EP2886641 - Method for obtaining palytoxin from palythoa aff. clavata, and specific uses of palytoxin [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.05.2016 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.05.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.06.2016 [2016/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Institut de Recherche pour le Développement Le Sextant 44 bd de Dunkerque CS 90009 13572 Marseille Cedex 02 / FR | For all designated states Coral Biome SARL 163, Avenue de Luminy Zone Luminy entreprises, Case 922 13288 Marseille Cedex 09 / FR | [2015/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DETOURNAY Olivier 4 chemin de Mordeau 13190 ALLAUCH / FR | 02 /
LORQUIN Jean 1195 chemin de la Fontaine de cinq sous 83330 LE BEAUSSET / FR | 03 /
GAULT Frèdéric Chemin de la Pierra Mouraou Allée du Ganeou 83330 LE BEAUSSET / FR | [2015/26] | Representative(s) | Barbot, Willy, et al Simodoro-ip 82, rue Sylvabelle 13006 Marseille / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2015/26] | Barbot, Willy, et al SIMODORO-ip 1 place des Prêcheurs 13100 Aix-en-Provence / FR | Application number, filing date | 13197854.6 | 17.12.2013 | [2015/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2886641 | Date: | 24.06.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.07.2014 | Classification | IPC: | C12N1/12, C07D493/08, A61K31/357, A61P35/00, A61P31/00, A61P17/00 | [2015/26] | CPC: |
A61K31/357 (EP,US);
A61K35/614 (EP,US);
A61K9/0019 (US);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P31/00 (EP);
A61P33/00 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/02 (EP);
C07D493/08 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/03] |
Former [2015/26] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Gewinnung von Palytoxin aus palythoa aff. clavata, und spezielle Verwendungen von Palytoxin | [2015/26] | English: | Method for obtaining palytoxin from palythoa aff. clavata, and specific uses of palytoxin | [2015/26] | French: | Procédé permettant d'obtenir la palytoxine à partir de palythoa aff. clavata et utilisations spécifiques de la palytoxine | [2015/26] | Examination procedure | 10.12.2015 | Examination requested [2016/03] | 05.01.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/25] | 01.02.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2016/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2013012997 (UNIV LOUISIANA STATE [US], et al) [X] 21 * page 1, paragraph 2 * * claims 1-15 *; | [A] - JAMES D REIMER ET AL, "Molecular identification of symbiotic dinoflagellates (Symbiodinium spp.) from Palythoa spp. (Anthozoa: Hexacorallia) in Japan", CORAL REEFS ; JOURNAL OF THE INTERNATIONAL SOCIETY FOR REEF STUDIES, SPRINGER, BERLIN, DE, (20060914), vol. 25, no. 4, doi:10.1007/S00338-006-0151-4, ISSN 1432-0975, pages 521 - 527, XP019459567 [A] 1-12 * abstract * * page 521, column 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00338-006-0151-4 | [XA] - R. J. QUINN ET AL, "Anticancer activity of zoanthids and the associated toxin, palytoxin, against ehrlich ascites tumor and P-388 lymphocytic leukemia in mice", JOURNAL OF PHARMACEUTICAL SCIENCES, (19740201), vol. 63, no. 2, doi:10.1002/jps.2600630217, ISSN 0022-3549, pages 257 - 260, XP055113357 [X] 21 * abstract * * page 258; table 1 * * page 259; tables II, III * * page 260; table IV * [A] 1-12 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/jps.2600630217 | [A] - JAMES DAVIS REIMER ET AL, "Species Diversity of Shallow Water Zoanthids (Cnidaria: Anthozoa: Hexacorallia) in Florida", JOURNAL OF MARINE BIOLOGY, (20120101), vol. 10, no. 5114, doi:10.1046/j.1365-294X.2002.01652.x, ISSN 1687-9481, pages 57 - 14, XP055113398 [A] 1-12 * page 3; table 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1155/2012/856079 | [A] - HIDESHI NAKAMURA ET AL, "Studies on Polyketide Metabolites of a Symbiotic Dinoflagellate, Symbiodinium sp", BULLETIN OF THE CHEMICAL SOCIETY OF JAPAN, (19980101), vol. 71, no. 4, ISSN 0009-2673, page 781, XP055113408 [A] 1-12 * abstract * * page 782; figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1246/bcsj.71.781 | [ID] - BERESS L ET AL, "A method for the isolation of the caribbean palytoxin (C-PTX) from the coelenterate (zooanthid) Palythoa caribaeorum", TOXICON, ELMSFORD, NY, US, vol. 21, no. 2, doi:10.1016/0041-0101(83)90013-2, ISSN 0041-0101, (19830101), pages 285 - 290, (19830101), XP025508816 [ID] 1-12 * abstract * * page 285 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0041-0101(83)90013-2 | [A] - NAKAMURA H ET AL, "Isolation of zooxanthellatoxins, novel vasoconstrictive substances from the zooxanthella Symbiodinium sp", TOXICON, ELMSFORD, NY, US, vol. 31, no. 4, doi:10.1016/0041-0101(93)90172-F, ISSN 0041-0101, (19930401), pages 371 - 376, (19930401), XP025828057 [A] 1-12 * page 371 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0041-0101(93)90172-F | [ID] - JONATHAN R. DEEDS ET AL, "Palytoxin Found in Palythoa sp. Zoanthids (Anthozoa, Hexacorallia) Sold in the Home Aquarium Trade", PLOS ONE, (20110101), vol. 6, no. 4, doi:10.1371/journal.pone.0018235, ISSN 1932-6203, page e18235, XP055113680 [ID] 1-12 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/journal.pone.0018235 | [X] - TIBOR GÖRÖGH ET AL, "Head and neck cancer cells and xenografts are very sensitive to palytoxin: decrease of c-jun n-terminale kinase-3 expression enhances palytoxin toxicity", MOLECULAR CANCER, BIOMED CENTRAL, LONDON, GB, (20130214), vol. 12, no. 1, doi:10.1186/1476-4598-12-12, ISSN 1476-4598, page 12, XP021141886 [X] 21 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/1476-4598-12-12 | [X] - CARMEN LOUZAO M ET AL, "Palytoxins and cytoskeleton: An overview", TOXICON, ELMSFORD, NY, US, vol. 57, no. 3, doi:10.1016/J.TOXICON.2010.09.017, ISSN 0041-0101, (20100928), pages 460 - 469, (20101007), XP028172532 [X] 21 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.toxicon.2010.09.017 | [X] - MIRELLA BELLOCCI ET AL, "The cytolytic and cytotoxic activities of palytoxin", TOXICON, ELMSFORD, NY, US, vol. 57, no. 3, doi:10.1016/J.TOXICON.2010.12.013, ISSN 0041-0101, (20101220), pages 449 - 459, (20101229), XP028172531 [X] 21 * 3. Conclusions and perspectives; page 456 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.toxicon.2010.12.013 | by applicant | - APPRILL AM; RD GATES, "Recognizing diversity in coral symbiotic dinoflagellate communities", MOL. ECOL., (2007), vol. 16, pages 1127 - 1134 | - BAKER AC., "Flexibility and specificity in coral-algal symbiosis: diversity, ecology and biogeography of Symbiodinium", ANNU. REV. ECOL. EVOL. SYST., (2003), vol. 34, pages 661 - 689 | - BERESS L; J ZWICK; HJ KOLKENBROCK; PN KAUL; 0 WASSERMANN, "A method for the isolation of the caribbean palytoxin (C-PTX) from the coelenterate (zooanthid) Palythoa caribaeorum", TOXICON, (1983), vol. 21, pages 285 - 290 | - BERKELMANS R; MJH VAN OPPEN, "The role of zooxanthellae in the thermal tolerance of corals: a 'nugget of hope' for coral reefs in an era of climate change", PROC. R. SOC. LOND. B, (2006), vol. 273, pages 2305 - 2312 | - BRANLE F; F LEFRANC; I CAMBY; J JEUKEN; A GEURTS-MOESPOT; S SPRENGER; F SWEEP; R KISS R; I SALMON, "Evaluation of the efficiency of chemotherapy in in vivo orthotopic models of human glioma cells with and without lp/19q deletions and in C6 rat orthotopic allografts serving for the evaluation of surgery combined with chemotherapy", CANCER, (2002), vol. 95, pages 641 - 655 | - CHARLSON AT; NA ZELIADT NA; EV WATTENBERG, "Extracellular signal regulated kinase 5 mediates signals triggered by the novel tumor promoter palytoxin", TOXICOL APPL PHARMACOL, (2009), vol. 241, pages 143 - 153 | - CIMINIELLO P; C DELL'AVERSANO; E FATTORUSSO; M FORINO; L TARTAGLIONE; C GRILLO; N MELCHIORRE, "Putative palytoxin and its new analogue, ovatoxin-a, in Ostreopsis ovata collected along the Ligurian Coasts during the 2006 toxic outbreak", J. AM. SOC. MASS. SPECTROM., (2008), vol. 19, pages 111 - 120 | - CIMINIELLO P; C DELL'AVERSANO; E DELLOLACOVO; E FATTORUSSO; M FORINO; L GRAUSO; L TARTAGLIONE; C FLORIO; P LORENZON; M DE BORTOLI, "Stereostructure and biological activity of 42-hydroxy-palytoxin: a new palytoxin analogue from Hawaiian Palythoa subspecies", CHEM. RES. TOXICOL., (2009), vol. 22, pages 1851 - 1859 | - CIMINIELLO P; C DELL'AVERSANO; E DELLOLACOVO; E FATTORUSSO; M FORINO; L TARTAGLIONE, "LC-MS of palytoxin and its analogues: state of the art and future perspectives", TOXICON, (2011), vol. 57, pages 376 - 380 | - COFFROTH MA; SR SANTOS, "Genetic diversity of symbiotic dinoflagellates in the genus Symbiodinium", PROTIST, (2005), vol. 156, pages 19 - 34 | - DEBEIR 0; V MEGALIZZIB; N WARZEEA; R KISS; C DECAESTECKERA, "Videomicroscopic extraction of specific information on cell proliferation and migration in vitro", EXP. CELL RES., (2008), vol. 314, pages 2985 - 2998 | - DEL FAVERO G; C FLORIO; B CODAN; S SOSA; M POLI; 0 SBAIZERO; J MOLGO; A TUBARO; P LORENZON, "The stretch-activated channel blocker gd3+ reduces palytoxin toxicity in primary cultures of skeletal muscle cells", CHEM RES TOXICOL, (2012), vol. 25, pages 1912 - 1920 | - DEEDS JR; SM HANDY; K WHITE; JD REIMER, "Palytoxin found in Palythoa sp. Zoanthids (Anthozoa, Hexacorallia) sold in the home aquarium trade", PLOS ONE, (2011), vol. 6, pages 1 - 9 | - EDGAR RC, "MUSCLE: multiple sequence alignment with high accuracy and high throughput", NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, (2004), vol. 32, pages 1792 - 1797 | - FREDERICK R; C BRUYERE; C VANCRAEYNEST; J RENIERS; C MEINGUET; L POCHET; A BACKLUND; B MASEREEL; R KISS; J WOUTERS, "Novel trisubstituted harmine derivatives with original in vitro anticancer activity", J. MED. CHEM., (2012), vol. 55, pages 6489 - 6501 | - FORCIOLI D; PL MERLE; C CALIGARA; M CIOSI; C MUTI; P FRANCOUR; C CERRANO; D ALLEMAND, "Symbiont diversity is not involved in depth acclimation in the Mediterranean sea whip Eunicella singularis", MAR. ECOL. PROG. SER., (2011), vol. 439, pages 57 - 71 | - GLEIBS S; D MEBS; B WEERDING, "Studies on the origin and distribution of palytoxin in a Caribbean coral reef", TOXICON, (1995), vol. 33, pages 1531 - 1537 | - GÖRÖGH T; L BERESS; ES QUABIUS; P AMBROSCH; M HOFFMANN; HEAD; NECK, "cancer cells and xenografts are very sensitive to palytoxin: decrease of c-jun n-terminal kinase-3 expression enhances palytoxin toxicity", MOLECULAR CANCER, (2013), vol. 12, pages 1 - 11 | - GUILLARD RRL; JH RYTHER, "Studies of marine planktonic diatoms. I. Cyclotella nana Hustedt and Detonula confervacea Cleve", CAN. J. MICROBIOL., (1962), vol. 8, pages 229 - 239 | - HILGEMAN DW., "From a pump to a pore: how palytoxin opens the gates", PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA, (2003), vol. 100, pages 386 - 388 | - "Photoadaptation, photo acclimation and niche diversification in invertebrate-dinoflagellate symbioses", IGLESIAS-PRIETO R; RK TRENCH, Proceedings of the 8th International Coral Reef Symposium, SMITHSONIAN TROPICAL RESEARCH INSTITUTE, (1997), vol. 2, pages 1319 - 1324 | - INGRASSIA L; F LEFRANC; J DEWELLE; L POTTIER; V MATHIEU; S SPIEGL-KREINECKER; S SAUVAGE; M EL YAZIDI; M DEHOUX; W BERGER, "Structure-activity- relationship analysis of novel derivatives of narciclasine (an Amaryllidaceae isocarbostyril alkaloid) as potential anti-cancer agents", JMED CHEM, (2009), vol. 52, pages 1100 - 1114 | - JOHANNES RE; WJ WIEBE, "Method for determination of coral tissue biomass and composition", LIMNOL. OCEANOGR., (1970), vol. 15, pages 822 - 824 | - KAN Y; D UEMURA; Y HIRATA; M ISHIGURO; T IWASHITA, "Complete NMR signal assignment of palytoxin and N-acetylpalytoxin", TETRAHEDRON LETT, (2001), vol. 42, pages 3197 - 3202 | - "Chemistry of palytoxins and ostreocins", KATIKOU P., Phycotoxins, Chemistry and Biochemistry, BLACKWELL PUBLISHING, (2007), pages 75 - 93 | - KERBRAT AS; Z AMZIL; R PAWLOWIEZ; S GOLUBIC; M SIBAT; HT DARIUS; M CHINAIN; D LAURENT, "First evidence of palytoxin and 42-hydroxy-palytoxin in the marine cyanobacterium Trichodesmium", MAR. DRUGS, (2011), vol. 9, pages 543 - 560 | - KIMURA S; K HASHIMOTO, "Purification of the toxin in a zoanthid Palythoa tuberculosa", PUBL. SETO. MAR. BIOL. LAB., (1973), vol. 20, pages 713 - 718 | - LEFRANC F; I CAMBY; N BELOT; E BRUYNEEL; C CHABOTEAUX; J BROTCHI; M MAREEL; I SALMON; R KISS, "Gastrin significantly modifies the migratory abilities of experimental glioma cells", LAB INVEST, (2002), vol. 82, pages 1241 - 1252 | - LEFRANC F; T MIJATOVIC; Y KONDO; S SAUVAGE; I ROLAND; D KRSTIC; V VASIC; P GAILLY; S KONDO; G BLANCO, "Targeting the alpha-1 subunit of the sodium pump (the Na+/K+-ATPase) to combat glioblastoma cells", NEUROSURGERY, (2008), vol. 62, pages 211 - 222 | - LENOIR S; L TEN-HAGE; J TURQUET; JP QUOD; C BERNARD; MC HENNION, "First evidence of palytoxin analogues from an Ostreopsis mascarenensis (Dinophyceae) benthic bloom in southwestern Indian Ocean", J. PHYCOL., (2004), vol. 40, pages 1042 - 1051 | - LOUZAO MC; IR ARES; E CAGIDE, "Marine toxins and the cytoskeleton: a new view of palytoxin toxicity", FEBS J, (2008), vol. 275, pages 6067 - 6074 | - LOUZAO MC; IR ARES; E CAGIDE; B ESPINA; N VILARINO; A ALFONSO; MR VIEYTES; LM BOTANA, "Palytoxins and cytoskeleton: An overview", TOXICON, (2011), vol. 57, pages 460 - 469 | - MIJATOVIC T; V MATHIEU; JF GAUSSIN; N DE NEVE; F RIBAUCOUR; E VAN QUAQUEBEKE; P DUMONT; F DARRO; R KISS, "Cardenolide-induced lysosomal membrane permeabilization contributes therapeutic benefits in experimental human non-small-cell-lung cancers", NEOPLASIA, (2006), vol. 8, pages 402 - 412 | - MIJATOVIC T; I ROLAND; E VAN QUAQUEBEKE; B NILSSON; A MATHIEU; F VAN VYNCKT; F DARRO; G BLANCO; V FACCHINI; R KISS, "The alpha- subunit of the sodium pump could represent a novel target to combat non-small cell lung cancers", JPATHOL, (2007), vol. 212, pages 170 - 179 | - MIJATOVIC T; E VAN QUAQUEBEKE; B DELEST; 0 DEBEIR; F DARRO; R KISS, "Cardiotonic steroids on the road to anti-cancer therapy", BBA REV CANCER, (2007), vol. 1776, pages 32 - 57 | - MOORE RE; PJ SCHEUER, "Palytoxin, new marine toxin from a Coelenterate", SCIENCE, (1971), vol. 172, pages 495 - 498 | - MORERA C; MA VILLANUEVA, "Heat treatment and viability assessment by Evans blue in cultured Symbiodinium kawagutii cells", WORLD J. MICROBIOL. BIOTECHNOL, (2009), vol. 25, pages 1125 - 1128 | - OKU N; NU SATA; S MATSUNAGA; H UCHIDA; N FUSETANI, "Identification of palytoxin as a principle which causes morphological changes inrat 3Y1 cells in the zoanthid Palythoa aff. margaritae", TOXICON, (2004), vol. 43, pages 21 - 25 | - PAZ B; P RIOBO; JM FRANCO, "Preliminary study for rapid determination of phycotoxins in microalgae whole cells using matrix-assisted laser desorption ionization time-of-flight mass spectrometry", RAPID COMMUN. MASS SPECTROM., (2011), vol. 25, pages 3627 - 3639 | - PELIN M; BOSCOLO S; POLI M; SOSA S; TUBARO A; C FLORIO, "Characterization ofpalytoxin binding to HaCaT cells using a monoclonal anti-palytoxin antibody", MAR. DRUGS, (2013), vol. 11, pages 584 - 598 | - PEY A; T ZAMOUM; D ALLEMAND; P FURLA; PL MERLE, "Depth dependant thermotolerance of the symbiotic Mediterranean gorgonian Eunicella singularis: evidence from cellular stress markers", J. EXP. MAR. BIOL. ECOL., (2011), vol. 404, pages 73 - 78 | - POCHON X; RD GATES, "A new Symbiodinium clade (Dinophyceae) from soritid foraminifera in Hawai'i", MOL. PHYLOGENET. EVOL., (2010), vol. 56, pages 492 - 497 | - QUINN RJ; M KASHIWAGI; RE MOORE; TR NORTON, "Anticancer activity of zoanthids and the associated toxin, palytoxin, against ehrlich ascites tumor and p-388 lymphocytic leukemia in mice", J. PHARMAC SCI, (1974), vol. 63, pages 257 - 260 | - RAMOS V; V VASCONCELOS, "Palytoxin and analogs: Biological and ecological effects", MAR. DRUGS, (2010), vol. 8, pages 2021 - 2037 | - REIMER JD; C FOORD; Y IREI, "Species Diversity of Shallow Water Zoanthids (Cnidaria: Anthozoa: Hexacorallia) in Florida", J. MARINE BIOL., (2012), pages 1 - 14 | - RICHIER S; PL MERLE; P FURLA; D PIGOZZI; F SOLA; D ALLEMAND, "Characterization of superoxide dismutases in anoxia- and hyperoxia-tolerant symbiotic cnidarians", BIOCHIM. BIOPHYS. ACTA, (2003), vol. 1621, pages 84 - 91 | - RODRIGUES AM; ACG ALMEIDA; AFC INFANTOSI, "Effect of palytoxin on the sodiumpotassium pump: model and simulation", PHYS BIOL, (2008), vol. 5, page 036005 | - ROSSI R; V CASTELLANO; E SCALCO; L SERPE; A ZINGONE; V SOPRANO, "New palytoxin-like molecules in Mediterranean Ostreopsis cf. ovata (dinoflagellates) and in Palythoa tuberculosa detected by liquid chromatography-electrospray ionization time-of-flight mass spectrometry", TOXICON, (2010), vol. 56, pages 1381 - 1387 | - ROSSINI GP; A BIGIANI, "Palytoxin action on the Na+,K+-ATPase and the disruption of ion equilibria in biological systems", TOXICON, (2011), vol. 57, pages 429 - 439 | - ROWAN R., "Coral bleaching: thermal adaptation in reef coral symbionts", NATURE, (2004), vol. 430, page 742 | - SANTIAGO-VAZQUEZ L; RANZER L; R KERR., "Comparison of two total RNA extraction protocols using the marine gorgonian coral Pseudopterogorgia elizabethae and its symbiont Symbiodinium sp", ELECTRON. J. BIOTECHNOL., (2006), vol. 9 | - SATOH E; T ISHII T; M NISHIMURA, "Palytoxin-induced increase in cytosolic-free Ca2+ in mouse spleen cells", EUR J PHARMACOL, (2003), vol. 465, pages 9 - 13 | - STAT M; E MORRIS; RD GATES, "Functional diversity in coral-dinoflagellate symbiosis", PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI., (2008), vol. 105, pages 9256 - 9261 | - STAT M; RD GATES, "Clade D Symbiodinium in scleractinian corals: a ''nugget'' of hope, a selfish opportunist, an ominous sign, or all of the above?", J. MAR. BIOL., (2011), page E730715 | - TAMURA K; D PETERSON; N PETERSON; G STECHER; M NEI; S KUMAR, "MEGA 5: Molecular Evolutionary Genetics Analysis using Maximum Likelihood, Evolutionary Distance, and Maximum Parsimony Methods", MOLECULAR BIOLOGY AND EVOLUTION, (2011), vol. 28, pages 2731 - 2739 | - TANIYAMA S; 0 ARAKAWA; M TERADA; S NISHIO; T TAKATANI; Y MAHMUD; T NOGUCHI, "Ostreopsis sp., a possible origin of palytoxin (PTX) in parrot fish Scarusovifrons", TOXICON, (2003), vol. 42, pages 29 - 33 | - TCHERNOV D; MY GORBUNOV; C DE VARGAS; S NARAYAN YADAV; AJ MILLIGAN; M HAGGBLOM; PG FALKOWSKI, "Membrane lipids of symbiotic algae are diagnostic of sensitivity to thermal bleaching in corals", PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI., (2004), vol. 101, pages 13531 - 13535 | - UEMURA D; Y HIRATA; T IWASHITA; H NAOKI, "Studies on palytoxins", TETRAHEDRON, (1985), vol. 41, pages 1007 - 1117 | - UKENA T; M SATAKE; M USAMI; Y OSHIMA; H NAOKI; T FUJITA; Y KAN; T YASUMOTO, "Structure elucidation of ostreocin d, a palytoxin analog isolated from the dinoflagellate Ostreopsis siamensis", BIOSCI. BIOTECHNOL. BIOCHEM., (2001), vol. 65, pages 2585 - 2588 | - VALVERDE I; J LAGO; A REBOREDA; JM VIEITES; AG CABADO, "Characteristics of palytoxin-induced cytotoxicity in neuroblastoma cells", TOXICOL. IN VITRO, (2008), vol. 22, pages 1432 - 1439 | - VAN GOIETSENOVEN G; J HUTTON; JP BECKER; B LALLEMAND; F ROBERT; F LEFRANC; C PIRKER; G VANDENBUSSCHE; P VAN ANTWERPEN; A EVIDENTE, "Targeting of eEFIA with Amaryllidaceae isocarbostyrils as a strategy to combat melanomas", FASEB J, (2010), vol. 24, pages 4575 - 4584 | - WARNER ME; WKFITT; GW SCHMIDT, "Damage to photosystem 11 in symbiotic dinoflagellates: a determinant of coral bleaching", PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI., (1999), vol. 96, pages 8007 - 8012 | - WATTENBERG EV, "Modulation of protein kinase signaling cascades by palytoxin", TOXICON, (2011), vol. 57, pages 440 - 448 | - WILES JS; JA VICK; MK CHRISTENSEN, "Toxicological evaluation of palytoxin in several animal species", TOXICON, (1974), vol. 12, pages 427 - 433 | - "Polyether toxins involved in seafood poisoning", YASUMOTO T; M MURATA, ACS Symposium Series, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, (1990), vol. 418, pages 120 - 132 | - ZAMOUM T; P FURLA, "Methods and techniques : Symbiodinium isolation by NaOH treatment", J. EXP. BIOL, (2012), vol. 215, pages 3875 - 3880 |