EP2961004 - RADIO-FREQUENCY COAXIAL ELECTRIC CONNECTOR WITH CONTACT ELEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.03.2022 Database last updated on 10.08.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.04.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.12.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shanghai Aerospace Science & Industry Appliance Co. Ltd. No.93 Lane 2891 South Qilianshan Road Putuo District Shanghai 200331 / CN | [2016/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YU, Guilong No.93 Lane 2891 South Qilianshan Road Putuo District Shanghai 200331 / CN | 02 /
SHAO, Jiwu No.93 Lane 2891 South Qilianshan Road Putuo District Shanghai 200331 / CN | [2016/01] | Representative(s) | Mittler, Enrico, et al Mittler & C. S.r.l. Viale Lombardia, 20 20131 Milano / IT | [2016/01] | Application number, filing date | 14753640.3 | 13.02.2014 | [2016/01] | WO2014CN72054 | Priority number, date | CN20131055102 | 21.02.2013 Original published format: CN201310055102 | [2016/01] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014127708 | Date: | 28.08.2014 | Language: | ZH | [2014/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2961004 | Date: | 30.12.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/53] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2961004 | Date: | 05.05.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 28.08.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.01.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H01R24/40, H01R103/00 | [2017/04] | CPC: |
H01R24/40 (EP);
H01R2103/00 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2016/01] | H01R13/627, H01R13/639 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/01] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KOAXIALER ELEKTRISCHER HOCHFREQUENZVERBINDER MIT KONTAKTELEMENT | [2016/01] | English: | RADIO-FREQUENCY COAXIAL ELECTRIC CONNECTOR WITH CONTACT ELEMENT | [2016/01] | French: | CONNECTEUR ÉLECTRIQUE COAXIAL RADIOFRÉQUENCE AVEC UN ÉLÉMENT DE CONTACT | [2016/01] | Entry into regional phase | 14.09.2015 | Translation filed | 14.09.2015 | National basic fee paid | 14.09.2015 | Search fee paid | 14.09.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.09.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.12.2014 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: CN | 14.09.2015 | Examination requested [2015/53] | 10.07.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.07.2018 | Invitation to indicate the basis for amendments (Time limit: M01) | 01.08.2018 | Reply to an invitation to indicate the basis for amendments | 27.11.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.02.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.12.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.03.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 25.03.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.03.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.11.2019 | Opposition(s) | 08.02.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 13.02.2014 | AL | 05.05.2021 | AT | 05.05.2021 | CY | 05.05.2021 | CZ | 05.05.2021 | DK | 05.05.2021 | EE | 05.05.2021 | ES | 05.05.2021 | FI | 05.05.2021 | HR | 05.05.2021 | IT | 05.05.2021 | LT | 05.05.2021 | LV | 05.05.2021 | MC | 05.05.2021 | MK | 05.05.2021 | NL | 05.05.2021 | PL | 05.05.2021 | RO | 05.05.2021 | RS | 05.05.2021 | SE | 05.05.2021 | SI | 05.05.2021 | SK | 05.05.2021 | SM | 05.05.2021 | TR | 05.05.2021 | BG | 05.08.2021 | NO | 05.08.2021 | GR | 06.08.2021 | IS | 05.09.2021 | PT | 06.09.2021 | [2024/29] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 13.02.2014 | |
AL | 05.05.2021 | ||
AT | 05.05.2021 | ||
CY | 05.05.2021 | ||
CZ | 05.05.2021 | ||
DK | 05.05.2021 | ||
EE | 05.05.2021 | ||
ES | 05.05.2021 | ||
FI | 05.05.2021 | ||
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
IT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
MC | 05.05.2021 | ||
MK | 05.05.2021 | ||
NL | 05.05.2021 | ||
PL | 05.05.2021 | ||
RO | 05.05.2021 | ||
RS | 05.05.2021 | ||
SE | 05.05.2021 | ||
SI | 05.05.2021 | ||
SK | 05.05.2021 | ||
SM | 05.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
IS | 05.09.2021 | ||
PT | 06.09.2021 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HU | 13.02.2014 | |
AL | 05.05.2021 | ||
AT | 05.05.2021 | ||
CY | 05.05.2021 | ||
CZ | 05.05.2021 | ||
DK | 05.05.2021 | ||
EE | 05.05.2021 | ||
ES | 05.05.2021 | ||
FI | 05.05.2021 | ||
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
IT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
MC | 05.05.2021 | ||
NL | 05.05.2021 | ||
PL | 05.05.2021 | ||
RO | 05.05.2021 | ||
RS | 05.05.2021 | ||
SE | 05.05.2021 | ||
SI | 05.05.2021 | ||
SK | 05.05.2021 | ||
SM | 05.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
IS | 05.09.2021 | ||
PT | 06.09.2021 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 13.02.2014 | |
AL | 05.05.2021 | ||
AT | 05.05.2021 | ||
CZ | 05.05.2021 | ||
DK | 05.05.2021 | ||
EE | 05.05.2021 | ||
ES | 05.05.2021 | ||
FI | 05.05.2021 | ||
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
IT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
MC | 05.05.2021 | ||
NL | 05.05.2021 | ||
PL | 05.05.2021 | ||
RO | 05.05.2021 | ||
RS | 05.05.2021 | ||
SE | 05.05.2021 | ||
SI | 05.05.2021 | ||
SK | 05.05.2021 | ||
SM | 05.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
IS | 05.09.2021 | ||
PT | 06.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/44] | AL | 05.05.2021 | |
AT | 05.05.2021 | ||
CZ | 05.05.2021 | ||
DK | 05.05.2021 | ||
EE | 05.05.2021 | ||
ES | 05.05.2021 | ||
FI | 05.05.2021 | ||
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
IT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
MC | 05.05.2021 | ||
NL | 05.05.2021 | ||
PL | 05.05.2021 | ||
RO | 05.05.2021 | ||
RS | 05.05.2021 | ||
SE | 05.05.2021 | ||
SI | 05.05.2021 | ||
SK | 05.05.2021 | ||
SM | 05.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
IS | 05.09.2021 | ||
PT | 06.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AL | 05.05.2021 | |
AT | 05.05.2021 | ||
CZ | 05.05.2021 | ||
DK | 05.05.2021 | ||
EE | 05.05.2021 | ||
ES | 05.05.2021 | ||
FI | 05.05.2021 | ||
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
IT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
NL | 05.05.2021 | ||
PL | 05.05.2021 | ||
RO | 05.05.2021 | ||
RS | 05.05.2021 | ||
SE | 05.05.2021 | ||
SI | 05.05.2021 | ||
SK | 05.05.2021 | ||
SM | 05.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
IS | 05.09.2021 | ||
PT | 06.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 05.05.2021 | |
AT | 05.05.2021 | ||
CZ | 05.05.2021 | ||
DK | 05.05.2021 | ||
EE | 05.05.2021 | ||
ES | 05.05.2021 | ||
FI | 05.05.2021 | ||
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
NL | 05.05.2021 | ||
PL | 05.05.2021 | ||
RO | 05.05.2021 | ||
RS | 05.05.2021 | ||
SE | 05.05.2021 | ||
SI | 05.05.2021 | ||
SK | 05.05.2021 | ||
SM | 05.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
IS | 05.09.2021 | ||
PT | 06.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AL | 05.05.2021 | |
AT | 05.05.2021 | ||
CZ | 05.05.2021 | ||
DK | 05.05.2021 | ||
EE | 05.05.2021 | ||
ES | 05.05.2021 | ||
FI | 05.05.2021 | ||
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
NL | 05.05.2021 | ||
PL | 05.05.2021 | ||
RO | 05.05.2021 | ||
RS | 05.05.2021 | ||
SE | 05.05.2021 | ||
SK | 05.05.2021 | ||
SM | 05.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
IS | 05.09.2021 | ||
PT | 06.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AT | 05.05.2021 | |
CZ | 05.05.2021 | ||
DK | 05.05.2021 | ||
EE | 05.05.2021 | ||
ES | 05.05.2021 | ||
FI | 05.05.2021 | ||
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
NL | 05.05.2021 | ||
PL | 05.05.2021 | ||
RO | 05.05.2021 | ||
RS | 05.05.2021 | ||
SE | 05.05.2021 | ||
SK | 05.05.2021 | ||
SM | 05.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
IS | 05.09.2021 | ||
PT | 06.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AT | 05.05.2021 | |
CZ | 05.05.2021 | ||
DK | 05.05.2021 | ||
EE | 05.05.2021 | ||
ES | 05.05.2021 | ||
FI | 05.05.2021 | ||
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
NL | 05.05.2021 | ||
PL | 05.05.2021 | ||
RO | 05.05.2021 | ||
RS | 05.05.2021 | ||
SE | 05.05.2021 | ||
SK | 05.05.2021 | ||
SM | 05.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
PT | 06.09.2021 | ||
IS | 22.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AT | 05.05.2021 | |
CZ | 05.05.2021 | ||
DK | 05.05.2021 | ||
ES | 05.05.2021 | ||
FI | 05.05.2021 | ||
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
NL | 05.05.2021 | ||
PL | 05.05.2021 | ||
RO | 05.05.2021 | ||
RS | 05.05.2021 | ||
SE | 05.05.2021 | ||
SK | 05.05.2021 | ||
SM | 05.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
IS | 05.09.2021 | ||
PT | 06.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AT | 05.05.2021 | |
CZ | 05.05.2021 | ||
DK | 05.05.2021 | ||
ES | 05.05.2021 | ||
FI | 05.05.2021 | ||
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
NL | 05.05.2021 | ||
PL | 05.05.2021 | ||
RS | 05.05.2021 | ||
SE | 05.05.2021 | ||
SM | 05.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
IS | 05.09.2021 | ||
PT | 06.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AT | 05.05.2021 | |
ES | 05.05.2021 | ||
FI | 05.05.2021 | ||
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
NL | 05.05.2021 | ||
PL | 05.05.2021 | ||
RS | 05.05.2021 | ||
SE | 05.05.2021 | ||
SM | 05.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
IS | 05.09.2021 | ||
PT | 06.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/04] | AT | 05.05.2021 | |
ES | 05.05.2021 | ||
FI | 05.05.2021 | ||
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
NL | 05.05.2021 | ||
PL | 05.05.2021 | ||
RS | 05.05.2021 | ||
SE | 05.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
IS | 05.09.2021 | ||
PT | 06.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/52] | AT | 05.05.2021 | |
ES | 05.05.2021 | ||
FI | 05.05.2021 | ||
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
PL | 05.05.2021 | ||
RS | 05.05.2021 | ||
SE | 05.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
IS | 05.09.2021 | ||
PT | 06.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | AT | 05.05.2021 | |
ES | 05.05.2021 | ||
FI | 05.05.2021 | ||
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
RS | 05.05.2021 | ||
SE | 05.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
IS | 05.09.2021 | ||
PT | 06.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AT | 05.05.2021 | |
FI | 05.05.2021 | ||
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
SE | 05.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
PT | 06.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | AT | 05.05.2021 | |
FI | 05.05.2021 | ||
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
SE | 05.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/47] | AT | 05.05.2021 | |
FI | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AT | 05.05.2021 | |
FI | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]CN1988285 (NO 41 INST CHINA ELECTRONIC SC [CN]) [X] 1,3,5,6 * the whole document * [Y] 2,7 [I] 2,4,7; | [Y]WO2012116179 (MOLEX INC [US], et al) [Y] 1-7 * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0028]; figures 2-5 *; | [Y]CN102593620 (ANDREW CORP) [Y] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [IY]EP0647989 (WHITAKER CORP [US]) [I] 1-7 * column 2, line 11 - column 4, line 3; figures 1-5 * [Y] 1-7; | [Y]US5147221 (CULL ROBERT R [US], et al) [Y] 1-7 * column 6, line 18 - line 30 *; | [Y]US2012088381 (WILD WERNER KARL [DE], et al) [Y] 1-7 * paragraph [0055] * | International search | [X]CN1988285 (NO 41 INST CHINA ELECTRONIC SC [CN]); | [Y]CN101552386 (TYCO ELECTRONICS CORP [US]); | [Y]GB909129 (BURNDY CORP); | [Y]CN101120489 (SEE SPRL [BE]); | [XP]CN103094782 (SHANGHAI AEROSPACE SCIENCE & INDUSTRY ELECTRIC APPLIANCE RES INST CO LTD); | [XP]CN103117469 (SHANGHAI AEROSPACE SCIENCE & INDUSTRY ELECTRIC APPLIANCE RES INST CO LTD); | [XP]CN203103662U (SHANGHAI AEROSPACE SCIENCE & INDUSTRY ELECTRIC APPLIANCE RES INST CO LTD); | [XP]CN203103594U (SHANGHAI AEROSPACE SCIENCE & INDUSTRY ELECTRIC APPLIANCE RES INST CO LTD); | [A]CN201345466Y (SHENZHEN XIDUOLI IND CO LTD [CN]); | [A]CN101404364 (GUIZHOU SPACE APPLIANCE CO LTD [CN]) | by applicant | WO2013104590 |