EP3084988 - METHODS AND APPARATUS FOR CONFIGURING AN IMAGE SENSOR FOR DECODING HIGH FREQUENCY VISIBLE LIGHT COMMUNICATION SIGNALS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.09.2019 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.12.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.10.2019 [2019/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Qualcomm Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | [2016/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JOVICIC, Aleksander c/o Qualcomm Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 02 /
APPAIAH, Kumar c/o Qualcomm Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 03 /
LI, Junyi c/o Qualcomm Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | [2016/43] | Representative(s) | Dunlop, Hugh Christopher, et al Maucher Jenkins Seventh Floor Offices Artillery House 11-19 Artillery Row London SW1P 1RT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/43] | Dunlop, Hugh Christopher, et al RGC Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 14828598.4 | 12.12.2014 | [2016/43] | WO2014US70148 | Priority number, date | US201314108174 | 16.12.2013 Original published format: US201314108174 | [2016/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015094986 | Date: | 25.06.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3084988 | Date: | 26.10.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.06.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.06.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/26, H04B10/69, H04N5/225, H04N5/232, H04N5/235, H04N5/353, H04N5/374, H04N101/00, H04B10/116 | [2018/51] | CPC: |
H04B10/116 (EP,KR,US);
H04N23/70 (KR,US);
H04B10/691 (KR,US);
H04B7/26 (EP,KR,US);
H04N23/51 (US);
H04N23/63 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2016/43] | H04B10/116 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/43] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM KONFIGURIEREN EINES BILDSENSORS ZUR DECODIERUNG HOCHFREQUENTER SICHTBARER LICHTKOMMUNIKATIONSSIGNALE | [2016/43] | English: | METHODS AND APPARATUS FOR CONFIGURING AN IMAGE SENSOR FOR DECODING HIGH FREQUENCY VISIBLE LIGHT COMMUNICATION SIGNALS | [2016/43] | French: | PROCÉDÉS ET APPAREIL DE CONFIGURATION D'UN CAPTEUR D'IMAGE POUR DÉCODER DES SIGNAUX DE COMMUNICATION PAR LUMIÈRE VISIBLE HAUTE FRÉQUENCE | [2016/43] | Entry into regional phase | 11.05.2016 | National basic fee paid | 11.05.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.05.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.05.2016 | Examination requested [2016/43] | 25.01.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.12.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.03.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.07.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 31.08.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.12.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.04.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/42] | 03.06.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2019/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]US8334901 (GANICK AARON [US], et al) [X] 1-4,6-10,12-15,17-21,23-25,27-30 * column 8, line 53 - line 58 * * column 19, line 61 - column 20, line 4 * * column 21, line 34 - line 39 * * column 28, line 49 - line 51 * * column 30, line 23 - line 25 * * column 30, line 59 - column 31, line 21 * * column 31, line 41 - line 42 * * column 32, line 6 - line 8 * * figure 30 * [I] 5,11,16,22,26; | [A]US2013016978 (SON JAE-SEUNG [KR], et al) [A] 1-30 * figure 4 *; | [XI]US2013330088 (OSHIMA MITSUAKI [JP], et al) [X] 1-3,7,10,12-14,18,21,23,24,30 * paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [1279] * * paragraph [1285] * [I] 4-6,8,9,11,15-17,19,20,22,25-29; | [A] - HARUYAMA SHINICHIRO, "Advances in visible light communication technologies", 2012 38TH EUROPEAN CONFERENCE AND EXHIBITION ON OPTICAL COMMUNICATIONS, OSA, (20120916), pages 1 - 3, XP032544061 [A] 1-30 * page 2, column 1, line 19 - column 2, line 4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1364/ECEOC.2012.We.3.B.5 |