EP2302534 - Method for mass-deleting data records of a database system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.10.2018 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.11.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Software AG Uhlandstrasse 12 64297 Darmstadt / DE | [2011/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schmidt, Andreas Am Brunnenberg 1 63762, Großostheim / DE | 02 /
Schöning, Harald Theobaldstr. 36 64807, Dieburg / DE | [2017/50] |
Former [2011/13] | 01 /
Schmidt, Andreas Am Brunnenberg 1 63762, Großostheim / DE | ||
02 /
Schöning, Harald Theobaldstr. 36 64807, Dieburg / DE | Representative(s) | Wegner, Hans Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | [2017/50] |
Former [2011/13] | Wegner, Hans Bardehle Pagenberg Galileiplatz 1 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09170678.8 | 18.09.2009 | [2011/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2302534 | Date: | 30.03.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2302534 | Date: | 13.12.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.02.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/30 | [2011/13] | CPC: |
G06F16/217 (EP,US);
G06F16/2358 (EP,US);
G06F16/2365 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/50] |
Former [2011/13] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Massenlöschen von Dateneinträgen eines Datenbanksystems | [2011/13] | English: | Method for mass-deleting data records of a database system | [2011/13] | French: | Procédé pour effacer massivement des registres de données dans un système de base de données | [2011/13] | Examination procedure | 18.09.2009 | Examination requested [2011/13] | 30.09.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.01.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.07.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.08.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.04.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 12.06.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.12.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.06.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.11.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 12.01.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.06.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.11.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 02.11.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.11.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.01.2012 | Opposition(s) | 14.09.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/47] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 12.06.2013 | Request for further processing filed | 12.06.2013 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 03.07.2013 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.09.2009 | AT | 13.12.2017 | CY | 13.12.2017 | CZ | 13.12.2017 | DK | 13.12.2017 | EE | 13.12.2017 | ES | 13.12.2017 | FI | 13.12.2017 | HR | 13.12.2017 | IT | 13.12.2017 | LT | 13.12.2017 | LV | 13.12.2017 | MC | 13.12.2017 | MK | 13.12.2017 | NL | 13.12.2017 | PL | 13.12.2017 | PT | 13.12.2017 | RO | 13.12.2017 | SE | 13.12.2017 | SI | 13.12.2017 | SK | 13.12.2017 | SM | 13.12.2017 | TR | 13.12.2017 | BG | 13.03.2018 | NO | 13.03.2018 | GR | 14.03.2018 | IS | 13.04.2018 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/27] | HU | 18.09.2009 | |
AT | 13.12.2017 | ||
CY | 13.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 13.12.2017 | ||
DK | 13.12.2017 | ||
EE | 13.12.2017 | ||
ES | 13.12.2017 | ||
FI | 13.12.2017 | ||
HR | 13.12.2017 | ||
IT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
MC | 13.12.2017 | ||
NL | 13.12.2017 | ||
PL | 13.12.2017 | ||
PT | 13.12.2017 | ||
RO | 13.12.2017 | ||
SE | 13.12.2017 | ||
SI | 13.12.2017 | ||
SK | 13.12.2017 | ||
SM | 13.12.2017 | ||
TR | 13.12.2017 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
NO | 13.03.2018 | ||
GR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IS | 13.04.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 13.12.2017 | |
CY | 13.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 13.12.2017 | ||
DK | 13.12.2017 | ||
EE | 13.12.2017 | ||
ES | 13.12.2017 | ||
FI | 13.12.2017 | ||
HR | 13.12.2017 | ||
IT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
MC | 13.12.2017 | ||
NL | 13.12.2017 | ||
PL | 13.12.2017 | ||
RO | 13.12.2017 | ||
SE | 13.12.2017 | ||
SI | 13.12.2017 | ||
SK | 13.12.2017 | ||
SM | 13.12.2017 | ||
TR | 13.12.2017 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
NO | 13.03.2018 | ||
GR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IS | 13.04.2018 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AT | 13.12.2017 | |
CY | 13.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 13.12.2017 | ||
DK | 13.12.2017 | ||
EE | 13.12.2017 | ||
ES | 13.12.2017 | ||
FI | 13.12.2017 | ||
HR | 13.12.2017 | ||
IT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
MC | 13.12.2017 | ||
NL | 13.12.2017 | ||
PL | 13.12.2017 | ||
RO | 13.12.2017 | ||
SE | 13.12.2017 | ||
SI | 13.12.2017 | ||
SK | 13.12.2017 | ||
SM | 13.12.2017 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
NO | 13.03.2018 | ||
GR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IS | 13.04.2018 | ||
Former [2019/13] | AT | 13.12.2017 | |
CY | 13.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 13.12.2017 | ||
DK | 13.12.2017 | ||
EE | 13.12.2017 | ||
ES | 13.12.2017 | ||
FI | 13.12.2017 | ||
HR | 13.12.2017 | ||
IT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
NL | 13.12.2017 | ||
PL | 13.12.2017 | ||
RO | 13.12.2017 | ||
SE | 13.12.2017 | ||
SI | 13.12.2017 | ||
SK | 13.12.2017 | ||
SM | 13.12.2017 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
NO | 13.03.2018 | ||
GR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IS | 13.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | AT | 13.12.2017 | |
CY | 13.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 13.12.2017 | ||
DK | 13.12.2017 | ||
EE | 13.12.2017 | ||
ES | 13.12.2017 | ||
FI | 13.12.2017 | ||
HR | 13.12.2017 | ||
IT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
NL | 13.12.2017 | ||
PL | 13.12.2017 | ||
RO | 13.12.2017 | ||
SE | 13.12.2017 | ||
SK | 13.12.2017 | ||
SM | 13.12.2017 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
NO | 13.03.2018 | ||
GR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IS | 13.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | AT | 13.12.2017 | |
CY | 13.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 13.12.2017 | ||
EE | 13.12.2017 | ||
ES | 13.12.2017 | ||
FI | 13.12.2017 | ||
HR | 13.12.2017 | ||
IT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
NL | 13.12.2017 | ||
PL | 13.12.2017 | ||
RO | 13.12.2017 | ||
SE | 13.12.2017 | ||
SK | 13.12.2017 | ||
SM | 13.12.2017 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
NO | 13.03.2018 | ||
GR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IS | 13.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 13.12.2017 | |
CY | 13.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 13.12.2017 | ||
EE | 13.12.2017 | ||
ES | 13.12.2017 | ||
FI | 13.12.2017 | ||
HR | 13.12.2017 | ||
IT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
NL | 13.12.2017 | ||
PL | 13.12.2017 | ||
SE | 13.12.2017 | ||
SK | 13.12.2017 | ||
SM | 13.12.2017 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
NO | 13.03.2018 | ||
GR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IS | 13.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/38] | AT | 13.12.2017 | |
CY | 13.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 13.12.2017 | ||
EE | 13.12.2017 | ||
ES | 13.12.2017 | ||
FI | 13.12.2017 | ||
HR | 13.12.2017 | ||
LT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
NL | 13.12.2017 | ||
PL | 13.12.2017 | ||
SE | 13.12.2017 | ||
SK | 13.12.2017 | ||
SM | 13.12.2017 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
NO | 13.03.2018 | ||
GR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IS | 13.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CY | 13.12.2017 | |
CZ | 13.12.2017 | ||
EE | 13.12.2017 | ||
ES | 13.12.2017 | ||
FI | 13.12.2017 | ||
HR | 13.12.2017 | ||
LT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
NL | 13.12.2017 | ||
PL | 13.12.2017 | ||
SE | 13.12.2017 | ||
SK | 13.12.2017 | ||
SM | 13.12.2017 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
NO | 13.03.2018 | ||
GR | 14.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/34] | FI | 13.12.2017 | |
HR | 13.12.2017 | ||
LT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
NL | 13.12.2017 | ||
SE | 13.12.2017 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
NO | 13.03.2018 | ||
GR | 14.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/24] | FI | 13.12.2017 | |
HR | 13.12.2017 | ||
LT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
SE | 13.12.2017 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
NO | 13.03.2018 | ||
GR | 14.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/23] | FI | 13.12.2017 | |
HR | 13.12.2017 | ||
LT | 13.12.2017 | ||
SE | 13.12.2017 | ||
NO | 13.03.2018 | ||
GR | 14.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/21] | FI | 13.12.2017 | |
LT | 13.12.2017 | ||
NO | 13.03.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2006235887 (ABE KOICHI [JP], et al) [X] 1,13-14 * claims 3,5,6 *; | [Y]US7502972 (CHILUKURI SAMPATH KUMAR [IN], et al) [Y] 1-5,8-14 * column 1, line 44 - line 53 *; | [Y] - Randy Cunningham, "Deleting LOTS of Data", (20081115), SageLogix inc., URL: http://www.sagelogix.com/idc/groups/public/documents/sagelogix-whitepaper/sage015051.pdf, (20100108), XP002562144 [Y] 1-5,8-14 * Introduction, sections "Consider an INSERT of what you want to keep" and "Consider partitioning" * | [A] - Boris Milrud, "Optimize the Massive DELETE Operation in Oracle, Part 2", (20041201), devx.com, URL: http://web.archive.org/web/20080308014321/http://www.devx.com/dbzone/Article/22614/1954?pf=true, (20100106), XP002561997 [A] 1-14 * the whole document * | [A] - Donald Burleson, "Oracle delete performance tips", (20081025), Burleson Consulting, dba-oracle.com, URL: http://www.dba-oracle.com/t_delete_performance_speed.htm, (20100106), XP002561998 [A] 1-14 * the whole document * | [A] - GARTNER A ET AL, "Efficient bulk deletes in relational databases", PROCEEDINGS 17TH. INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON DATA ENGINEERING. (ICDE'2001). HEIDELBERG, GERMANY, APRIL 2 - 6, 2001; [INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON DATA ENGINEERING. (ICDE)], LOS ALAMITOS, CA : IEEE COMP. SOC, US, (20010402), ISBN 978-0-7695-1001-9, pages 183 - 192, XP010538060 [A] 1-14 * abstract * * Section 1.1-1.2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICDE.2001.914827 | Examination | US2006074956 | US2008243966 | - Anonymous, "Truncate (SQL)", (20090909), pages 1 - 1, URL: http://en.wikipedia.org/w/index.php?title=Truncate_(SQL)&oldid=312812279, (20130710), XP055070617 | - Anonymous, "What is the use of truncate command?", (20081212), pages 1 - 3, URL: http://sawaal.ibibo.com/computers-and-technology/what-use-truncate-command-608470.html, (20130725), XP055072977 |