EP2658106 - BRIDGELESS POWER FACTOR CORRECTION CIRCUIT AND METHOD FOR CONTROL THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.12.2015 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.12.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.01.2016 [2016/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2013/44] | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHEN, Wenbin Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
DAI, Shengyong Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 03 /
HUANG, Boning Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2013/44] | Representative(s) | Körber, Martin Hans Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sonnenstrasse 33 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/44] | Körber, Martin Hans Mitscherlich & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sonnenstrasse 33 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12865547.9 | 01.11.2012 | WO2012CN83907 | Priority number, date | CN2012128511 | 09.02.2012 Original published format: CN201210028511 | [2013/44] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013117091 | Date: | 15.08.2013 | Language: | ZH | [2013/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2658106 | Date: | 30.10.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 15.08.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.12.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H02M1/42, H02M3/158 | [2015/04] | CPC: |
H02M1/4225 (EP,US);
H02M1/14 (US);
H02M1/4208 (US);
H02M1/0043 (EP,US);
H02M1/0085 (EP,US);
H02M3/1586 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2013/44] | H02M1/42 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/44] | Title | German: | BRÜCKENLOSE LEISTUNGSFAKTORKORREKTURSCHALTUNG UND STEUERVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2013/44] | English: | BRIDGELESS POWER FACTOR CORRECTION CIRCUIT AND METHOD FOR CONTROL THEREOF | [2013/44] | French: | CIRCUIT DE CORRECTION DE FACTEUR DE PUISSANCE SANS PONT ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE | [2013/44] | Entry into regional phase | 24.07.2013 | Translation filed | 24.07.2013 | National basic fee paid | 24.07.2013 | Search fee paid | 24.07.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.07.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.07.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.07.2013 | Examination requested [2013/44] | 23.07.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/03] | 02.09.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2003102818 (SHEN ERIC B [US]) [A] 1-13 * figure 4 ** paragraph [0038] - paragraph [0040] *; | [A]CN1864319 (INT RECTIFIER CORP [US]) [A] 1-13 * figures 8-13 *; | [I] - MARXGUT C ET AL, "Interleaved Triangular Current Mode (TCM) resonant transition, single phase PFC rectifier with high efficiency and high power density", 2010 INTERNATIONAL POWER ELECTRONICS CONFERENCE : IPEC-SAPPORO 2010 - [ECCE ASIA] ; SAPPORO, JAPAN, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20100621), ISBN 978-1-4244-5394-8, pages 1725 - 1732, XP031727538 [I] 1-13 * figure 3(b) * * figure 4 * * figures 7-8 * * page 1726 - page 1729 * | International search | [Y]CN1600048 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL]); | [Y]CN1864319 (INT RECTIFIER CORP [US]); | [A]CN102035364 (CHENGDU MONOLITHIC POWER SYSTEM CO LTD); | [A]US2011149622 (LIN PAO-HUNG [TW]); | [XP]CN102545582 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD) |