EP2844421 - METHOD OF MANUFACTURING A TUBE SHEET AND HEAT EXCHANGER ASSEMBLY FOR A POOL REACTOR OR POOL CONDENSER ; CORRESPONDING TUBE SHEET AND HEAT EXCHANGER ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2015/11] | METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING A TUBE SHEET AND HEAT EXCHANGER ASSEMBLY FOR A POOL REACTOR OR POOL CONDENSER; CORRESPONDING TUBE SHEET AND HEAT EXCHANGER ASSEMBLY | ||
[2016/01] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.04.2017 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.11.2019 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 18.12.2019 [2019/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Stamicarbon B.V. Mercator 3 6135 KW Sittard / NL | [2015/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHEERDER, Alexander Aleida Antonius c/o Mercator 3 NL-6135 KW Sittard / NL | [2015/11] | Representative(s) | V.O. P.O. Box 87930 2508 DH Den Haag / NL | [2016/23] |
Former [2015/11] | Jansen, Cornelis Marinus, et al V.O. Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 13724003.2 | 02.05.2013 | [2016/23] | WO2013NL50331 | Priority number, date | EP20120166584 | 03.05.2012 Original published format: EP 12166584 | [2015/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013165247 | Date: | 07.11.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2844421 | Date: | 11.03.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.11.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2844421 | Date: | 08.06.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.11.2013 | Classification | IPC: | B23K31/02, B01J19/02, B01J19/24, C07C273/04, F28F9/18, F28F19/06 | [2015/11] | CPC: |
B01J19/02 (EP,CN,US);
B01J19/0013 (EP,CN,US);
F28F9/18 (US);
B01J19/006 (EP,CN,US);
B01J19/24 (EP,CN,US);
B01J3/04 (EP,CN,US);
B21D53/08 (US);
B23K31/027 (EP,CN,US);
F28D7/06 (EP,CN,US);
F28F19/06 (EP,CN,US);
F28F21/083 (EP,CN,US);
F28F9/185 (EP,CN,US);
B01J2219/00081 (EP,CN,US);
B01J2219/00256 (EP,CN,US);
B01J2219/00768 (EP,CN,US);
B01J2219/024 (EP,CN,US);
B01J2219/0286 (EP,CN,US);
B01J2219/182 (EP,CN,US);
B01J2219/192 (US);
B23K2101/14 (EP,CN,US);
B23K2103/04 (EP,CN,US);
B23K2103/05 (EP,US);
B23K2103/18 (EP,CN,US);
F28D2021/0022 (EP,CN,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/11] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM HERSTELLEN EINES SCHLAUCHBLATTES UND WÄRMETAUSCHERANORDNUNG ; ENTSPRECHENDE SCHLAUCHBLATT UND WÄRMETAUSCHERANODNUNG | [2016/01] | English: | METHOD OF MANUFACTURING A TUBE SHEET AND HEAT EXCHANGER ASSEMBLY FOR A POOL REACTOR OR POOL CONDENSER ; CORRESPONDING TUBE SHEET AND HEAT EXCHANGER ASSEMBLY | [2016/01] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UNE PLAQUE TUBULAIRE ET ENSEMBLE ÉCHANGEUR THERMIQUE POUR UN RÉACTEUR OU CONDENSATEUR DE PISCINE ; PLAQUE TUBULAIRE ET ENSEMBLE ÉCHANGEUR THERMIQUE CORRESPONDANTS | [2016/01] |
Former [2015/11] | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES ROHRBODENS UND WÄRMETAUSCHERANORDNUNG FÜR EINEN POOLREAKTOR ODER POOLKONDENSATOR | ||
Former [2015/11] | METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING A TUBE SHEET AND HEAT EXCHANGER ASSEMBLY FOR A POOL REACTOR OR POOL CONDENSER; CORRESPONDING TUBE SHEET AND HEAT EXCHANGER ASSEMBLY | ||
Former [2015/11] | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UNE PLAQUE ALVÉOLÉE ET D'UN ENSEMBLE D'ÉCHANGEUR THERMIQUE DESTINÉ À UN RÉACTEUR PISCINE OU UN CONDENSEUR PISCINE; PLAQUE ALVÉOLÉE ET ENSEMBLE D'ÉCHANGEUR THERMIQUE CORRESPONDANTS | Entry into regional phase | 18.11.2014 | National basic fee paid | 18.11.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.11.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.11.2014 | Examination requested [2015/11] | 10.04.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.12.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.04.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 13.04.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.04.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.12.2015 | Opposition(s) | 09.03.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 02.05.2013 | AL | 08.06.2016 | AT | 08.06.2016 | BE | 08.06.2016 | BG | 08.06.2016 | CY | 08.06.2016 | DK | 08.06.2016 | EE | 08.06.2016 | ES | 08.06.2016 | FI | 08.06.2016 | HR | 08.06.2016 | LV | 08.06.2016 | MC | 08.06.2016 | MK | 08.06.2016 | RS | 08.06.2016 | SE | 08.06.2016 | SI | 08.06.2016 | SK | 08.06.2016 | SM | 08.06.2016 | GR | 09.09.2016 | IS | 08.10.2016 | PT | 10.10.2016 | [2019/51] |
Former [2019/47] | HU | 02.05.2013 | |
AL | 08.06.2016 | ||
AT | 08.06.2016 | ||
BE | 08.06.2016 | ||
BG | 08.06.2016 | ||
CY | 08.06.2016 | ||
DK | 08.06.2016 | ||
EE | 08.06.2016 | ||
ES | 08.06.2016 | ||
FI | 08.06.2016 | ||
HR | 08.06.2016 | ||
LV | 08.06.2016 | ||
MC | 08.06.2016 | ||
RS | 08.06.2016 | ||
SE | 08.06.2016 | ||
SI | 08.06.2016 | ||
SK | 08.06.2016 | ||
SM | 08.06.2016 | ||
GR | 09.09.2016 | ||
IS | 08.10.2016 | ||
PT | 10.10.2016 | ||
Former [2019/39] | HU | 02.05.2013 | |
AL | 08.06.2016 | ||
AT | 08.06.2016 | ||
BE | 08.06.2016 | ||
BG | 08.06.2016 | ||
DK | 08.06.2016 | ||
EE | 08.06.2016 | ||
ES | 08.06.2016 | ||
FI | 08.06.2016 | ||
HR | 08.06.2016 | ||
LV | 08.06.2016 | ||
MC | 08.06.2016 | ||
RS | 08.06.2016 | ||
SE | 08.06.2016 | ||
SI | 08.06.2016 | ||
SK | 08.06.2016 | ||
SM | 08.06.2016 | ||
GR | 09.09.2016 | ||
IS | 08.10.2016 | ||
PT | 10.10.2016 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 02.05.2013 | |
AL | 08.06.2016 | ||
AT | 08.06.2016 | ||
BE | 08.06.2016 | ||
DK | 08.06.2016 | ||
EE | 08.06.2016 | ||
ES | 08.06.2016 | ||
FI | 08.06.2016 | ||
HR | 08.06.2016 | ||
LV | 08.06.2016 | ||
MC | 08.06.2016 | ||
RS | 08.06.2016 | ||
SE | 08.06.2016 | ||
SI | 08.06.2016 | ||
SK | 08.06.2016 | ||
SM | 08.06.2016 | ||
GR | 09.09.2016 | ||
IS | 08.10.2016 | ||
PT | 10.10.2016 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 08.06.2016 | |
AT | 08.06.2016 | ||
BE | 08.06.2016 | ||
DK | 08.06.2016 | ||
EE | 08.06.2016 | ||
ES | 08.06.2016 | ||
FI | 08.06.2016 | ||
HR | 08.06.2016 | ||
LV | 08.06.2016 | ||
MC | 08.06.2016 | ||
RS | 08.06.2016 | ||
SE | 08.06.2016 | ||
SI | 08.06.2016 | ||
SK | 08.06.2016 | ||
SM | 08.06.2016 | ||
GR | 09.09.2016 | ||
IS | 08.10.2016 | ||
PT | 10.10.2016 | ||
Former [2018/06] | AT | 08.06.2016 | |
BE | 08.06.2016 | ||
DK | 08.06.2016 | ||
EE | 08.06.2016 | ||
ES | 08.06.2016 | ||
FI | 08.06.2016 | ||
HR | 08.06.2016 | ||
LV | 08.06.2016 | ||
MC | 08.06.2016 | ||
RS | 08.06.2016 | ||
SE | 08.06.2016 | ||
SI | 08.06.2016 | ||
SK | 08.06.2016 | ||
SM | 08.06.2016 | ||
GR | 09.09.2016 | ||
IS | 08.10.2016 | ||
PT | 10.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 08.06.2016 | |
BE | 08.06.2016 | ||
DK | 08.06.2016 | ||
EE | 08.06.2016 | ||
ES | 08.06.2016 | ||
FI | 08.06.2016 | ||
HR | 08.06.2016 | ||
LV | 08.06.2016 | ||
RS | 08.06.2016 | ||
SE | 08.06.2016 | ||
SI | 08.06.2016 | ||
SK | 08.06.2016 | ||
SM | 08.06.2016 | ||
GR | 09.09.2016 | ||
IS | 08.10.2016 | ||
PT | 10.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | AT | 08.06.2016 | |
BE | 08.06.2016 | ||
EE | 08.06.2016 | ||
ES | 08.06.2016 | ||
FI | 08.06.2016 | ||
HR | 08.06.2016 | ||
LV | 08.06.2016 | ||
RS | 08.06.2016 | ||
SE | 08.06.2016 | ||
SK | 08.06.2016 | ||
SM | 08.06.2016 | ||
GR | 09.09.2016 | ||
IS | 08.10.2016 | ||
PT | 10.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | BE | 08.06.2016 | |
EE | 08.06.2016 | ||
ES | 08.06.2016 | ||
FI | 08.06.2016 | ||
HR | 08.06.2016 | ||
LV | 08.06.2016 | ||
RS | 08.06.2016 | ||
SE | 08.06.2016 | ||
SK | 08.06.2016 | ||
GR | 09.09.2016 | ||
IS | 08.10.2016 | ||
Former [2016/52] | ES | 08.06.2016 | |
FI | 08.06.2016 | ||
HR | 08.06.2016 | ||
LV | 08.06.2016 | ||
RS | 08.06.2016 | ||
SE | 08.06.2016 | ||
GR | 09.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | ES | 08.06.2016 | |
FI | 08.06.2016 | ||
HR | 08.06.2016 | ||
LV | 08.06.2016 | ||
RS | 08.06.2016 | ||
GR | 09.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | ES | 08.06.2016 | |
FI | 08.06.2016 | ||
HR | 08.06.2016 | ||
LV | 08.06.2016 | ||
RS | 08.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | FI | 08.06.2016 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US4288109 (ELLIS CLAUDE E) [Y] 1-16 * column 3, line 4 - column 4, line 12; figure - *; | [Y]JPH0285696 (BABCOCK HITACHI KK) [Y] 9,10,15 * abstract *; | [A]US2003066868 (EIJKENBOOM JOSEPH MARIA GERARD [NL], et al) [A] 1-16* abstract *; | [Y]US2006073086 (SAKAI KENJI [JP], et al) [Y] 1-16 * paragraphs [0004] , [0 14] , [0041] , [0043] , [0050]; figure -; claims 1,3 *; | [A]WO2008065478 (BELLELI ENERGY CPE S P A [IT], et al) [A] 1-16 * abstract * | by applicant | WO2009141346 |