EP2877244 - A HOME-USE COSMETIC TREATMENT DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 20.07.2018 Database last updated on 10.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.07.2018 | Withdrawal of application | published on 22.08.2018 [2018/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Syneron Beauty Ltd. P.O. Box 14 2069201 Yoqneam Illit / IL | [N/P] |
Former [2015/23] | For all designated states Syneron Beauty Ltd. P.O. Box 14 20692 Yoqneam Illit / IL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FLYASH, Lion 2/11 Gannot Street 17512 Nazareth Illit / IL | 02 /
TANENBAUM, Fabian 63 Trafalgar Road Tenafly, New Jersey 07670 / IL | [2015/23] | Representative(s) | FRKelly Waterways House Grand Canal Quay Dublin D02 PD39 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/23] | O'Neill, Brian, et al FRKelly 27 Clyde Road Ballsbridge Dublin 4 / IE | Application number, filing date | 13822583.4 | 22.07.2013 | WO2013IL00061 | Priority number, date | US201261675973P | 26.07.2012 Original published format: US 201261675973 P | [2015/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2014016820 | Date: | 30.01.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/05] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2877244 | Date: | 03.06.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.01.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 25.06.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.06.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A61N5/06, A61B5/01, A61H23/02, A61H7/00 | [2016/28] | CPC: |
A61N5/0616 (EP,US);
A61H23/02 (US);
A61B5/0059 (US);
A61B5/01 (US);
A61B5/0531 (US);
A61H23/0263 (EP,US);
A61H7/005 (EP,US);
A61N1/322 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00464 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00791 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00875 (EP,US);
A61H2201/10 (EP,US);
A61H2201/1664 (EP,US);
A61H2201/1666 (EP,US);
A61H2201/1671 (EP,US);
A61H2201/5005 (EP,US);
A61H2201/5064 (EP,US);
A61H2201/5071 (EP,US);
A61H2201/5092 (EP,US);
A61H2207/00 (EP,US);
A61H2230/505 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2015/23] | A61N5/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/02] |
Former [2015/23] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | KOSMETISCHE BEHANDLUNGSVORRICHTUNG ZUR VERWENDUNG ZUHAUSE | [2015/23] | English: | A HOME-USE COSMETIC TREATMENT DEVICE | [2015/23] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE TRAITEMENT COSMÉTIQUE À USAGE DOMESTIQUE | [2015/23] | Entry into regional phase | 26.02.2015 | National basic fee paid | 26.02.2015 | Search fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.12.2015 | Examination requested [2016/02] | 06.01.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.07.2018 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2018/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]US2008183252 (KHEN ROEE [IL]) [X] 1,4-7,12,13 * paragraphs [0016] - [0020] * [Y] 1,3,5 [I] 11; | [XYI]US2008221504 (AGHION JOSEPH [IL]) [X] 1,4-10 * paragraphs [0013] , [0023] - [0040] * [Y] 1,3,5[I] 2; | [Y]EP2258332 (YAN YONGXING [GB]) [Y] 1,3,5 * paragraphs [0029] - [0061]; figures 1-17 * | International search | [A]US2007239142 (ALTSHULER GREGORY B [US], et al); | [Y]US2011144410 (KENNEDY JOHN [CA]); | [Y]US2011270274 (HULL JR RAYMOND J [US]) |