EP3464207 - PROCESS FOR FORMING A BARRIER COATING AT THE SURFACE OF A CONTAINER AND RELATED FACILITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.11.2019 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.03.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.12.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 07.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.11.2023 | Change - representative | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SGD S.A. Tour Liberty 17 Place des Reflets 92097 Paris la Défense Cédex / FR | [2023/43] |
Former [2019/15] | For all designated states SGD S.A. 14 bis terrasse Bellini 92800 Puteaux / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ETCHEPARE, Pierre-Luc 5 rue de la Reine Mathilde 76260 Eu / FR | 02 /
ZHANG, Jingwei 38 rue des Ruelles 91300 Massy / FR | [2019/15] | Representative(s) | Cabinet Didier Martin Les Terrasses des Bruyères - Bâtiment C 314 C, Allée des Noisetiers 69760 Limonest / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2019/15] | Weber, Jean-François Cabinet Didier Martin 50 Chemin des Verrières 69260 Charbonnieres Les Bains / FR | Application number, filing date | 17733498.4 | 01.06.2017 | [2019/15] | WO2017FR51378 | Priority number, date | FR20160055039 | 02.06.2016 Original published format: FR 1655039 | [2019/15] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017207940 | Date: | 07.12.2017 | Language: | FR | [2017/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3464207 | Date: | 10.04.2019 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.12.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.12.2017 | Classification | IPC: | C03C17/00, C03C17/22, C03C17/23, C03C23/00, C23C16/02, C23C16/44 | [2019/15] | CPC: |
C03C17/004 (EP);
C03C17/22 (EP);
C03C17/23 (EP);
C03C23/007 (EP);
C03C23/0075 (EP);
C23C16/0209 (EP);
C23C16/0227 (EP);
C23C16/045 (EP);
C23C16/4408 (EP);
C23C16/45557 (EP);
C03C2217/213 (EP);
C03C2218/31 (EP);
C03C2218/32 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/15] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR FORMUNG EINER SPERRBESCHICHTUNG AUF DER OBERFLÄCHE EINES BEHÄLTERS UND ZUGEHÖRIGE ANLAGE | [2019/15] | English: | PROCESS FOR FORMING A BARRIER COATING AT THE SURFACE OF A CONTAINER AND RELATED FACILITY | [2019/15] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FORMATION D'UN REVÊTEMENT BARRIÈRE A LA SURFACE D'UN RÉCIPIENT ET INSTALLATION AFFÉRENTE | [2019/15] | Entry into regional phase | 21.12.2018 | National basic fee paid | 21.12.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.12.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.12.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.12.2018 | Examination requested [2019/15] | 21.12.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.11.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.02.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.02.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.07.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.05.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.09.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [IY]GB2061243 (PHILIPS ELECTRONIC ASSOCIATED) [I] 8,10,11,15,16,21 * example 1 * [Y] 1-6,9,12,14,18,19,23; | [IY]WO8911920 (OLIN CORP [US]) [I] 8,10,11,15,16,21 * examples 3, 4 * [Y] 1-4,6,7,9,12,14,18,20,23; | [IY] - GULINO A ET AL, "SYNTHESIS AND CHARACTERIZATION OFNOVEL SELF-GENERATING LIQUID MOCVDPRECURSORS FOR THIN FILMS OF ZINC OXIDE", CHEMISTRY OF MATERIALS, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, US, (20000201), vol. 12, no. 2, doi:10.1021/CM991154K, ISSN 0897-4756, pages 548 - 554, XP000927811 [I] 10,11,15,16,21 * quatrième paragraphe; page 550 * * table 2 * [Y] 1-4,7,9,12-14,18,20,22,23 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/cm991154k | [IY] - UEYAMA R ET AL, "PREPARATION OF IRON OXIDE THIN FILMS BY MOCVD", JOURNAL OF THE CERAMIC SOCIETY OF JAPAN, INTERNATIONAL EDITION, FUJI TECHNOLOGY PRESS, TOKYO, JP, (19961001), vol. 104, no. 10, ISSN 0912-9200, pages 946 - 950, XP000686245 [I] 8,10,11,15,16,21 * 2. Experimental Method * * table 1 * [Y] 1-4,7,9,12-14,18,20,22,23 | [IY] - MASANOBU AIZAWA ET AL, "PREPARATION OF ZRO2-Y2O3 FILMS BY CVD USING B-DIKETONE METAL CHELATES", JOURNAL OF THE CERAMIC SOCIETY OF JAPAN, INTERNATIONAL EDITION, FUJI TECHNOLOGY PRESS, TOKYO, JP, (19930301), vol. 101, no. 3, ISSN 0912-9200, pages 283 - 286, XP000381420 [I] 8,10,11,15,16,21 * 2. Experiment; page 283 * * figure 1; table 1 * [Y] 1-4,6,7,9,12,14,18,20,23 | [IY] - ITOH H ET AL, "PREPARATION OF ZRO2-MGO THIN FILMS BY OMCVD", JOURNAL OF THE CERAMIC SOCIETY OF JAPAN, INTERNATIONAL EDITION, FUJI TECHNOLOGY PRESS, TOKYO, JP, (19891001), vol. 97, no. 10, ISSN 0912-9200, pages 1065 - 1070, XP000114023 [I] 8,10,11,15,16,21 * 2-2. Experimental Apparatus; page 1065 * * 3-1. Forming Conditions of ZrO2 Film; page 1066; figures 1,2 * [Y] 1-4,6,7,9,12,14,18,20,23 | [IY] - WALTHER M ET AL, "PACKAGING OF SENSITIVE PARENTERAL DRUGS IN GLASS CONTAINERS WITH A QUARTZ-LIKE SURFACE", PHARMACEUTICAL TECHNOLOGY EUROPE - BIOPHARM, ADVANSTAR COMMUNICATIONS, CHESTER, GB, (19960101), vol. 8, no. 5, pages 22,24 - 27, XP000827860 [I] 17 * page 24 - paragraph 1 * [Y] 1-7,9,12-14,18-20,22,23 |