EP2285084 - System and method for integrating audio and visual messaging [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 04.09.2015 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.09.2015 | Refusal of application | published on 07.10.2015 [2015/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THOMPSON INVESTMENT GROUP, LLC c/o Bruce Dizenfeld, Esq., Stephan, Oringher, Richman & Theodora, P.C., 2029 Century Park East, 6th Floor Los Angeles, California 90067-2907 / US | For all designated states Helferich, Richard J. 8408 Sterling Bridge Road Chapel Hill North Carolina 27516 / US | [2011/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Helferich, Richard J. 8408 Sterling Bridge Road Chapel Hill, NC 27516 / US | [2011/07] | Representative(s) | Kennington, Eric Alasdair Scott & York Intellectual Property Ltd 45 Grosvenor Road St Albans, Hertfordshire AL1 3AW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/07] | Kennington, Eric Alasdair Scott & York Intellectual Property Ltd 45 Grosvenor Road GB-St Albans, Hertfordshire AL1 3AW / GB | Application number, filing date | 10181938.1 | 29.03.2000 | [2011/07] | Priority number, date | US19990126939P | 29.03.1999 Original published format: US 126939 P | US19990155055P | 21.09.1999 Original published format: US 155055 P | US19990408841 | 30.09.1999 Original published format: US 408841 | [2011/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2285084 | Date: | 16.02.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/07] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2285084 | Date: | 20.07.2011 | [2011/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.06.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H04M3/533, H04W84/04, H04L12/58, H04W84/02 | [2011/07] | CPC: |
H04W4/12 (EP,US);
G06Q10/063 (EP,US);
H04L12/6418 (EP,US);
H04L51/00 (US);
H04L51/56 (EP,US);
H04M3/5307 (EP,US);
H04L2012/6421 (EP,US);
H04L2012/6472 (EP,US);
H04L2012/6475 (EP,US);
H04L2012/6481 (EP,US);
H04L2012/6483 (EP,US);
H04L51/58 (EP,US);
H04M1/2757 (EP,US);
H04M1/72436 (EP,US);
H04W88/08 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2011/07] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Integration von Audio und visueller Mitteilungsübermittlung | [2011/07] | English: | System and method for integrating audio and visual messaging | [2011/07] | French: | Système et procédé d'integration de messageries audio et visuelles | [2011/07] | Examination procedure | 03.01.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.01.2012 | Examination requested [2012/07] | 15.02.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.05.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.03.2015 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2015/41] | 31.03.2015 | Date of oral proceedings | 21.05.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2015/41] | 21.05.2015 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP00918483.9 / EP1166542 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20000918483) is 05.07.2004 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 29.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 29.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 29.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 14.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 11.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 12.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2015 | 16   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0631419 (VMX INC [US]) [Y] 1-15 * page 12, lines 9-22 * * page 3, line 39 - page 4, line 15 *; | [Y]EP0777394 (ALCATEL BELL NV [BE]) [Y] 1-15 * abstract *; | [Y]WO9858476 (TELECOM WIRELESS SOLUTIONS INC [US]) [Y] 1-15 * abstract ** page 4, line 10 - page 13, line 5 * | Examination | EP0821536 |