ||
SI | 08.02.2012 | ||
SK | 08.02.2012 | ||
NO | 08.05.2012 | ||
IS | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | BE | 08.02.2012 | |
CY | 08.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 08.02.2012 | ||
DK | 08.02.2012 | ||
EE | 08.02.2012 | ||
HR | 08.02.2012 | ||
LT | 08.02.2012 | ||
LV | 08.02.2012 | ||
NL | 08.02.2012 | ||
PL | 08.02.2012 | ||
RO | 08.02.2012 | ||
SE | 08.02.2012 | ||
SI | 08.02.2012 | ||
NO | 08.05.2012 | ||
IS | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | BE | 08.02.2012 | |
CY | 08.02.2012 | ||
EE | 08.02.2012 | ||
HR | 08.02.2012 | ||
LT | 08.02.2012 | ||
LV | 08.02.2012 | ||
NL | 08.02.2012 | ||
PL | 08.02.2012 | ||
SE | 08.02.2012 | ||
NO | 08.05.2012 | ||
IS | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/41] | BE | 08.02.2012 | |
CY | 08.02.2012 | ||
HR | 08.02.2012 | ||
LT | 08.02.2012 | ||
LV | 08.02.2012 | ||
NL | 08.02.2012 | ||
PL | 08.02.2012 | ||
NO | 08.05.2012 | ||
IS | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/39] | BE | 08.02.2012 | |
HR | 08.02.2012 | ||
LT | 08.02.2012 | ||
LV | 08.02.2012 | ||
NL | 08.02.2012 | ||
PL | 08.02.2012 | ||
NO | 08.05.2012 | ||
IS | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | BE | 08.02.2012 | |
HR | 08.02.2012 | ||
LT | 08.02.2012 | ||
NL | 08.02.2012 | ||
PL | 08.02.2012 | ||
NO | 08.05.2012 | ||
IS | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | HR | 08.02.2012 | |
LT | 08.02.2012 | ||
NL | 08.02.2012 | ||
NO | 08.05.2012 | ||
IS | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | LT | 08.02.2012 | |
NL | 08.02.2012 | ||
NO | 08.05.2012 | ||
IS | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | LT | 08.02.2012 | |
NO | 08.05.2012 | ||
IS | 08.06.2012 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9736028 (AKZO NOBEL NV [NL], et al) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [A]WO9919555 (CHEMIEFASER LENZING AG [AT], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2004088010 (ZIMMER AG [DE], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2007128268 (THUERINGISCHES INST TEXTIL [DE], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | by applicant | US3539678 | WO9409191 | WO9919555 | WO03029329 | WO2006108861 |