EP3488904 - SKI CARRYING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.07.2020 Database last updated on 10.08.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 26.04.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Burkhard, Peter Martin-Luther-Straße 2 65451 Kelsterbach / DE | [2019/44] |
Former [2019/22] | For all designated states Burkhard, Peter Diedenbergener Straße 13 65795 Hattersheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2019/22] | Representative(s) | Habermann Intellectual Property Partnerschaft von Patentanwälten mbB Dolivostraße 15A 64293 Darmstadt / DE | [2019/22] | Application number, filing date | 17203643.6 | 24.11.2017 | [2019/22] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3488904 | Date: | 29.05.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.05.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A63C11/02 | [2019/22] | CPC: |
A63C11/025 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/22] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SKITRAGEVORRICHTUNG | [2019/22] | English: | SKI CARRYING DEVICE | [2019/22] | French: | DISPOSITIF PORTE-SKIS | [2019/22] | Examination procedure | 30.11.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/33] | 08.01.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2020/33] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2019 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAYI]US4244498 (COPP ROBERT D) [X] 1,4,6,7,12 * column 2, line 1 - column 2, line 55; figures 1-8 * [A] 8-11 [Y] 5 [I] 2,3; | [XAI]EP2826529 (BRUNNER WINFRIED [DE], et al) [X] 1,3,6,12 * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0023]; figures 1-3 * [A] 4,5,7-11 [I] 2; | [AD]US2014028041 (OWEN DAVID B [US]) [AD] 1-12 * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0034]; figures 1,2 *; | [Y]WO03041821 (GILLI RETO [CH]) [Y] 5 * page 2, line 12 - page 2, line 17; figures 1-7 * | by applicant | WO2014102012 | US2014028041 |