EP2421367 - ALLANTOIN ADMINISTRATION FOR THE TREATMENT OF NEURODEGENERATIVE DISEASE AND NEUROTRAUMA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.11.2015 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.11.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.12.2015 [2015/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states University Of Cincinnati 51 Goodman Drive Suite 240 Cincinnati, OH 45221-0829 / US | [2012/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TERPSTRA, Brian, T. 645 Gatewood Drive Lowell IN 46356 / US | 02 /
SORTWELL, Caryl, E. 553 Madison Avenue South East Grand Rapids MI 49503 / US | [2012/09] | Representative(s) | LC Patents Kempische Steenweg 542A 3500 Hasselt / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/09] | Laenen, Bart Roger Albert, et al LC Services BVBA Crutzenstraat 24 3500 Hasselt / BE | Application number, filing date | 10767828.6 | 23.04.2010 | WO2010US32201 | Priority number, date | US20090172019P | 23.04.2009 Original published format: US 172019 P | [2012/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010124185 | Date: | 28.10.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2421367 | Date: | 29.02.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.10.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 28.10.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.04.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/4166, A61K9/00, A61P25/14, A61P25/16, A61P25/28, A61K45/06 | [2012/18] | CPC: |
A61K31/37 (EP,US);
A61K31/4166 (EP,US);
A61K31/57 (EP,US);
A61K31/60 (EP,US);
A61K38/1816 (EP,US);
A61K38/49 (EP,US);
A61K45/06 (EP,US);
A61K9/0024 (EP,US);
A61K9/0053 (EP,US);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/14 (EP);
A61P25/16 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/37, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/4166, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/57, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/60, A61K2300/00 (US);
A61K31/60, A61K2300/00, A61K38/1816, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K38/1816, A61K2300/00, A61K38/49, A61K2300/00 (US); |
Former IPC [2012/09] | A01N43/50 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/09] | Title | German: | VERABREICHUNG VON ALLANTOIN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON NEURODEGENERATIVEN ERKRANKUNGEN UND NEUROTRAUMA | [2012/09] | English: | ALLANTOIN ADMINISTRATION FOR THE TREATMENT OF NEURODEGENERATIVE DISEASE AND NEUROTRAUMA | [2012/09] | French: | ADMINISTRATION D'ALLANTOÏNE POUR LE TRAITEMENT D'UNE MALADIE NEURODÉGÉNÉRATIVE ET D'UN TRAUMATISME NEUROLOGIQUE | [2012/09] | Entry into regional phase | 17.11.2011 | National basic fee paid | 17.11.2011 | Search fee paid | 17.11.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.11.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.11.2011 | Examination requested [2012/09] | 02.11.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.01.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.03.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.02.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.07.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/50] | 05.08.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/50] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 31.01.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2015 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IY] - INGRID ZITNANOVÁ ET AL, "Uric acid and allantoin levels in Down syndrome: antioxidant and oxidative stress mechanisms?", CLINICA CHIMICA ACTA, (20040301), vol. 341, no. 1-2, doi:10.1016/j.cccn.2003.11.020, ISSN 0009-8981, pages 139 - 146, XP055019981 [I] 1-15 * page 145 * [Y] 1-4,6-11,13,14 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.cccn.2003.11.020 | [Y] - M. K. KUTZING ET AL, "Altered Uric Acid Levels and Disease States", JOURNAL OF PHARMACOLOGY AND EXPERIMENTAL THERAPEUTICS, (20080101), vol. 324, no. 1, doi:10.1124/jpet.107.129031, ISSN 0022-3565, pages 1 - 7, XP055019987 [Y] 1-4,6-11,13,14 * page 6 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1124/jpet.107.129031 | [Y] - X. GAO ET AL, "Diet, Urate, and Parkinson's Disease Risk in Men", AMERICAN JOURNAL OF EPIDEMIOLOGY, (20080401), vol. 167, no. 7, doi:10.1093/aje/kwm385, ISSN 0002-9262, pages 831 - 838, XP055019990 [Y] 1-4,6-11,13,14 * page 836 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/aje/kwm385 | [Y] - SCHWARZSCHILD MICHAEL A ET AL, "Serum urate as a predictor of clinical and radiographic progression in Parkinson disease.", ARCHIVES OF NEUROLOGY JUN 2008 LNKD- PUBMED:18413464, (200806), vol. 65, no. 6, ISSN 1538-3687, pages 716 - 723, XP002670070 [Y] 1-4,6-11,13,14 * page 719 - page 720 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1001/archneur.2008.65.6.nct70003 | International search | [X]US2009004281 (NGHIEM TIEN [IE], et al); | [Y]US2005186158 (KADDURAH-DAOUK RIMA [US]) |