EP2583528 - MANAGING PACKET DATA NETWORK, PDN, CONNECTIVITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2013/17] | MANAGING PACKET DATA NETWORK, PDN CONNECTIVITY | ||
[2019/01] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.07.2020 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 21.06.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.01.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Qualcomm Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121 / US | [2013/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HORN, Gavin, Bernard 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego California 92121 / US | 02 /
GRIOT, Miguel 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego California92121 / US | 03 /
SUBRAMANIAN, Ramachandran 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego California 92121 / US | [2013/17] | Representative(s) | Schmidbauer, Andreas Konrad Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | [2019/30] |
Former [2013/17] | Schmidbauer, Andreas Konrad Wagner & Geyer Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11728150.1 | 17.06.2011 | [2019/30] | WO2011US40992 | Priority number, date | US201113161416 | 15.06.2011 Original published format: US201113161416 | US201161435389P | 24.01.2011 Original published format: US 201161435389 P | US20100355918P | 17.06.2010 Original published format: US 355918 P | [2013/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011160091 | Date: | 22.12.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2583528 | Date: | 24.04.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.12.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2583528 | Date: | 24.07.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.12.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H04W76/10 | [2019/01] | CPC: |
H04W8/082 (EP,US);
H04W48/08 (EP,KR,US);
H04W76/11 (US);
H04W48/20 (KR);
H04W76/10 (EP,US);
H04W8/186 (US);
|
Former IPC [2013/17] | H04W76/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/17] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERWALTUNG DER KONNEKTIVITÄT EINES PAKETDATENNETZES | [2019/01] | English: | MANAGING PACKET DATA NETWORK, PDN, CONNECTIVITY | [2019/01] | French: | GESTION DE CONNECTIVITÉ DE RÉSEAU À COMMUTATION DE PAQUETS | [2019/01] |
Former [2013/17] | VERWALTUNG EINES PAKETDATENNETZES, PDN-KONNEKTIVITÄT | ||
Former [2013/17] | MANAGING PACKET DATA NETWORK, PDN CONNECTIVITY | ||
Former [2013/17] | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL POUR GÉRER UNE CONNECTIVITÉ DE RÉSEAU À COMMUTATION DE PAQUETS | Entry into regional phase | 17.01.2013 | National basic fee paid | 17.01.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.01.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.01.2013 | Examination requested [2013/17] | 12.08.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.03.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.09.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.01.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.05.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 03.05.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.05.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.03.2018 | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 08.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.06.2011 | AL | 24.07.2019 | AT | 24.07.2019 | CY | 24.07.2019 | CZ | 24.07.2019 | DK | 24.07.2019 | EE | 24.07.2019 | ES | 24.07.2019 | FI | 24.07.2019 | HR | 24.07.2019 | IT | 24.07.2019 | LT | 24.07.2019 | LV | 24.07.2019 | MC | 24.07.2019 | MK | 24.07.2019 | MT | 24.07.2019 | NL | 24.07.2019 | PL | 24.07.2019 | RO | 24.07.2019 | RS | 24.07.2019 | SE | 24.07.2019 | SI | 24.07.2019 | SK | 24.07.2019 | SM | 24.07.2019 | TR | 24.07.2019 | BG | 24.10.2019 | NO | 24.10.2019 | GR | 25.10.2019 | IS | 24.11.2019 | PT | 25.11.2019 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 17.06.2011 | |
AL | 24.07.2019 | ||
AT | 24.07.2019 | ||
CY | 24.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 24.07.2019 | ||
DK | 24.07.2019 | ||
EE | 24.07.2019 | ||
ES | 24.07.2019 | ||
FI | 24.07.2019 | ||
HR | 24.07.2019 | ||
IT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LV | 24.07.2019 | ||
MC | 24.07.2019 | ||
MT | 24.07.2019 | ||
NL | 24.07.2019 | ||
PL | 24.07.2019 | ||
RO | 24.07.2019 | ||
RS | 24.07.2019 | ||
SE | 24.07.2019 | ||
SI | 24.07.2019 | ||
SK | 24.07.2019 | ||
SM | 24.07.2019 | ||
TR | 24.07.2019 | ||
BG | 24.10.2019 | ||
NO | 24.10.2019 | ||
GR | 25.10.2019 | ||
IS | 24.11.2019 | ||
PT | 25.11.2019 | ||
Former [2021/12] | AL | 24.07.2019 | |
AT | 24.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 24.07.2019 | ||
DK | 24.07.2019 | ||
EE | 24.07.2019 | ||
ES | 24.07.2019 | ||
FI | 24.07.2019 | ||
HR | 24.07.2019 | ||
IT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LV | 24.07.2019 | ||
MC | 24.07.2019 | ||
NL | 24.07.2019 | ||
PL | 24.07.2019 | ||
RO | 24.07.2019 | ||
RS | 24.07.2019 | ||
SE | 24.07.2019 | ||
SI | 24.07.2019 | ||
SK | 24.07.2019 | ||
SM | 24.07.2019 | ||
TR | 24.07.2019 | ||
BG | 24.10.2019 | ||
NO | 24.10.2019 | ||
GR | 25.10.2019 | ||
IS | 24.11.2019 | ||
PT | 25.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 24.07.2019 | |
AT | 24.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 24.07.2019 | ||
DK | 24.07.2019 | ||
EE | 24.07.2019 | ||
ES | 24.07.2019 | ||
FI | 24.07.2019 | ||
HR | 24.07.2019 | ||
IT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LV | 24.07.2019 | ||
NL | 24.07.2019 | ||
PL | 24.07.2019 | ||
RO | 24.07.2019 | ||
RS | 24.07.2019 | ||
SE | 24.07.2019 | ||
SI | 24.07.2019 | ||
SK | 24.07.2019 | ||
SM | 24.07.2019 | ||
TR | 24.07.2019 | ||
BG | 24.10.2019 | ||
NO | 24.10.2019 | ||
GR | 25.10.2019 | ||
IS | 24.11.2019 | ||
PT | 25.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 24.07.2019 | |
AT | 24.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 24.07.2019 | ||
DK | 24.07.2019 | ||
EE | 24.07.2019 | ||
ES | 24.07.2019 | ||
FI | 24.07.2019 | ||
HR | 24.07.2019 | ||
IT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LV | 24.07.2019 | ||
NL | 24.07.2019 | ||
PL | 24.07.2019 | ||
RO | 24.07.2019 | ||
RS | 24.07.2019 | ||
SE | 24.07.2019 | ||
SK | 24.07.2019 | ||
SM | 24.07.2019 | ||
TR | 24.07.2019 | ||
BG | 24.10.2019 | ||
NO | 24.10.2019 | ||
GR | 25.10.2019 | ||
IS | 24.11.2019 | ||
PT | 25.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/27] | AL | 24.07.2019 | |
AT | 24.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 24.07.2019 | ||
DK | 24.07.2019 | ||
EE | 24.07.2019 | ||
ES | 24.07.2019 | ||
FI | 24.07.2019 | ||
HR | 24.07.2019 | ||
IT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LV | 24.07.2019 | ||
NL | 24.07.2019 | ||
PL | 24.07.2019 | ||
RO | 24.07.2019 | ||
RS | 24.07.2019 | ||
SE | 24.07.2019 | ||
SK | 24.07.2019 | ||
SM | 24.07.2019 | ||
TR | 24.07.2019 | ||
BG | 24.10.2019 | ||
NO | 24.10.2019 | ||
GR | 25.10.2019 | ||
PT | 25.11.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 24.07.2019 | |
AT | 24.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 24.07.2019 | ||
DK | 24.07.2019 | ||
EE | 24.07.2019 | ||
ES | 24.07.2019 | ||
FI | 24.07.2019 | ||
HR | 24.07.2019 | ||
IT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LV | 24.07.2019 | ||
NL | 24.07.2019 | ||
PL | 24.07.2019 | ||
RO | 24.07.2019 | ||
RS | 24.07.2019 | ||
SE | 24.07.2019 | ||
SK | 24.07.2019 | ||
TR | 24.07.2019 | ||
BG | 24.10.2019 | ||
NO | 24.10.2019 | ||
GR | 25.10.2019 | ||
PT | 25.11.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | AL | 24.07.2019 | |
AT | 24.07.2019 | ||
DK | 24.07.2019 | ||
EE | 24.07.2019 | ||
ES | 24.07.2019 | ||
FI | 24.07.2019 | ||
HR | 24.07.2019 | ||
IT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LV | 24.07.2019 | ||
NL | 24.07.2019 | ||
PL | 24.07.2019 | ||
RO | 24.07.2019 | ||
RS | 24.07.2019 | ||
SE | 24.07.2019 | ||
TR | 24.07.2019 | ||
BG | 24.10.2019 | ||
NO | 24.10.2019 | ||
GR | 25.10.2019 | ||
PT | 25.11.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | AL | 24.07.2019 | |
AT | 24.07.2019 | ||
DK | 24.07.2019 | ||
EE | 24.07.2019 | ||
ES | 24.07.2019 | ||
FI | 24.07.2019 | ||
HR | 24.07.2019 | ||
IT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LV | 24.07.2019 | ||
NL | 24.07.2019 | ||
PL | 24.07.2019 | ||
RO | 24.07.2019 | ||
RS | 24.07.2019 | ||
SE | 24.07.2019 | ||
TR | 24.07.2019 | ||
BG | 24.10.2019 | ||
NO | 24.10.2019 | ||
GR | 25.10.2019 | ||
IS | 24.11.2019 | ||
PT | 25.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/22] | AL | 24.07.2019 | |
AT | 24.07.2019 | ||
DK | 24.07.2019 | ||
EE | 24.07.2019 | ||
ES | 24.07.2019 | ||
FI | 24.07.2019 | ||
HR | 24.07.2019 | ||
LT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LV | 24.07.2019 | ||
NL | 24.07.2019 | ||
RS | 24.07.2019 | ||
SE | 24.07.2019 | ||
TR | 24.07.2019 | ||
BG | 24.10.2019 | ||
NO | 24.10.2019 | ||
GR | 25.10.2019 | ||
IS | 24.11.2019 | ||
PT | 25.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 24.07.2019 | |
AT | 24.07.2019 | ||
ES | 24.07.2019 | ||
FI | 24.07.2019 | ||
HR | 24.07.2019 | ||
LT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LV | 24.07.2019 | ||
NL | 24.07.2019 | ||
RS | 24.07.2019 | ||
SE | 24.07.2019 | ||
TR | 24.07.2019 | ||
BG | 24.10.2019 | ||
NO | 24.10.2019 | ||
GR | 25.10.2019 | ||
IS | 24.11.2019 | ||
PT | 25.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/15] | AL | 24.07.2019 | |
AT | 24.07.2019 | ||
ES | 24.07.2019 | ||
FI | 24.07.2019 | ||
HR | 24.07.2019 | ||
LT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LV | 24.07.2019 | ||
NL | 24.07.2019 | ||
RS | 24.07.2019 | ||
SE | 24.07.2019 | ||
BG | 24.10.2019 | ||
NO | 24.10.2019 | ||
GR | 25.10.2019 | ||
IS | 24.11.2019 | ||
PT | 25.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | AT | 24.07.2019 | |
ES | 24.07.2019 | ||
FI | 24.07.2019 | ||
HR | 24.07.2019 | ||
LT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LV | 24.07.2019 | ||
NL | 24.07.2019 | ||
RS | 24.07.2019 | ||
SE | 24.07.2019 | ||
BG | 24.10.2019 | ||
NO | 24.10.2019 | ||
GR | 25.10.2019 | ||
IS | 24.11.2019 | ||
PT | 25.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AT | 24.07.2019 | |
ES | 24.07.2019 | ||
FI | 24.07.2019 | ||
HR | 24.07.2019 | ||
LT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LV | 24.07.2019 | ||
NL | 24.07.2019 | ||
RS | 24.07.2019 | ||
SE | 24.07.2019 | ||
BG | 24.10.2019 | ||
NO | 24.10.2019 | ||
GR | 25.10.2019 | ||
PT | 25.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | AT | 24.07.2019 | |
FI | 24.07.2019 | ||
LT | 24.07.2019 | ||
NL | 24.07.2019 | ||
SE | 24.07.2019 | ||
BG | 24.10.2019 | ||
NO | 24.10.2019 | ||
PT | 25.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | FI | 24.07.2019 | |
LT | 24.07.2019 | ||
NL | 24.07.2019 | ||
NO | 24.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | LT | 24.07.2019 | |
NL | 24.07.2019 | ||
NO | 24.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/07] | NL | 24.07.2019 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2005083899 (BABBAR UPPINDER [US], et al) [A] 47-63 * abstract ** paragraphs [0013] , [0031] - [0033] - [0048] , [0058] *; | [Y]US2008285492 (VESTERINEN SEPPO [FI]) [Y] 48-50,52,53,55,56,58,59,61-63 * abstract * * paragraphs [0005] , [0007] , [0027] - [0036] - [0056] - [0074] - [0083] , [0084] , [0093] , [0094] *; | [A]US2010061386 (OLSSON LASSE [SE], et al) [A] 47-63 * paragraphs [0036] - [0042] *; | [E]WO2011085373 (RESEARCH IN MOTION LTD [CA], et al) [E] 36-46 * paragraphs [0079] - [0084] - [0138] , [0141] , [0164] - [0167] - [0175] - [0179] - [0239] - [0262] *; | [XY] - LG ELECTRONICS, "Considerations in choice of solutions for LIPA Indications to UE", 3GPP DRAFT; S2-102363, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20100504), vol. SA WG2, no. Kyoto; 20100510, XP050434536 [X] 1,7,9,10,15,16,21,22,27,28,33,35 * the whole document * [Y] 2-6,8,11-14,17-20,23-26,29-32,34 | [Y] - LG ELECTRONICS ET AL, "Call flows for LIPA Solution 1 Variant 1 with collocated H(e)NB and L-GW", 3GPP DRAFT; S2-102941_WAS2883_WAS2492_LIPA_SOL1_VAR1_COLLOCATED_V3, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20100514), vol. SA WG2, no. Kyoto; 20100510, XP050435031 [Y] 2-5,8,11-13,17-19,23-25,29-31,34 * the whole document * | [Y] - NEC, "Support of operator control for SIPTO/LIPA traffic", 3GPP DRAFT; S2-095291, no. Kyoto; 20090904, (20090825), URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_sa/WG2_Arch/TSGS2_75_Kyoto/docs/, (20090825), XP050396780 [Y] 6,14,20,26,32 * the whole document * | [A] - "3GPP 23.829 V1.1.0 (2010-05) - Local IP Access and Selected IP Traffic Offload (Release 10)", (20100528), URL: www.3gpp.org, (20110920), XP055007603 [A] 36-46 * Section 5.2.3.1.2 * | [XY] - ALCATEL-LUCENT ET AL, "Restructuration of TR 23.829", 3GPP DRAFT; S2-101719 WAS 1449_23829 RESTRUCTURING_R0, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20100225), vol. SA WG2, no. San Francisco, USA; 20100222, XP050434102 [X] 47,51,54,57,60 * Section 5.7.4 * [Y] 48-50,52,53,55,56,58,59,61-63 | Examination | US2009305699 | WO2012100199 |