EP2257624 - METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 04.12.2020 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.12.2020 | Opposition rejected | published on 06.01.2021 [2021/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BicycleRD Limited B900 Babraham Research Campus Cambridge CB22 3AT / GB | [2018/20] |
Former [2018/12] | For all designated states BicycleRD Limited Meditrina Babraham Research Campus Cambridge CB22 3AT / GB | ||
Former [2013/09] | For all designated states Bicycle Therapeutics Limited Meditrina Babraham Research Campus Cambridge CB22 3AT / GB | ||
Former [2012/10] | For all designated states Medical Research Council 2nd Floor, David Phillips Building Polaris House, North Star Avenue Swindon, SN2 1FL / GB | ||
Former [2010/49] | For all designated states Medical Research Council 20 Park Crescent London W1B 1AL / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WINTER, Gregory MRC Laboratory of Molecular Biology Hills road Cambridge CB2 0QH / GB | 02 /
HEINIS, Christian Ecole Polytechnique Federal de Lausanne (EPFL) Laboratory of Therapeutic Peptides and Proteins BCH 5305 CH-1015 Lausanne / CH | [2012/17] |
Former [2010/49] | 01 /
WINTER, Gregory MRC Laboratory of Molecular Biology Hills road Cambridge CB2 0QH / GB | ||
02 /
HEINIS, Christian Ecole Polytechnique Federal de Lausanne (EPFL) Laboratory of Therapeutic Peptides and Proteins BCH 5305 CH-1015 Lausanne / CH | Representative(s) | Maschio, Antonio, et al Maschio & Soames IP Limited 30 Carlton Crescent Southampton SO15 2EW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/17] | Maschio, Antonio, et al Edwards Wildman Innovations LLP 20 Carlton Crescent Southampton SO15 2ET / GB | ||
Former [2011/45] | Maschio, Antonio, et al Edwards Wildman Innovations LLP 10 Carlton Crescent Southampton SO15 2EZ / GB | ||
Former [2010/49] | Maschio, Antonio Edwards Angell Palmer & Dodge Innovations LLP 10 Carlton Crescent Southampton SO15 2EZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 09708496.6 | 04.02.2009 | [2010/49] | WO2009GB00301 | Priority number, date | GB20080002079 | 05.02.2008 Original published format: GB 0802079 | GB20080018399 | 08.10.2008 Original published format: GB 0818399 | [2010/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009098450 | Date: | 13.08.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/33] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2257624 | Date: | 08.12.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.08.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2257624 | Date: | 25.04.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/17] | Type: | B9 Corrected patent specification | No.: | EP2257624 | Date: | 01.08.2012 | [2012/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.10.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/10, C40B30/04, C40B40/02, C40B40/08, C40B50/06, G01N33/569, G01N33/68, A61K47/48, C07K1/107 | [2011/41] | CPC: |
C12N15/1062 (EP,US);
A61K47/54 (EP,US);
A61K47/55 (EP,US);
A61K47/64 (EP,US);
C07K1/1075 (EP,US);
C07K1/1077 (EP,US);
C07K14/005 (US);
C12N15/1037 (EP,US);
C12N15/1041 (EP,US);
C12N15/1068 (EP,US);
C40B40/08 (EP,US);
C40B50/06 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2010/49] | C12N15/10, C40B40/02, C40B30/04, G01N33/68, A61K47/48 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/49] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN | [2010/49] | English: | METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS | [2010/49] | French: | PROCÉDÉS ET COMPOSITIONS | [2010/49] | Entry into regional phase | 06.09.2010 | National basic fee paid | 06.09.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.09.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.09.2010 | Examination requested [2010/49] | 14.12.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.05.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.08.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.10.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.02.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 02.02.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP12151953.2 / EP2474613 | EP13167202.4 / EP2653543 | EP13167203.2 / EP2653544 | EP13167204.0 / EP2653545 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.05.2011 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
25.01.2013
07.02.2013
ADMISSIBLE Pepscan Systems B.V. Zuidersluisweg 2 8243 RC Lelystad / NL Opponent's representative Breuer, Markus, et al, et al Brienner Straße 1 80333 München / DE | [2019/41] |
Former [2018/13] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
25.01.2013
07.02.2013
ADMISSIBLE Pepscan Systems B.V. Zuidersluisweg 2 8243 RC Lelystad / NL Opponent's representative Henkel, Breuer & Partner, et al, et al Patentanwälte Brienner Strasse 1 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [2015/47] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
25.01.2013
07.02.2013
ADMISSIBLE Pepscan Systems B.V. Zuidersluisweg 2 8243 RC Lelystad / NL Opponent's representative V.O., et al, et al P.O. Box 87930 2508 DH Den Haag / NL | ||
Former [2013/10] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
25.01.2013
Pepscan Systems B.V. Zuidersluisweg 2 8243 RC Lelystad / NL Opponent's representative Jansen, Cornelis Marinus, et al, et al VEREENIGDE Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | 05.03.2013 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 15.11.2013 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 29.04.2015 | Date of oral proceedings | 05.06.2015 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 05.06.2015 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 24.11.2020 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2021/01] | Appeal following opposition | 05.08.2015 | Appeal received No. T1573/15 | 15.10.2015 | Statement of grounds filed | 24.11.2020 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent withdrawn | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2011 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   25.04.2011 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.02.2009 | CY | 25.04.2012 | CZ | 25.04.2012 | EE | 25.04.2012 | FI | 25.04.2012 | HR | 25.04.2012 | LT | 25.04.2012 | LV | 25.04.2012 | MK | 25.04.2012 | MT | 25.04.2012 | RO | 25.04.2012 | SI | 25.04.2012 | SK | 25.04.2012 | TR | 25.04.2012 | BG | 25.07.2012 | GR | 26.07.2012 | LU | 04.02.2013 | MC | 28.02.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | CY | 25.04.2012 | |
CZ | 25.04.2012 | ||
EE | 25.04.2012 | ||
FI | 25.04.2012 | ||
HR | 25.04.2012 | ||
LT | 25.04.2012 | ||
LV | 25.04.2012 | ||
MK | 25.04.2012 | ||
MT | 25.04.2012 | ||
RO | 25.04.2012 | ||
SI | 25.04.2012 | ||
SK | 25.04.2012 | ||
TR | 25.04.2012 | ||
BG | 25.07.2012 | ||
GR | 26.07.2012 | ||
MC | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2014/32] | CY | 25.04.2012 | |
CZ | 25.04.2012 | ||
EE | 25.04.2012 | ||
FI | 25.04.2012 | ||
HR | 25.04.2012 | ||
LT | 25.04.2012 | ||
LV | 25.04.2012 | ||
MT | 25.04.2012 | ||
RO | 25.04.2012 | ||
SI | 25.04.2012 | ||
SK | 25.04.2012 | ||
BG | 25.07.2012 | ||
GR | 26.07.2012 | ||
MC | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/42] | CY | 25.04.2012 | |
CZ | 25.04.2012 | ||
EE | 25.04.2012 | ||
FI | 25.04.2012 | ||
HR | 25.04.2012 | ||
LT | 25.04.2012 | ||
LV | 25.04.2012 | ||
RO | 25.04.2012 | ||
SI | 25.04.2012 | ||
SK | 25.04.2012 | ||
BG | 25.07.2012 | ||
GR | 26.07.2012 | ||
MC | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | CY | 25.04.2012 | |
CZ | 25.04.2012 | ||
EE | 25.04.2012 | ||
FI | 25.04.2012 | ||
HR | 25.04.2012 | ||
LT | 25.04.2012 | ||
LV | 25.04.2012 | ||
RO | 25.04.2012 | ||
SI | 25.04.2012 | ||
SK | 25.04.2012 | ||
BG | 25.07.2012 | ||
GR | 26.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | CY | 25.04.2012 | |
CZ | 25.04.2012 | ||
EE | 25.04.2012 | ||
FI | 25.04.2012 | ||
HR | 25.04.2012 | ||
LT | 25.04.2012 | ||
LV | 25.04.2012 | ||
RO | 25.04.2012 | ||
SI | 25.04.2012 | ||
SK | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | CY | 25.04.2012 | |
EE | 25.04.2012 | ||
FI | 25.04.2012 | ||
HR | 25.04.2012 | ||
LT | 25.04.2012 | ||
LV | 25.04.2012 | ||
SI | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.07.2012 | ||
Former [2012/51] | CY | 25.04.2012 | |
FI | 25.04.2012 | ||
HR | 25.04.2012 | ||
LT | 25.04.2012 | ||
LV | 25.04.2012 | ||
SI | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.07.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | CY | 25.04.2012 | |
FI | 25.04.2012 | ||
HR | 25.04.2012 | ||
LT | 25.04.2012 | ||
LV | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.07.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 25.04.2012 | |
FI | 25.04.2012 | ||
LT | 25.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | FI | 25.04.2012 | |
LT | 25.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | LT | 25.04.2012 | Cited in | International search | [X]WO9836743 (CYPROS PHARM CORP [US]) [X] 25-28 * Compounds CYP-PA2, CYP-PA4 *; | [A]WO0105950 (MORPHOSYS AG [DE], et al) [A] 1-24 * the whole document *; | [A]WO0123619 (XENOPORT INC [US], et al) [A] 1-24 * the whole document *; | [DA]WO02077182 (XENOPORT INC [US], et al) [DA] 1-24 * the whole document *; | [DA]WO2004077062 (PEPSCAN SYSTEMS BV [NL], et al) [DA] 1-24 * the whole document *; | [DA]WO2006078161 (PEPSCAN SYSTEMS BV [NL], et al) [DA] 1-24 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2006095345 (UNIV RAMOT [IL], et al) [A] 1-24 * the whole document *; | [DA] - DWYER M A ET AL, "Biosynthetic Phage Display: A Novel Protein Engineering Tool Combining Chemical and Genetic Diversity", CHEMISTRY AND BIOLOGY, CURRENT BIOLOGY, LONDON, GB, (20000301), vol. 7, no. 4, ISSN 1074-5521, pages 263 - 274, XP002989574 [DA] 1-24 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1074-5521(00)00102-2 | [DA] - JESPERS LAURENT ET AL, "Selection of optical biosensors from chemisynthetic antibody libraries.", PROTEIN ENGINEERING, DESIGN & SELECTION : PEDS OCT 2004, (200410), vol. 17, no. 10, ISSN 1741-0126, pages 709 - 713, XP002535021 [DA] 1-24 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/PROTEIN/GZH083 | [DA] - WOIWODE T F ET AL, "Synthetic compound libraries displayed on the surface of encoded bacteriophage", CHEMISTRY AND BIOLOGY, CURRENT BIOLOGY, LONDON, GB, (20030901), vol. 10, no. 9, ISSN 1074-5521, pages 847 - 858, XP002287083 [DA] 1-24 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.chembiol.2003.08.005 | [DA] - TIMMERMAN P ET AL, "Rapid and quantitative cyclization of multiple peptide loops onto synthetic scaffolds for structural mimicry of protein surfaces", CHEMBIOCHEM - A EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF CHEMICAL BIOLOGY, WILEY VCH, WEINHEIM, DE, (20050501), vol. 6, no. 5, ISSN 1439-4227, pages 821 - 824, XP002378236 [DA] 1-24 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/cbic.200400374 | [DA] - KATHER ET AL, "A Stable Disulfide-free Gene-3-protein of Phage fd Generated by In vitro Evolution", JOURNAL OF MOLECULAR BIOLOGY, LONDON, GB, (20051202), vol. 354, no. 3, ISSN 0022-2836, pages 666 - 678, XP005165892 [DA] 1-24 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jmb.2005.09.086 | [X] - VAN DEN HOUT KELLY P ET AL, "Tuning the stacking properties of C3-symmetrical molecules by modifying a dipeptide motif.", CHEMISTRY (WEINHEIM AN DER BERGSTRASSE, GERMANY) 2007, (2007), vol. 13, no. 29, ISSN 0947-6539, pages 8111 - 8123, XP002543649 [X] 25-28 * compounds 3,8 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/chem.200700630 | [X] - TROUCHE NATHALIE ET AL, "Small multivalent architectures mimicking homotrimers of the TNF superfamily member CD40L: delineating the relationship between structure and effector function.", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY 7 NOV 2007, (20071107), vol. 129, no. 44, ISSN 0002-7863, pages 13480 - 13492, XP002543650 [X] 25-28 * Compounds of Scheme 1, in particular compound I * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/JA073169M | [X] - FICHTER KATYE M ET AL, "Peptide-functionalized poly(ethylene glycol) star polymers: DNA delivery vehicles with multivalent molecular architecture.", BIOCONJUGATE CHEMISTRY JAN 2008, (200801), vol. 19, no. 1, ISSN 1043-1802, pages 76 - 88, XP002543651 [X] 25-28 * figure 1a * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/bc0701141 | [X] - RANGANATHAN D ET AL, "DESIGN AND SYNTHESIS OF AB3-TYPE (A=1,3,5-BENZENETRICARBONYL UNIT; B=GLU DIOME OR GLU7 OCTA OME) PEPTIDE DENDRIMERS: CRYSTAL STRUCTURE OF THE FIRST GENERATION", BIOPOLYMERS, NEW YORK, NY, US, (20000101), vol. 54, no. 4, ISSN 0006-3525, pages 289 - 295, XP001040555 [X] 25-28 * compound 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/1097-0282(20001005)54:4<289::AID-BIP60>3.0.CO;2-7 | [X] - KLOK H-A ET AL, "STAR-SHAPED FLUORESCENT POLYPEPTIDES", JOURNAL OF POLYMER SCIENCE, INTERSCIENCE PUBLISHERS, XX, (20010101), vol. 39, no. 10, pages 1572 - 1582, XP001061864 [X] 25-28 * Products in schemes 2 and 3 * | [X] - GUARISE C ET AL, "Fully symmetrical functionalization of multivalent scaffold molecules on solid support", TETRAHEDRON, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 62, no. 50, ISSN 0040-4020, (20061211), pages 11670 - 11674, (20061211), XP025002975 [X] 25-28 * Compounds in Table 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.tet.2006.09.053 | [X] - SCHMUCK CARSTEN ET AL, "Solid phase synthesis of a prototype of a new class of biomimetic receptors for anionic carbohydrates.", ORGANIC & BIOMOLECULAR CHEMISTRY 7 MAR 2007, (20070307), vol. 5, no. 5, ISSN 1477-0520, pages 787 - 791, XP002543652 [X] 25-28 * compound 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/b613660e | [X] - ADLER-ABRAMOVICH LIHI ET AL, "Controlled assembly of peptide nanotubes triggered by enzymatic activation of self-immolative dendrimers.", CHEMBIOCHEM : A EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF CHEMICAL BIOLOGY 25 MAY 2007, (20070525), vol. 8, no. 8, ISSN 1439-4227, pages 859 - 862, XP002543654 [X] 25-28 * compound 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/CBIC.200700103 | [X] - SUN SHUGUANG ET AL, "Thermodynamic studies on the recognition of flexible peptides by transition-metal complexes", JOURNAL OF ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, EASTON.; US, vol. 41, no. 6, ISSN 0022-3263, (20020101), pages 1584 - 1590, (20020222), XP002509071 [X] 25-28 * Compounds in Table 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/IC0108742 | [PX] - GUARISE, CRISTIAN; ZAUPA, GIOVANNI; PRINS, LEONARD J.; SCRIMM, PAOLO, "Functionalization of tripodal scaffold molecules on solid support", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, (20080530), no. 20, pages 3559 - 3568, XP002543655 [PX] 25-28 * Compound 1a * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/EJOC.200800259 | by applicant | - JESPERS, PROTEIN ENGINEERING DESIGN AND SELECTION, (2004), vol. 17, no. 10, pages 709 - 713 | - DWYER ET AL., CHEM BIOL, (2000), vol. 7, no. 4, pages 263 - 274 | - MILLWARD ET AL., CHEMICAL BIOLOGY, (2007), vol. 2, no. 9, pages 625 - 634 | - WANG L, ZHANG Z, BROCK A, SCHULTZ PG, PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA., (20030107), vol. 100, no. 1, pages 56 - 61 | - BIOORG MED CHEM LETT., (20061015), vol. 16, no. 20, pages 5356 - 9 | - CHIN JW, SANTORO SW, MARTIN AB, KING DS, WANG L, SCHULTZ PG, J AM CHEM SOC., (20020807), vol. 124, no. 31, pages 9026 - 7 | - DEITERS A, CROPP TA, MUKHERJI M, CHIN JW, ANDERSON JC, SCHULTZ PG, "Adding amino acids with novel reactivity to the genetic code of Saccharomyces cerevisiae", J AM CHEM SOC., (20031001), vol. 125, no. 39, doi:doi:10.1021/ja0370037, pages L 1782 - 3, XP002469881 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja0370037 | - TSAO ML, TIAN F, SCHULTZ PG, "Selective Staudinger modification of proteins containing p-azidophenylalanine", CHEMBIOCHEM., (200512), vol. 6, no. 12, doi:doi:10.1002/CBIC.200500314, pages 2147 - 9, XP002539783 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/CBIC.200500314 | - DEITERS A, SCHULTZ PG, "In vivo incorporation of an alkyne into proteins in Escherichia coli", BIOORG MED CHEM LETT., (20050301), vol. 15, no. 5, doi:doi:10.1016/j.bmcl.2004.12.065, pages 1521 - 4, XP004750702 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bmcl.2004.12.065 | - ANGEW CHEM INT ED ENGL., (2008), vol. 47, no. 43, pages 8220 - 3 | - XIE J, LIU W, SCHULTZ PG, "A genetically encoded bidentate, metal-binding amino acid", ANGEW CHEM INT ED ENGL., (2007), vol. 46, no. 48, pages 9239 - 42 | - "Protein evolution with an expanded genetic code", PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA., (20081118), vol. 105, no. 46, pages 17688 - 93 | - TIAN F, TSAO ML, SCHULTZ PG, J AM CHEM SOC., (20041215), vol. 126, no. 49, pages 15962 - 3 | - CHIN JW, MARTIN AB, KING DS, WANG L, SCHULTZ PG, "Addition of a photocrosslinking amino acid to the genetic code of Escherichiacoli", PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA., (20020820), vol. 99, no. 17, doi:doi:10.1073/pnas.172226299, pages 11020 - 4, XP002405594 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.172226299 | - YANAGISAWA T, ISHII R, FUKUNAGA R, KOBAYASHI T, SAKAMOTO K, YOKOYAMA S, CHEM BIOL., (20081124), vol. 15, no. 11, pages 1187 - 97 | - NEUMANN H, PEAK-CHEW SY, CHIN JW, NAT CHEM BIOL., (20080217), vol. 4, no. 4, pages 232 - 4 | - RYU Y, SCHULTZ PG, NAT METHODS, (200604), vol. 3, no. 4, pages 263 - 5 | - FARRELL IS, TORONEY R, HAZEN JL, MEHL RA, CHIN JW, "Photo-cross-linking interacting proteins with a genetically encoded benzophenone", NAT METHODS, (200505), vol. 2, no. 5, pages 377 - 84 | - WANG K, NEUMANN H, PEAK-CHEW SY, CHIN JW, "Evolved orthogonal ribosomes enhance the efficiency of synthetic genetic code expansion", NAT BIOTECHNOL., (200707), vol. 25, no. 7, doi:doi:10.1038/nbt1314, pages 770 - 7, XP002478973 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nbt1314 | - JESPERS ET AL., PROTEIN ENGINEERING DESIGN AND SELECTION, (2004), vol. 17, no. 10, pages 709 - 713 | - MARKS ET AL., J.MOL.BIO, vol. 222, pages 581 - 597 | - "A fast and simple method for sequencing DNA cloned in the single-stranded bacteriophage M13", JOURNAL OF MOLECULAR BIOLOGY, (1979), vol. 129, no. 1, pages 169 - 72 | - KRISTENSEN, P., WINTER, G., "Proteolytic selection for protein folding using filamentous bacteriophages", FOLD DES., (1998), vol. 3, no. 5, doi:doi:10.1016/S1359-0278(98)00044-3, pages 321 - 8, XP002114489 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1359-0278(98)00044-3 | - CHEN, HARRISON, "Cell-penetrating peptides in drug development: enabling intracellular targets", BIOCHEMICAL SOCIETY TRANSACTIONS, (2007), vol. 35, page 821 | - DAWSON PE, MUIR TW, CLARK-LEWIS I, KENT, SBH, "Synthesis of Proteins by Native Chemical Ligation", SCIENCE, (1994), vol. 266, pages 776 - 779 | - CHANG TK, JACKSON DY, BURNIER JP, WELLS JA, "Subtiligase: a tool for semisynthesis of proteins", PROC NATL ACAD SCI U S A., (19941220), vol. 91, no. 26, pages 12544 - 8, XP002280083 | - HIKARI A.I. YOSHIHARA, SAMI MAHRUS, JAMES A. WELLS, "Tags for labeling protein N-termini with subtiligase for proteomics", BIOORGANIC & MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY LETTERS TAGS FOR LABELING PROTEIN N-TERMINI WITH SUBTILIGASE FOR PROTEOMICS, (20081115), vol. 18, no. 22, doi:doi:10.1016/j.bmcl.2008.08.044, pages 6000 - 6003, XP025627190 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bmcl.2008.08.044 | - LINDE ET AL., "Structure-activity relationship and metabolic stability studies of backbone cyclization and N-methylation of melanocortin peptides", PEPTIDE SCIENCE, (2008), vol. 90, pages 671 - 682 | - HESS ET AL., "backbone cyclic peptidomimetic melanocortin-4 receptor agonist as a novel orally administered drug lead for treating obesity", J. MED. CHEM., (2008), vol. 51, pages 1026 - 1034 | - WU, P., LEINONEN, J., KOIVUNEN, E., LANKINEN, H., STENMAN, U. H., "Identification of novel prostate-specific antigen-binding peptides modulating its enzyme activity", EUR J BIOCHEM, (2000), vol. 267, doi:doi:10.1046/j.1432-1327.2000.01696.x, pages 6212 - 20, XP002908115 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1046/j.1432-1327.2000.01696.x | - HEKIM, C. ET AL., "Novel peptide inhibitors of human kallikrein 2", J BIOL CHEM, (2006), vol. 281, doi:doi:10.1074/jbc.M600014200, pages 12555 - 60, XP055056450 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.M600014200 | - HANSEN, M. ET AL., "A urokinase-type plasminogen activator-inhibiting cyclic peptide with an unusual P2 residue and an extended protease binding surface demonstrates new modalities for enzyme inhibition", J BIOL CHEM, (2005), vol. 280, pages 38424 - 37 | - ANDERSEN, L. M., WIND, T., HANSEN, H. D., ANDREASEN, P. A., "A cyclic peptidylic inhibitor of murine urokinase-type plasminogen activator: changing species specificity by substitution of a single residue", BIOCHEM J, (2008), vol. 412, pages 447 - 57 | - KROOK, M., LINDBLADH, C., ERIKSEN, J. A., MOSBACH, K., "Selection of a cyclic nonapeptide inhibitor to alpha-chymotrypsin using a phage display peptide library", MOL DIVERS, (1997), vol. 3, pages 149 - 59 | - DENNIS, M. S. ET AL., "Peptide exosite inhibitors of factor Vlla as anticoagulants", NATURE, (2000), vol. 404, doi:doi:10.1038/35006574, pages 465 - 70, XP002155500 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/35006574 | - HUANG, L. ET AL., "Novel peptide inhibitors of angiotensin-converting enzyme 2", J BIOL CHEM, (2003), vol. 278, pages 15532 - 40 | - KARASSEVA, N. G., GLINSKY, V. V., CHEN, N. X., KOMATIREDDY, R., QUINN, T. P., "Identification and characterization of peptides that bind human ErbB-2 selected from a bacteriophage display library", J PROTEIN CHEM, (2002), vol. 21, pages 287 - 96 | - HOUIMEL, M., MACH, J. P., CORTHESY-THEULAZ, I., CORTHESY, B., FISCH, I., "New inhibitors of Helicobacter pylori urease holoenzyme selected from phage-displayed peptide libraries", EURJ BIOCHEM, (1999), vol. 262, pages 774 - 80 | - LUNDER, M., BRATKOVIC, T., KREFT, S., STRUKELJ, B., "Peptide inhibitor of pancreatic lipase selected by phage display using different elution strategies", J LIPID RES, (2005), vol. 46, doi:doi:10.1194/jlr.M500048-JLR200, pages 1512 - 6, XP002695156 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1194/jlr.M500048-JLR200 | - SANSCHAGRIN, F., LEVESQUE, R. C., "A specific peptide inhibitor of the class B metallo-beta-lactamase L-1 from Stenotrophomonas maltophilia identified using phage display", J ANTIMICROB CHEM OTHER, (2005), vol. 55, pages 252 - 5 | - SPERINDE, J. J., CHOI, S. J., SZOKA, F. C., JR., "Phage display selection of a peptide DNase II inhibitor that enhances gene delivery", J GENE MED, (2001), vol. 3, pages 101 - 8 | - BLEICHER, K. H., BOHM, H. J., MULLER, K., ALANINE, A. I, "Hit and lead generation: beyond high-throughput screening", NOT REV DRUG DISCOV, (2003), vol. 2, doi:doi:10.1038/nrd1086, pages 369 - 78, XP055051971 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nrd1086 | - MARKS, J. D., HOOGENBOOM, H. R., GRIFFITHS, A. D., WINTER, G., "Molecular evolution of proteins on filamentous phage. Mimicking the strategy of the immune system", J BIOL CHEM, (1992), vol. 267, pages 16007 - 10, XP002025816 | - JESPERS, L. S., ROBERTS, A., MAHLER, S. M., WINTER, G., HOOGENBOOM, H. R., "Guiding the selection of human antibodies from phage display repertoires to a single epitope of an antigen", BIOTECHNOLOGY (N Y, (1994), vol. 12, doi:doi:10.1038/nbt0994-899, pages 899 - 903, XP002155177 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nbt0994-899 | - HUDSON, P. J., SOURIAU, C., "Engineered antibodies", NOT MED, (2003), vol. 9, doi:doi:10.1038/nm0103-129, pages 129 - 34, XP002338941 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nm0103-129 | - DOYON, J. B., SNYDER, T. M., LIU, D. R., "Highly sensitive in vitro selections for DNA- linked synthetic small molecules with protein binding affinity and specificity", J AM CHEM SOC, (2003), vol. 125, doi:doi:10.1021/ja036065u, pages 12372 - 3, XP001172427 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja036065u | - WOIWODE, T. F. ET AL., "Synthetic compound libraries displayed on the surface of encoded bacteriophage", CHEM BIOL, (2003), vol. 10, doi:doi:10.1016/j.chembiol.2003.08.005, pages 847 - 58, XP002287083 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.chembiol.2003.08.005 | - BRENNER, S., LERNER, R. A., "Encoded combinatorial chemistry", PROC NOTI ACAD SCI U S A, (1992), vol. 89, doi:doi:10.1073/pnas.89.12.5381, pages 5381 - 3, XP000647936 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.89.12.5381 | - HALPIN, D. R., HARBURY, P. B., "DNA display II. Genetic manipulation of combinatorial chemistry libraries for small-molecule evolution", PLOS BIOL, (2004), vol. 2, page E174 | - JESPERS, L., BONNERT, T. P., WINTER, G., "Selection of optical biosensors from chemisynthetic antibody libraries", PROTEIN ENG DES SEL, (2004), vol. 17, doi:doi:10.1093/PROTEIN/GZH083, pages 709 - 13, XP002535021 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/PROTEIN/GZH083 | - TIMMERMAN, P., BELD, J., PUIJK, W. C., MELOEN, R. H., "Rapid and quantitative cyclization of multiple peptide loops onto synthetic scaffolds for structural mimicry of protein surfaces", CHEMBIOCHEM, (2005), vol. 6, doi:doi:10.1002/cbic.200400374, pages 821 - 4, XP002378236 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/cbic.200400374 | - DRIGGERS, E. M., HALE, S. P., LEE, J., TERRETT, N. K., "The exploration of macrocycles for drug discovery--an underexploited structural class", NOT REV DRUG DISCOV, (2008), vol. 7, doi:doi:10.1038/nrd2590, pages 608 - 24, XP055151640 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nrd2590 | - WESSJOHANN, L. A., RUIJTER, E., GARCIA-RIVERA, D., BRANDT, W., "What can a chemist learn from nature's macrocycles?--a brief, conceptual view", MOL DIVERS, (2005), vol. 9, pages 171 - 86, XP019258593 | - KEMP, D. S., MCNAMARA, P. E., "Conformationally restricted cyclic nonapeptides derived from L-cysteine and LL-3-amino-2-piperidino-6-carboxylic acid (LL-acp), a potent b-turn-inducing dipeptide analogue", JOURNAL OF ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, (1985), vol. 50, pages 5834 - 5838 | - KATHER, I., BIPPES, C. A., SCHMID, F. X., "A stable disulfide-free gene-3-protein of phage fd generated by in vitro evolution", J MOL BIOL, (2005), vol. 354, doi:doi:10.1016/j.jmb.2005.09.086, pages 666 - 78, XP005165892 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jmb.2005.09.086 | - CHENG, Y., PRUSOFF, W. H., "Relationship between the inhibition constant (Kl) and the concentration of inhibitor which causes 50 per cent inhibition (150) of an enzymatic reaction", BIOCHEM PHARMACOL, (1973), vol. 22, doi:doi:10.1016/0006-2952(73)90196-2, pages 3099 - 108, XP001106687 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0006-2952(73)90196-2 | - DENNIS, M. S. ET AL., "Peptide exosite inhibitors of factor Vila as anticoagulants", NATURE, (2000), vol. 404, doi:doi:10.1038/35006574, pages 465 - 70, XP002155500 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/35006574 | - JACKSON, D. Y. ET AL., "A designed peptide ligase for total synthesis of ribonuclease A with unnatural catalytic residues", SCIENCE, (1994), vol. 266, doi:doi:10.1126/science.7939659, pages 243 - 7, XP001246800 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.7939659 | - ABBENANTE, G., FAIRLIE, D. P., "Protease inhibitors in the clinic", MED CHEM, (2005), vol. 1, pages 71 - 104 | - TURK, B., "Targeting proteases: successes, failures and future prospects", NOT REV DRUG DISCOV, (2006), vol. 5, doi:doi:10.1038/nrd2092, pages 785 - 99, XP002556191 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nrd2092 | - MELKKO, S., SCHEUERMANN, J., DUMELIN, C. E., NERI, D., "Encoded self-assembling chemical libraries", NOT BIOTECHNOL, (2004), vol. 22, doi:doi:10.1038/NBT961, pages 568 - 74, XP002541364 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/NBT961 | - LI, S., ROBERTS, R. W., "A novel strategy for in vitro selection of peptide-drug conjugates", CHEM BIOL, (2003), vol. 10, pages 233 - 9 | - MILLWARD, S. W., TAKAHASHI, T. T., ROBERTS, R. W., "A general route for post-translational cyclization of mRNA display libraries", J AM CHEM SOC, (2005), vol. 127, doi:doi:10.1021/ja054373h, pages 14142 - 3, XP008119248 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja054373h | - MILLWARD, S. W., FIACCO, S., AUSTIN, R. J., ROBERTS, R. W., "Design of cyclic peptides that bind protein surfaces with antibody-like affinity", ACS CHEM BIOL, (2007), vol. 2, doi:doi:10.1021/CB7001126, pages 625 - 34, XP002616292 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/CB7001126 |