EP2807745 - IMPEDANCE MATCHING CIRCUIT WITH TUNABLE NOTCH FILTERS FOR POWER AMPLIFIER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.04.2021 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.04.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.12.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.06.2023 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 26.07.2023 [2023/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Qualcomm Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121 / US | [2014/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CABANILLAS, Jose 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121 / US | 02 /
PRESTI, Calogero D. 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121 / US | 03 /
NEJATI, Babak 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121 / US | 04 /
KLEMENS, Guy 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121 / US | [2014/49] | Representative(s) | Wimmer, Hubert Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | [2020/22] |
Former [2014/49] | Wimmer, Hubert WAGNER & GEYER Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13702861.9 | 23.01.2013 | [2020/22] | WO2013US22802 | Priority number, date | US201213356508 | 23.01.2012 Original published format: US201213356508 | [2014/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013112627 | Date: | 01.08.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2807745 | Date: | 03.12.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.08.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2807745 | Date: | 27.05.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.08.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H03H7/40 | [2014/49] | CPC: |
H03F3/245 (EP,US);
H03F1/565 (EP,US);
H03F3/19 (EP,US);
H03H7/38 (EP,US);
H03H2007/013 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/49] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | IMPEDANZANPASSUNGSSCHALTUNG MIT ABSTIMMBAREN KERBFILTERN FÜR LEISTUNGSVERSTÄRKER | [2014/49] | English: | IMPEDANCE MATCHING CIRCUIT WITH TUNABLE NOTCH FILTERS FOR POWER AMPLIFIER | [2014/49] | French: | CIRCUIT D'ADAPTATION D'IMPÉDANCE DOTÉ DE FILTRES COUPE BANDE ACCORDABLES DESTINÉ À UN AMPLIFICATEUR DE PUISSANCE | [2014/49] | Entry into regional phase | 22.08.2014 | National basic fee paid | 22.08.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.08.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.08.2014 | Examination requested [2014/49] | 02.03.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.06.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.11.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.11.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01) | 28.11.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.12.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.04.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 17.04.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.04.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.06.2017 | Opposition(s) | 02.03.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 09.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.01.2013 | AL | 27.05.2020 | AT | 27.05.2020 | CY | 27.05.2020 | CZ | 27.05.2020 | DK | 27.05.2020 | EE | 27.05.2020 | ES | 27.05.2020 | FI | 27.05.2020 | HR | 27.05.2020 | IT | 27.05.2020 | LT | 27.05.2020 | LV | 27.05.2020 | MC | 27.05.2020 | NL | 27.05.2020 | PL | 27.05.2020 | RO | 27.05.2020 | RS | 27.05.2020 | SE | 27.05.2020 | SI | 27.05.2020 | SK | 27.05.2020 | SM | 27.05.2020 | BG | 27.08.2020 | NO | 27.08.2020 | GR | 28.08.2020 | IS | 27.09.2020 | PT | 28.09.2020 | IE | 23.01.2021 | LU | 23.01.2021 | BE | 31.01.2021 | CH | 31.01.2021 | LI | 31.01.2021 | [2023/30] |
Former [2023/27] | HU | 23.01.2013 | |
AL | 27.05.2020 | ||
AT | 27.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 27.05.2020 | ||
DK | 27.05.2020 | ||
EE | 27.05.2020 | ||
ES | 27.05.2020 | ||
FI | 27.05.2020 | ||
HR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LV | 27.05.2020 | ||
MC | 27.05.2020 | ||
NL | 27.05.2020 | ||
PL | 27.05.2020 | ||
RO | 27.05.2020 | ||
RS | 27.05.2020 | ||
SE | 27.05.2020 | ||
SI | 27.05.2020 | ||
SK | 27.05.2020 | ||
SM | 27.05.2020 | ||
BG | 27.08.2020 | ||
NO | 27.08.2020 | ||
GR | 28.08.2020 | ||
IS | 27.09.2020 | ||
PT | 28.09.2020 | ||
IE | 23.01.2021 | ||
LU | 23.01.2021 | ||
BE | 31.01.2021 | ||
CH | 31.01.2021 | ||
LI | 31.01.2021 | ||
Former [2022/33] | AL | 27.05.2020 | |
AT | 27.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 27.05.2020 | ||
DK | 27.05.2020 | ||
EE | 27.05.2020 | ||
ES | 27.05.2020 | ||
FI | 27.05.2020 | ||
HR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LV | 27.05.2020 | ||
MC | 27.05.2020 | ||
NL | 27.05.2020 | ||
PL | 27.05.2020 | ||
RO | 27.05.2020 | ||
RS | 27.05.2020 | ||
SE | 27.05.2020 | ||
SI | 27.05.2020 | ||
SK | 27.05.2020 | ||
SM | 27.05.2020 | ||
BG | 27.08.2020 | ||
NO | 27.08.2020 | ||
GR | 28.08.2020 | ||
IS | 27.09.2020 | ||
PT | 28.09.2020 | ||
IE | 23.01.2021 | ||
LU | 23.01.2021 | ||
BE | 31.01.2021 | ||
CH | 31.01.2021 | ||
LI | 31.01.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AL | 27.05.2020 | |
AT | 27.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 27.05.2020 | ||
DK | 27.05.2020 | ||
EE | 27.05.2020 | ||
ES | 27.05.2020 | ||
FI | 27.05.2020 | ||
HR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LV | 27.05.2020 | ||
MC | 27.05.2020 | ||
NL | 27.05.2020 | ||
PL | 27.05.2020 | ||
RO | 27.05.2020 | ||
RS | 27.05.2020 | ||
SE | 27.05.2020 | ||
SI | 27.05.2020 | ||
SK | 27.05.2020 | ||
SM | 27.05.2020 | ||
BG | 27.08.2020 | ||
NO | 27.08.2020 | ||
GR | 28.08.2020 | ||
IS | 27.09.2020 | ||
PT | 28.09.2020 | ||
IE | 23.01.2021 | ||
LU | 23.01.2021 | ||
CH | 31.01.2021 | ||
LI | 31.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/52] | AL | 27.05.2020 | |
AT | 27.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 27.05.2020 | ||
DK | 27.05.2020 | ||
EE | 27.05.2020 | ||
ES | 27.05.2020 | ||
FI | 27.05.2020 | ||
HR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LV | 27.05.2020 | ||
MC | 27.05.2020 | ||
NL | 27.05.2020 | ||
PL | 27.05.2020 | ||
RO | 27.05.2020 | ||
RS | 27.05.2020 | ||
SE | 27.05.2020 | ||
SI | 27.05.2020 | ||
SK | 27.05.2020 | ||
SM | 27.05.2020 | ||
BG | 27.08.2020 | ||
NO | 27.08.2020 | ||
GR | 28.08.2020 | ||
IS | 27.09.2020 | ||
PT | 28.09.2020 | ||
LU | 23.01.2021 | ||
CH | 31.01.2021 | ||
LI | 31.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/43] | AL | 27.05.2020 | |
AT | 27.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 27.05.2020 | ||
DK | 27.05.2020 | ||
EE | 27.05.2020 | ||
ES | 27.05.2020 | ||
FI | 27.05.2020 | ||
HR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LV | 27.05.2020 | ||
MC | 27.05.2020 | ||
NL | 27.05.2020 | ||
PL | 27.05.2020 | ||
RO | 27.05.2020 | ||
RS | 27.05.2020 | ||
SE | 27.05.2020 | ||
SI | 27.05.2020 | ||
SK | 27.05.2020 | ||
SM | 27.05.2020 | ||
BG | 27.08.2020 | ||
NO | 27.08.2020 | ||
GR | 28.08.2020 | ||
IS | 27.09.2020 | ||
PT | 28.09.2020 | ||
LU | 23.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/40] | AL | 27.05.2020 | |
AT | 27.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 27.05.2020 | ||
DK | 27.05.2020 | ||
EE | 27.05.2020 | ||
ES | 27.05.2020 | ||
FI | 27.05.2020 | ||
HR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LV | 27.05.2020 | ||
MC | 27.05.2020 | ||
NL | 27.05.2020 | ||
PL | 27.05.2020 | ||
RO | 27.05.2020 | ||
RS | 27.05.2020 | ||
SE | 27.05.2020 | ||
SI | 27.05.2020 | ||
SK | 27.05.2020 | ||
SM | 27.05.2020 | ||
BG | 27.08.2020 | ||
NO | 27.08.2020 | ||
GR | 28.08.2020 | ||
IS | 27.09.2020 | ||
PT | 28.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AL | 27.05.2020 | |
AT | 27.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 27.05.2020 | ||
DK | 27.05.2020 | ||
EE | 27.05.2020 | ||
ES | 27.05.2020 | ||
FI | 27.05.2020 | ||
HR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LV | 27.05.2020 | ||
NL | 27.05.2020 | ||
PL | 27.05.2020 | ||
RO | 27.05.2020 | ||
RS | 27.05.2020 | ||
SE | 27.05.2020 | ||
SI | 27.05.2020 | ||
SK | 27.05.2020 | ||
SM | 27.05.2020 | ||
BG | 27.08.2020 | ||
NO | 27.08.2020 | ||
GR | 28.08.2020 | ||
IS | 27.09.2020 | ||
PT | 28.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 27.05.2020 | |
AT | 27.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 27.05.2020 | ||
DK | 27.05.2020 | ||
EE | 27.05.2020 | ||
ES | 27.05.2020 | ||
FI | 27.05.2020 | ||
HR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LV | 27.05.2020 | ||
NL | 27.05.2020 | ||
PL | 27.05.2020 | ||
RO | 27.05.2020 | ||
RS | 27.05.2020 | ||
SE | 27.05.2020 | ||
SK | 27.05.2020 | ||
SM | 27.05.2020 | ||
BG | 27.08.2020 | ||
NO | 27.08.2020 | ||
GR | 28.08.2020 | ||
IS | 27.09.2020 | ||
PT | 28.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AL | 27.05.2020 | |
AT | 27.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 27.05.2020 | ||
DK | 27.05.2020 | ||
EE | 27.05.2020 | ||
ES | 27.05.2020 | ||
FI | 27.05.2020 | ||
HR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LV | 27.05.2020 | ||
NL | 27.05.2020 | ||
RO | 27.05.2020 | ||
RS | 27.05.2020 | ||
SE | 27.05.2020 | ||
SM | 27.05.2020 | ||
BG | 27.08.2020 | ||
NO | 27.08.2020 | ||
GR | 28.08.2020 | ||
IS | 27.09.2020 | ||
PT | 28.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | AL | 27.05.2020 | |
DK | 27.05.2020 | ||
ES | 27.05.2020 | ||
FI | 27.05.2020 | ||
HR | 27.05.2020 | ||
LT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LV | 27.05.2020 | ||
NL | 27.05.2020 | ||
RO | 27.05.2020 | ||
RS | 27.05.2020 | ||
SE | 27.05.2020 | ||
SM | 27.05.2020 | ||
BG | 27.08.2020 | ||
NO | 27.08.2020 | ||
GR | 28.08.2020 | ||
IS | 27.09.2020 | ||
PT | 28.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | AL | 27.05.2020 | |
FI | 27.05.2020 | ||
HR | 27.05.2020 | ||
LT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LV | 27.05.2020 | ||
NL | 27.05.2020 | ||
RS | 27.05.2020 | ||
SE | 27.05.2020 | ||
BG | 27.08.2020 | ||
NO | 27.08.2020 | ||
GR | 28.08.2020 | ||
IS | 27.09.2020 | ||
PT | 28.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | FI | 27.05.2020 | |
HR | 27.05.2020 | ||
LT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LV | 27.05.2020 | ||
RS | 27.05.2020 | ||
SE | 27.05.2020 | ||
BG | 27.08.2020 | ||
NO | 27.08.2020 | ||
GR | 28.08.2020 | ||
IS | 27.09.2020 | ||
PT | 28.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | FI | 27.05.2020 | |
HR | 27.05.2020 | ||
LT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LV | 27.05.2020 | ||
RS | 27.05.2020 | ||
SE | 27.05.2020 | ||
NO | 27.08.2020 | ||
GR | 28.08.2020 | ||
IS | 27.09.2020 | ||
PT | 28.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | FI | 27.05.2020 | |
HR | 27.05.2020 | ||
LT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LV | 27.05.2020 | ||
SE | 27.05.2020 | ||
NO | 27.08.2020 | ||
GR | 28.08.2020 | ||
IS | 27.09.2020 | ||
PT | 28.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 27.05.2020 | |
LT | 27.05.2020 | ||
SE | 27.05.2020 | ||
NO | 27.08.2020 | ||
IS | 27.09.2020 | ||
PT | 28.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | LT | 27.05.2020 | |
NO | 27.08.2020 | ||
IS | 27.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | IS | 27.09.2020 | Cited in | International search | [I]US2003011443 (LIU SHIH-PING [TW], et al) [I] 1-4,15-20 * abstract * * figures 1,3a * * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0022] * * paragraph [0023] *; | [A]US6842086 (ZENNAMO JR JOSEPH A [US]) [A] 1-10,14-20 * abstract * * figures 1-5 * * paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0017] * * paragraph [0018] * * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0032] * * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0035] *; | [XI]US2005168152 (BLACKBURN THOMAS J [US], et al) [X] 1,5,8-10,15,16 * abstract * * pages 1-2 * * paragraphs [0001] - [0007] - [0011] - [0012] * * claims 1,10 * [I] 6,17-19; | [I]US2005233764 (SOLSKI PIOTR [IE], et al) [I] 1-4,15,18 * abstract * * figures 3,6 * * paragraph [0042] - paragraph [0043] * * paragraph [0032] * * claim 1 *; | [I]US2009174496 (VAN BEZOOIJEN ADRIANUS [NL]) [I] 1-10,14-20 * abstract * * figures 1-3 * * claims 15,12-13,15-16 * * paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0020] * * paragraph [0023] * * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0025] * * paragraph [0027] * * paragraph [0053] - paragraph [0054] *; | [I]EP2124346 (NAUTEL LTD [CA]) [I] 1,15,18 * abstract * * paragraph [0041] * * paragraph [0042] * * paragraph [0050] *; | [XAY]US2010308933 (SEE PUAY HOE [US], et al) [X] 1,2,10,14,15,18 * abstract * * figures 4-9 * * paragraph [0021] * * paragraph [0023] * * paragraph [0024] * * paragraph [0027] * * paragraph [0031] * * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0033] * * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0035] * * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0037] * * paragraph [0068] - paragraph [0069] * [A] 3-9,16,17,19,20 [Y] 11-13; | [XY]WO2011001769 (MURATA MANUFACTURING CO [JP], et al) [X] 1-10,15-20 * abstract * * figures 2-4 * * automatic translation * [Y] 11-13; | [XI] - JAVIER R DE LUIS ET AL, "A Novel Frequency Control Loop for Tunable Notch Filters", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON MICROWAVE THEORY AND TECHNIQUES, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, (20110901), vol. 59, no. 9, doi:10.1109/TMTT.2011.2160962, ISSN 0018-9480, pages 2265 - 2274, XP011359368 [X] 1,5,8-10,15,18 * abstract * * figures 1-4 * * II. " MICROELECTROMECHANICAL SYSTEMS (MEMS) TUNABLE NOTCH FILTER DESIGN BRIEFING"I. " MICROELECTROMECHANICAL SYSTEMS (MEMS) TUNABLE NOTCH FILTER DESIGN BRIEFING" * [I] 2-4,6,7,16,17,19,20 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TMTT.2011.2160962 | [Y] - XINHU HE ET AL, "Design and modelling of a low phase noise pll frequency synthesizer", SOLID-STATE AND INTEGRATED CIRCUIT TECHNOLOGY, 2006. ICSICT '06. 8TH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, PI, (20060101), ISBN 978-1-4244-0160-4, pages 1571 - 1573, XP031045956 [Y] 11-13 * abstract * * figure 2b * * III CIRCUIT DESIGN * | Examination | WO2006038190 |