EP3008515 - VOLTAGE CONTROLLED OPTICAL DIRECTIONAL COUPLER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.08.2019 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.09.2019 [2019/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Corning Optical Communications Wireless, Ltd Golan Building Airport City 70151 Lod / IL | [2016/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
REUVEN, Rami 46 Hatizmoret St. 75573 Rishon Letzion / IL | [2016/16] | Representative(s) | Sturm, Christoph Quermann - Sturm - Weilnau Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Unter den Eichen 5 65195 Wiesbaden / DE | [2016/16] | Application number, filing date | 14734911.2 | 12.06.2014 | [2016/16] | WO2014IL50535 | Priority number, date | US201361834066P | 12.06.2013 Original published format: US 201361834066 P | US201361894129P | 22.10.2013 Original published format: US 201361894129 P | [2016/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014199384 | Date: | 18.12.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3008515 | Date: | 20.04.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.12.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.12.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G02F1/313, G02B6/125, H04J14/00 | [2016/16] | CPC: |
G02F1/3132 (EP,US);
G02B6/2808 (US);
G02F1/313 (EP,US);
G02F2201/16 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/16] | Title | German: | SPANNUNGSGESTEUERTER OPTISCHER RICHTKOPPLER | [2016/16] | English: | VOLTAGE CONTROLLED OPTICAL DIRECTIONAL COUPLER | [2016/16] | French: | COUPLEUR DIRECTIF OPTIQUE A COMMANDE EN TENSION | [2016/16] | Entry into regional phase | 06.01.2016 | National basic fee paid | 06.01.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.01.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.12.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.01.2016 | Examination requested [2016/16] | 21.03.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.07.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.11.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.05.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.09.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.03.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/36] | 24.04.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]GB2095419 (WESTERN ELECTRIC CO) [A] 1-20* figure 6 *; | [X]US5278923 (NAZARATHY MOSHE [US], et al) [X] 1-20 * column 15, line 6 - column 16, line 45 * * column 25, line 10 - line 29 * * figure 15 *; | [A]EP0964290 (NEC CORP [JP]) [A] 2 * the whole document *; | [I]US2002085811 (KAMBE TOSHIYUKI [JP]) [I] 1-20 * paragraph [0118] - paragraph [0127] * * paragraph [0202] - paragraph [0203] * * figures 5,28 *; | [X]EP1241515 (TELEPHOTONICS INC [US]) [X] 1-20 * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0025] * * figures 2a,2b,2c *; | [A]US2005185884 (HAUS HERMANN A [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0029] * * figures 1-2 *; | [I]JP2007065227 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE) [I] 1-20 * the whole document *; | [A]US2008144989 (SAKURAI TAKAO [JP]) [A] 1-20 * paragraph [0041] - paragraph [0068] * * figures 1,4 * |