EP3481235 - ADDITIVE ASSEMBLY FOR ELECTRONIC VAPING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.04.2020 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.04.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 12.01.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 19.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.02.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Philip Morris Products S.A. Quai Jeanrenaud 3 2000 Neuchâtel / CH | [2019/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KARLES, Georgios 601 East Jackson Street Richmond, Virginia 23219 / US | 02 /
OGBONLOWO, Tracy M. 601 East Jackson Street Richmond, Virginia 23219 / US | 03 /
CRAWFORD, Danielle 601 East Jackson Street Richmond, Virginia 23219 / US | 04 /
LI, San 601 East Jackson Street Richmond, Virginia 23219 / US | [2019/20] | Representative(s) | Dowling, Ian Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | [2019/20] | Application number, filing date | 17736957.6 | 07.07.2017 | [2019/20] | WO2017EP67160 | Priority number, date | US201615204361 | 07.07.2016 Original published format: US201615204361 | [2019/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018007625 | Date: | 11.01.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3481235 | Date: | 15.05.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.01.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.01.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A24B15/16, A24F47/00 | [2019/20] | CPC: |
A24F40/485 (EP,IL,RU,US);
A24B15/16 (IL,RU,US);
A24F40/42 (IL,KR);
A24B15/167 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A24B15/284 (IL,US);
A24F40/10 (IL,KR);
A24F40/20 (IL,KR);
A24F40/95 (IL,KR);
A61M15/06 (IL,KR);
B01J20/103 (EP,IL,KR,US);
B01J20/18 (EP,IL,KR,US);
B01J20/20 (EP,IL,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/20] | Title | German: | ZUSATZANORDNUNG FÜR E-VAPING-VORRICHTUNG | [2019/20] | English: | ADDITIVE ASSEMBLY FOR ELECTRONIC VAPING DEVICE | [2019/20] | French: | ENSEMBLE ADDITIF DESTINÉ À UN DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE DE VAPOTAGE | [2019/20] | Entry into regional phase | 16.11.2018 | National basic fee paid | 16.11.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.11.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.11.2018 | Examination requested [2019/20] | 16.11.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.08.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.04.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.08.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.02.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2014116974 (LOEC INC [US]) [A] 1-23 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0004] - paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0020] * * paragraph [0022] * * paragraph [0028] * * paragraph [0030] * * paragraph [0034] * * paragraph [0039] *; | [A]US2014261486 (POTTER DENNIS LEE [US], et al) [A] 1-23 * paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [0066] * * paragraph [0068] * * paragraph [0080] - paragraph [0082] ** paragraph [0094] - paragraph [0099] *; | [A]WO2015009863 (ALTRIA CLIENT SERVICES INC [US]) [A] 1-23 * paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0012] * * paragraph [0045] - paragraph [0049] *; | [A]WO2015013135 (ALTRIA CLIENT SERVICES INC [US]) [A] 1-23 * paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0045] - paragraph [0052] * | by applicant | US2013192623 | US2013192619 |