EP2624645 - SUSPENDING AND RESUMING PACKET SWITCHED SERVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2013/32] | SERVICE PROCESSING METHOD, BASEBAND PROCESSING CHIP AND TERMINAL | ||
[2017/43] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.01.2019 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 26.01.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Spreadtrum Communications (Shanghai) Co., Ltd. Building No.1, Spreadtrum Center Lane 2288, Zuchongzhi Road Zhangjiang High-Tech Park Pudongxinqu District Shanghai 201203 / CN | [2018/08] |
Former [2013/32] | For all designated states Spreadtrum Communications (Shanghai) Co., Ltd. Building 1, Spreadtrum Center No. 2288, Zuchongzhi Road Zhangjiang High Tech Park Podong District Shanghai 201203 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHANG, Zhi Spreadtrum Center Building No. 1 Lane 2288 Zuchongzhi Road Zhangjiang High-Tech Park, Pudongxinqu District Shanghai 201203 / CN | 02 /
LIU, Jiwu Spreadtrum Center Building No. 1 Lane 2288 Zuchongzhi Road Zhangjiang High-Tech Park, Pudongxinqu District Shanghai 201203 / CN | 03 /
CHEN, Xianliang Spreadtrum Center Building No. 1 Lane 2288 Zuchongzhi Road Zhangjiang High-Tech Park, Pudongxinqu District Shanghai 201203 / CN | 04 /
GAO, Xichun Spreadtrum Center Building No. 1 Lane 2288 Zuchongzhi Road Zhangjiang High-Tech Park, Pudongxinqu District Shanghai 201203 / CN | 05 /
XU, Yuan Spreadtrum Center Building No. 1 Lane 2288 Zuchongzhi Road Zhangjiang High-Tech Park, Pudongxinqu District Shanghai 201203 / CN | 06 /
LU, Wenbo Spreadtrum Center Building No. 1 Lane 2288 Zuchongzhi Road Zhangjiang High-Tech Park, Pudongxinqu District Shanghai 201203 / CN | 07 /
ZHANG, Ma Spreadtrum Center Building No. 1 Lane 2288 Zuchongzhi Road Zhangjiang High-Tech Park, Pudongxinqu District Shanghai 201203 / CN | 08 /
HU, Yingping Spreadtrum Center Building No. 1 Lane 2288 Zuchongzhi Road Zhangjiang High-Tech Park, Pudongxinqu District Shanghai 201203 / CN | [2013/32] | Representative(s) | Westphal, Mussgnug & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Am Riettor 5 78048 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE | [2018/09] |
Former [2013/32] | Patentanwälte Westphal, Mussgnug & Partner Am Riettor 5 78048 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE | Application number, filing date | 11870887.4 | 12.08.2011 | [2018/09] | WO2011CN78339 | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013023341 | Date: | 21.02.2013 | Language: | ZH | [2013/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2624645 | Date: | 07.08.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2624645 | Date: | 28.02.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 21.02.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.03.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H04W36/00, // H04W68/12, H04W60/04 | [2017/43] | CPC: |
H04W36/00224 (EP,US);
H04W4/16 (US);
H04W60/04 (EP,US);
H04W68/12 (EP,US);
H04W8/183 (US)
|
Former IPC [2015/24] | H04W36/22, H04W88/06, H04W68/12 | ||
Former IPC [2013/32] | H04W68/12 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/32] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUSSETZEN UND FORTSETZEN EINES PAKETVERMITTLUNGSDIENSTES | [2018/08] | English: | SUSPENDING AND RESUMING PACKET SWITCHED SERVICE | [2017/43] | French: | SUSPENDRE ET RÉTABLIR UN SERVICE DE COMMUTATION DE PAQUETS | [2017/43] |
Former [2013/32] | DIENSTVERARBEITUNGSVERFAHREN, BASISBANDVERARBEITUNGSCHIP UND ENDGERÄT DAFÜR | ||
Former [2013/32] | SERVICE PROCESSING METHOD, BASEBAND PROCESSING CHIP AND TERMINAL | ||
Former [2013/32] | PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT DE SERVICE, PUCE DE TRAITEMENT DANS LA BANDE DE BASE ET TERMINAL CORRESPONDANT | Entry into regional phase | 29.04.2013 | Translation filed | 29.04.2013 | National basic fee paid | 29.04.2013 | Search fee paid | 29.04.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.04.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.04.2013 | Examination requested [2013/32] | 23.10.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.10.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.01.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 16.01.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.01.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.10.2017 | Opposition(s) | 29.11.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 12.08.2011 | AL | 28.02.2018 | AT | 28.02.2018 | CY | 28.02.2018 | CZ | 28.02.2018 | DK | 28.02.2018 | EE | 28.02.2018 | ES | 28.02.2018 | FI | 28.02.2018 | HR | 28.02.2018 | IT | 28.02.2018 | LT | 28.02.2018 | LV | 28.02.2018 | MC | 28.02.2018 | MK | 28.02.2018 | NL | 28.02.2018 | PL | 28.02.2018 | PT | 28.02.2018 | RO | 28.02.2018 | RS | 28.02.2018 | SE | 28.02.2018 | SI | 28.02.2018 | SK | 28.02.2018 | SM | 28.02.2018 | TR | 28.02.2018 | BG | 28.05.2018 | NO | 28.05.2018 | GR | 29.05.2018 | IS | 28.06.2018 | GB | 12.08.2018 | IE | 12.08.2018 | LU | 12.08.2018 | MT | 12.08.2018 | BE | 31.08.2018 | CH | 31.08.2018 | FR | 31.08.2018 | LI | 31.08.2018 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 12.08.2011 | |
AL | 28.02.2018 | ||
AT | 28.02.2018 | ||
CY | 28.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.02.2018 | ||
DK | 28.02.2018 | ||
EE | 28.02.2018 | ||
ES | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
HR | 28.02.2018 | ||
IT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LV | 28.02.2018 | ||
MC | 28.02.2018 | ||
MK | 28.02.2018 | ||
NL | 28.02.2018 | ||
PL | 28.02.2018 | ||
PT | 28.02.2018 | ||
RO | 28.02.2018 | ||
RS | 28.02.2018 | ||
SE | 28.02.2018 | ||
SI | 28.02.2018 | ||
SK | 28.02.2018 | ||
SM | 28.02.2018 | ||
TR | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 28.05.2018 | ||
NO | 28.05.2018 | ||
GR | 29.05.2018 | ||
GB | 12.08.2018 | ||
IE | 12.08.2018 | ||
LU | 12.08.2018 | ||
MT | 12.08.2018 | ||
BE | 31.08.2018 | ||
CH | 31.08.2018 | ||
FR | 31.08.2018 | ||
LI | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2020/27] | HU | 12.08.2011 | |
AL | 28.02.2018 | ||
AT | 28.02.2018 | ||
CY | 28.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.02.2018 | ||
DK | 28.02.2018 | ||
EE | 28.02.2018 | ||
ES | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
HR | 28.02.2018 | ||
IT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LV | 28.02.2018 | ||
MC | 28.02.2018 | ||
NL | 28.02.2018 | ||
PL | 28.02.2018 | ||
PT | 28.02.2018 | ||
RO | 28.02.2018 | ||
RS | 28.02.2018 | ||
SE | 28.02.2018 | ||
SI | 28.02.2018 | ||
SK | 28.02.2018 | ||
SM | 28.02.2018 | ||
TR | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 28.05.2018 | ||
NO | 28.05.2018 | ||
GR | 29.05.2018 | ||
GB | 12.08.2018 | ||
IE | 12.08.2018 | ||
LU | 12.08.2018 | ||
MT | 12.08.2018 | ||
BE | 31.08.2018 | ||
CH | 31.08.2018 | ||
FR | 31.08.2018 | ||
LI | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 28.02.2018 | |
AT | 28.02.2018 | ||
CY | 28.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.02.2018 | ||
DK | 28.02.2018 | ||
EE | 28.02.2018 | ||
ES | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
HR | 28.02.2018 | ||
IT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LV | 28.02.2018 | ||
MC | 28.02.2018 | ||
NL | 28.02.2018 | ||
PL | 28.02.2018 | ||
RO | 28.02.2018 | ||
RS | 28.02.2018 | ||
SE | 28.02.2018 | ||
SI | 28.02.2018 | ||
SK | 28.02.2018 | ||
SM | 28.02.2018 | ||
TR | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 28.05.2018 | ||
NO | 28.05.2018 | ||
GR | 29.05.2018 | ||
GB | 12.08.2018 | ||
IE | 12.08.2018 | ||
LU | 12.08.2018 | ||
MT | 12.08.2018 | ||
BE | 31.08.2018 | ||
CH | 31.08.2018 | ||
FR | 31.08.2018 | ||
LI | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 28.02.2018 | |
AT | 28.02.2018 | ||
CY | 28.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.02.2018 | ||
DK | 28.02.2018 | ||
EE | 28.02.2018 | ||
ES | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
HR | 28.02.2018 | ||
IT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LV | 28.02.2018 | ||
MC | 28.02.2018 | ||
NL | 28.02.2018 | ||
PL | 28.02.2018 | ||
RO | 28.02.2018 | ||
RS | 28.02.2018 | ||
SE | 28.02.2018 | ||
SI | 28.02.2018 | ||
SK | 28.02.2018 | ||
SM | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 28.05.2018 | ||
NO | 28.05.2018 | ||
GR | 29.05.2018 | ||
GB | 12.08.2018 | ||
IE | 12.08.2018 | ||
LU | 12.08.2018 | ||
MT | 12.08.2018 | ||
BE | 31.08.2018 | ||
CH | 31.08.2018 | ||
FR | 31.08.2018 | ||
LI | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/47] | AL | 28.02.2018 | |
AT | 28.02.2018 | ||
CY | 28.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.02.2018 | ||
DK | 28.02.2018 | ||
EE | 28.02.2018 | ||
ES | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
HR | 28.02.2018 | ||
IT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LV | 28.02.2018 | ||
MC | 28.02.2018 | ||
NL | 28.02.2018 | ||
PL | 28.02.2018 | ||
RO | 28.02.2018 | ||
RS | 28.02.2018 | ||
SE | 28.02.2018 | ||
SI | 28.02.2018 | ||
SK | 28.02.2018 | ||
SM | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 28.05.2018 | ||
NO | 28.05.2018 | ||
GR | 29.05.2018 | ||
GB | 12.08.2018 | ||
IE | 12.08.2018 | ||
LU | 12.08.2018 | ||
BE | 31.08.2018 | ||
CH | 31.08.2018 | ||
FR | 31.08.2018 | ||
LI | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/38] | AL | 28.02.2018 | |
AT | 28.02.2018 | ||
CY | 28.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.02.2018 | ||
DK | 28.02.2018 | ||
EE | 28.02.2018 | ||
ES | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
HR | 28.02.2018 | ||
IT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LV | 28.02.2018 | ||
MC | 28.02.2018 | ||
NL | 28.02.2018 | ||
PL | 28.02.2018 | ||
RO | 28.02.2018 | ||
RS | 28.02.2018 | ||
SE | 28.02.2018 | ||
SI | 28.02.2018 | ||
SK | 28.02.2018 | ||
SM | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 28.05.2018 | ||
NO | 28.05.2018 | ||
GR | 29.05.2018 | ||
IE | 12.08.2018 | ||
LU | 12.08.2018 | ||
BE | 31.08.2018 | ||
CH | 31.08.2018 | ||
FR | 31.08.2018 | ||
LI | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/33] | AL | 28.02.2018 | |
AT | 28.02.2018 | ||
CY | 28.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.02.2018 | ||
DK | 28.02.2018 | ||
EE | 28.02.2018 | ||
ES | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
HR | 28.02.2018 | ||
IT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LV | 28.02.2018 | ||
MC | 28.02.2018 | ||
NL | 28.02.2018 | ||
PL | 28.02.2018 | ||
RO | 28.02.2018 | ||
RS | 28.02.2018 | ||
SE | 28.02.2018 | ||
SI | 28.02.2018 | ||
SK | 28.02.2018 | ||
SM | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 28.05.2018 | ||
NO | 28.05.2018 | ||
GR | 29.05.2018 | ||
IE | 12.08.2018 | ||
LU | 12.08.2018 | ||
CH | 31.08.2018 | ||
LI | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/21] | AL | 28.02.2018 | |
AT | 28.02.2018 | ||
CY | 28.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.02.2018 | ||
DK | 28.02.2018 | ||
EE | 28.02.2018 | ||
ES | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
HR | 28.02.2018 | ||
IT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LV | 28.02.2018 | ||
MC | 28.02.2018 | ||
NL | 28.02.2018 | ||
PL | 28.02.2018 | ||
RO | 28.02.2018 | ||
RS | 28.02.2018 | ||
SE | 28.02.2018 | ||
SI | 28.02.2018 | ||
SK | 28.02.2018 | ||
SM | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 28.05.2018 | ||
NO | 28.05.2018 | ||
GR | 29.05.2018 | ||
LU | 12.08.2018 | ||
CH | 31.08.2018 | ||
LI | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/15] | AL | 28.02.2018 | |
AT | 28.02.2018 | ||
CY | 28.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.02.2018 | ||
DK | 28.02.2018 | ||
EE | 28.02.2018 | ||
ES | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
HR | 28.02.2018 | ||
IT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LV | 28.02.2018 | ||
MC | 28.02.2018 | ||
NL | 28.02.2018 | ||
PL | 28.02.2018 | ||
RO | 28.02.2018 | ||
RS | 28.02.2018 | ||
SE | 28.02.2018 | ||
SI | 28.02.2018 | ||
SK | 28.02.2018 | ||
SM | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 28.05.2018 | ||
NO | 28.05.2018 | ||
GR | 29.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/13] | AL | 28.02.2018 | |
AT | 28.02.2018 | ||
CY | 28.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.02.2018 | ||
DK | 28.02.2018 | ||
EE | 28.02.2018 | ||
ES | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
HR | 28.02.2018 | ||
IT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LV | 28.02.2018 | ||
NL | 28.02.2018 | ||
PL | 28.02.2018 | ||
RO | 28.02.2018 | ||
RS | 28.02.2018 | ||
SE | 28.02.2018 | ||
SI | 28.02.2018 | ||
SK | 28.02.2018 | ||
SM | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 28.05.2018 | ||
NO | 28.05.2018 | ||
GR | 29.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AL | 28.02.2018 | |
AT | 28.02.2018 | ||
CY | 28.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.02.2018 | ||
DK | 28.02.2018 | ||
EE | 28.02.2018 | ||
ES | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
HR | 28.02.2018 | ||
IT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LV | 28.02.2018 | ||
NL | 28.02.2018 | ||
PL | 28.02.2018 | ||
RO | 28.02.2018 | ||
RS | 28.02.2018 | ||
SE | 28.02.2018 | ||
SK | 28.02.2018 | ||
SM | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 28.05.2018 | ||
NO | 28.05.2018 | ||
GR | 29.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | AL | 28.02.2018 | |
AT | 28.02.2018 | ||
CY | 28.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.02.2018 | ||
DK | 28.02.2018 | ||
EE | 28.02.2018 | ||
ES | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
HR | 28.02.2018 | ||
IT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LV | 28.02.2018 | ||
NL | 28.02.2018 | ||
PL | 28.02.2018 | ||
RO | 28.02.2018 | ||
RS | 28.02.2018 | ||
SE | 28.02.2018 | ||
SK | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 28.05.2018 | ||
NO | 28.05.2018 | ||
GR | 29.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AL | 28.02.2018 | |
AT | 28.02.2018 | ||
CY | 28.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.02.2018 | ||
EE | 28.02.2018 | ||
ES | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
HR | 28.02.2018 | ||
IT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LV | 28.02.2018 | ||
NL | 28.02.2018 | ||
PL | 28.02.2018 | ||
RO | 28.02.2018 | ||
RS | 28.02.2018 | ||
SE | 28.02.2018 | ||
SK | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 28.05.2018 | ||
NO | 28.05.2018 | ||
GR | 29.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | AL | 28.02.2018 | |
AT | 28.02.2018 | ||
CY | 28.02.2018 | ||
ES | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
HR | 28.02.2018 | ||
IT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LV | 28.02.2018 | ||
NL | 28.02.2018 | ||
RS | 28.02.2018 | ||
SE | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 28.05.2018 | ||
NO | 28.05.2018 | ||
GR | 29.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 28.02.2018 | |
AT | 28.02.2018 | ||
CY | 28.02.2018 | ||
ES | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
HR | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LV | 28.02.2018 | ||
NL | 28.02.2018 | ||
RS | 28.02.2018 | ||
SE | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 28.05.2018 | ||
NO | 28.05.2018 | ||
GR | 29.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | AT | 28.02.2018 | |
CY | 28.02.2018 | ||
ES | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
HR | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LV | 28.02.2018 | ||
NL | 28.02.2018 | ||
RS | 28.02.2018 | ||
SE | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 28.05.2018 | ||
NO | 28.05.2018 | ||
GR | 29.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 28.02.2018 | |
CY | 28.02.2018 | ||
ES | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
HR | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LV | 28.02.2018 | ||
NL | 28.02.2018 | ||
RS | 28.02.2018 | ||
SE | 28.02.2018 | ||
NO | 28.05.2018 | ||
GR | 29.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CY | 28.02.2018 | |
ES | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
HR | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
NL | 28.02.2018 | ||
NO | 28.05.2018 | ||
GR | 29.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/36] | CY | 28.02.2018 | |
ES | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
HR | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
NL | 28.02.2018 | ||
NO | 28.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | CY | 28.02.2018 | |
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
HR | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
NL | 28.02.2018 | ||
NO | 28.05.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2419258 (SIEMENS AG [DE]); | [A]WO2006137762 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE], et al); | [A]WO2010122029 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE], et al); | [I]WO2010128200 (NOKIA CORP [FI], et al); | [A]US2011122809 (YUN JI-HOON [KR], et al) | International search | [A]CN101500212 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]); | [X]CN101690358 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M); | [A]US2011122862 (YUN JI-HOON [KR], et al) |