EP2798530 - CONTEXT-BASED DEVICE ACTION PREDICTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 19.04.2019 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2019 | Refusal of application | published on 22.05.2019 [2019/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052 / US | [2015/22] |
Former [2014/45] | For all designated states Microsoft Corporation One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHU, David c/o Microsoft Corporation LCA - International Patents One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 02 /
KANSAL, Aman c/o Microsoft Corporation LCA - International Patents One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 03 /
LIU, Jie c/o Microsoft Corporation LCA - International Patents One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 04 /
YAN, Tingxin c/o Microsoft Corporation LCA - International Patents One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | [2014/45] | Representative(s) | CMS Cameron McKenna Nabarro Olswang LLP Cannon Place 78 Cannon Street London EC4N 6AF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/45] | Fischer, Michael Maria, et al Olswang Germany LLP IP Rosental 4 80331 Munich / DE | Application number, filing date | 12863619.8 | 19.12.2012 | WO2012US70431 | Priority number, date | US201113340702 | 30.12.2011 Original published format: US201113340702 | [2014/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013101567 | Date: | 04.07.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2798530 | Date: | 05.11.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.07.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 04.07.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.05.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/44, G06F9/445, G06N99/00 | [2015/23] | CPC: |
G06F9/451 (EP,US);
G06F9/445 (EP,US);
G06N20/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2014/45] | G06F17/20, G06F3/048, G06F15/16, G06F9/30 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/45] | Title | German: | KONTEXTBASIERTE AKTIONSVORHERSAGE FÜR EINE VORRICHTUNG | [2014/45] | English: | CONTEXT-BASED DEVICE ACTION PREDICTION | [2014/45] | French: | PRÉDICTION D'ACTION DE DISPOSITIF BASÉE SUR LE CONTEXTE | [2014/45] | Entry into regional phase | 25.06.2014 | National basic fee paid | 25.06.2014 | Search fee paid | 25.06.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.06.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.06.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.06.2014 | Examination requested [2014/45] | 13.05.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.08.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.09.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.03.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.11.2018 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2019/21] | 21.11.2018 | Date of oral proceedings | 03.01.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2019/21] | 03.01.2019 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.05.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2004193813 (NGUYEN PHUONG VIET [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0022] *; | [A]US2011028138 (DAVIES-MOORE ALEXANDER [GB], et al) [A] 1-11* paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0055] *; | [XI] - DAVID CHU AMAN KANSAL JIE LIU FENG ZHAO MICROSOFT RESEARCH REDMOND, "Mobile Apps: It's Time to Move Up to CondOS", USENIX,, (20110415), pages 1 - 5, XP061010139 [X] 1-8 * the whole document * [I] 9-11 | [A] - DAISUKE KAMISAKA ET AL, "Operation Prediction for Context-Aware User Interfaces of Mobile Phones", APPLICATIONS AND THE INTERNET, 2009. SAINT '09. NINTH ANNUAL INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON, New York, New York, USA, (20090720), doi:10.1109/SAINT.2009.12, ISBN 978-0-7695-3700-9, pages 16 - 22, XP055106610 [A] 1-11 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/SAINT.2009.12 | [A] - MATTHIAS BÖHMER ET AL, "Falling asleep with Angry Birds, Facebook and Kindle", MOBILEHCI '11 PROCEEDINGS OF THE 13TH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON HUMAN COMPUTER INTERACTION WITH MOBILE DEVICES AND SERVICES, (20110830), doi:10.1145/2037373.2037383, ISBN 978-1-45-030541-9, page 47, XP055145079 [A] 1-11 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/2037373.2037383 | International search | [A]US2006155664 (MORIKAWA KOJI [JP], et al); | [Y]US2009224867 (O'SHAUGHNESSY KEVIN MICHAEL [IE], et al); | [A]US2010112955 (KRISHNASWAMY DILIP [US], et al); | [A]US2011014933 (KARMARKAR AMIT [US], et al); | [Y]US2011078758 (KOHLENBERG TOBIAS M [US], et al) |