EP2226725 - Programmable processor and method with wide operations [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.09.2011 Database last updated on 10.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MicroUnity Systems Engineering, Inc. 376 Martin Avenue Santa Clara, CA 95050 / US | [2010/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hansen, Craig c/o MicroUnity, Inc 376 Martin Avenue Santa Clara, CA 95050 / US | 02 /
Massalin, Alexia 6631 Buddingwell Place San Jose, CA 95120 / US | 03 /
Moussouris, John P.O. Box 719 Palo Alto, CA 94303 / US | [2010/51] |
Former [2010/36] | 01 /
Hansen, Craig 650 Yerba Santa Avenue Los Altos, CA 94022 / US | ||
02 /
Massalin, Alexia 6631 Buddingwell Place San Jose, CA 95120 / US | |||
03 /
Moussouris, John P.O. Box 719 Palo Alto, CA 94303 / US | Representative(s) | Clark, Jane Anne, et al Mathys & Squire The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/36] | Clark, Jane Anne, et al Mathys & Squire LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2SQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 10167233.5 | 12.07.2004 | [2010/36] | Priority number, date | US20030616303 | 10.07.2003 Original published format: US 616303 | [2010/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2226725 | Date: | 08.09.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/36] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2226725 | Date: | 03.11.2010 | [2010/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.10.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G06F12/00, G06F11/10 | [2010/42] | CPC: |
G06F9/3001 (EP,US);
G06F12/02 (EP,US);
G06F30/39 (EP,US);
G06F30/392 (EP,US);
G06F30/398 (EP,US);
G06F9/30 (US);
G06F9/30007 (EP,US);
G06F9/30014 (EP,US);
G06F9/30018 (EP,US);
G06F9/30029 (EP,US);
G06F9/30032 (EP,US);
G06F9/30036 (EP,US);
G06F9/30038 (EP);
G06F9/3004 (EP,US);
G06F9/30043 (EP,US);
G06F9/30054 (EP,US);
G06F9/30098 (US);
G06F9/30101 (EP,US);
G06F9/30109 (EP,US);
G06F9/30112 (EP,US);
G06F9/30145 (EP,US);
G06F9/30149 (US);
G06F9/3016 (EP,US);
G06F9/30167 (EP,US);
G06F9/323 (EP);
G06F9/35 (EP,US);
G06F9/383 (EP,US);
G06F9/3851 (EP,US);
G06F9/3861 (EP,US);
G06F9/3885 (EP,US);
G06F9/4484 (EP,US);
G06F9/45533 (EP,US);
H03M13/158 (EP,US);
H03M13/4169 (EP,US);
G03F1/36 (US);
G06F2119/18 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2010/36] | G06F12/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/36] | Title | German: | Programmierbarer Prozessor und Verfahren mit breitem Betrieb | [2010/36] | English: | Programmable processor and method with wide operations | [2010/36] | French: | Processeur programmable et procédé avec opérations vastes | [2010/36] | Examination procedure | 03.05.2011 | Examination requested [2011/24] | 04.05.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/44] | 17.06.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2011/44] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP04756853.0 / EP1652090 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20040756853) is 26.11.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US5170399 (CAMERON KELLY [US], et al); | [Y]WO0023875 (MICROUNITY SYSTEMS ENG [US], et al); | by applicant | US5742840 | US5794060 | US5794061 | US5809321 | US5812439 | US5822603 | US5953241 | US6006318 | US6295599 | US20010922319 |