EP3473570 - ROLL TRANSFER DEVICE AND ROLL TRANSFER METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.08.2023 Database last updated on 10.08.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 16.09.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.05.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.08.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.03.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Zuiko Corporation 15-21, Minamibefu-cho Settsu-Shi Osaka 566-0045 / JP | [2019/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAGAFUCHI, Shinichiro c/o ZUIKO CORPORATION 15-21 Minamibefucho Settsu-shi Osaka 566-0045 / JP | 02 /
SATO, Hitoshi c/o ZUIKO CORPORATION 15-21 Minamibefucho Settsu-shi Osaka 566-0045 / JP | 03 /
TSUJIMOTO, Yoshiaki c/o ZUIKO CORPORATION 15-21 Minamibefucho Settsu-shi Osaka 566-0045 / JP | [2019/17] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [2019/17] | Application number, filing date | 17815216.1 | 09.06.2017 | [2019/17] | WO2017JP21480 | Priority number, date | JP20160123429 | 22.06.2016 Original published format: JP 2016123429 | [2019/17] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017221747 | Date: | 28.12.2017 | Language: | JA | [2017/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3473570 | Date: | 24.04.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3473570 | Date: | 19.10.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 28.12.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.03.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B65H19/12 | [2019/17] | CPC: |
B65H19/12 (EP,US);
B65H2301/4132 (EP);
B65H2301/41702 (EP);
B65H2301/4173 (EP);
B65H2513/41 (EP);
B65H2555/30 (EP);
B65H2701/1924 (US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
B65H2513/41, B65H2220/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/17] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ROLLENÜBERTRAGUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND ROLLENÜBERTRAGUNGSVERFAHREN | [2019/17] | English: | ROLL TRANSFER DEVICE AND ROLL TRANSFER METHOD | [2019/17] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ DE TRANSFERT DE ROULEAU | [2022/23] |
Former [2019/17] | DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ DE CONVOI DE ROULEAU | Entry into regional phase | 14.01.2019 | Translation filed | 17.01.2019 | National basic fee paid | 17.01.2019 | Search fee paid | 17.01.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.01.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.01.2019 | Examination requested [2019/17] | 02.09.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.08.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.11.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.05.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.09.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 08.09.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 08.09.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.07.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 19.10.2022 | AT | 19.10.2022 | CZ | 19.10.2022 | DK | 19.10.2022 | EE | 19.10.2022 | ES | 19.10.2022 | FI | 19.10.2022 | HR | 19.10.2022 | IT | 19.10.2022 | LT | 19.10.2022 | LV | 19.10.2022 | MC | 19.10.2022 | NL | 19.10.2022 | PL | 19.10.2022 | RO | 19.10.2022 | RS | 19.10.2022 | SI | 19.10.2022 | SK | 19.10.2022 | SM | 19.10.2022 | NO | 19.01.2023 | GR | 20.01.2023 | IS | 19.02.2023 | PT | 20.02.2023 | GB | 09.06.2023 | IE | 09.06.2023 | LU | 09.06.2023 | CH | 30.06.2023 | FR | 30.06.2023 | [2024/26] |
Former [2024/24] | AL | 19.10.2022 | |
AT | 19.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2022 | ||
DK | 19.10.2022 | ||
EE | 19.10.2022 | ||
ES | 19.10.2022 | ||
FI | 19.10.2022 | ||
HR | 19.10.2022 | ||
LT | 19.10.2022 | ||
LV | 19.10.2022 | ||
MC | 19.10.2022 | ||
NL | 19.10.2022 | ||
PL | 19.10.2022 | ||
RO | 19.10.2022 | ||
RS | 19.10.2022 | ||
SI | 19.10.2022 | ||
SK | 19.10.2022 | ||
SM | 19.10.2022 | ||
NO | 19.01.2023 | ||
GR | 20.01.2023 | ||
IS | 19.02.2023 | ||
PT | 20.02.2023 | ||
GB | 09.06.2023 | ||
IE | 09.06.2023 | ||
LU | 09.06.2023 | ||
CH | 30.06.2023 | ||
FR | 30.06.2023 | ||
Former [2024/21] | AL | 19.10.2022 | |
AT | 19.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2022 | ||
DK | 19.10.2022 | ||
EE | 19.10.2022 | ||
ES | 19.10.2022 | ||
FI | 19.10.2022 | ||
HR | 19.10.2022 | ||
LT | 19.10.2022 | ||
LV | 19.10.2022 | ||
MC | 19.10.2022 | ||
NL | 19.10.2022 | ||
PL | 19.10.2022 | ||
RO | 19.10.2022 | ||
RS | 19.10.2022 | ||
SI | 19.10.2022 | ||
SK | 19.10.2022 | ||
SM | 19.10.2022 | ||
NO | 19.01.2023 | ||
GR | 20.01.2023 | ||
IS | 19.02.2023 | ||
PT | 20.02.2023 | ||
IE | 09.06.2023 | ||
LU | 09.06.2023 | ||
Former [2024/15] | AL | 19.10.2022 | |
AT | 19.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2022 | ||
DK | 19.10.2022 | ||
EE | 19.10.2022 | ||
ES | 19.10.2022 | ||
FI | 19.10.2022 | ||
HR | 19.10.2022 | ||
LT | 19.10.2022 | ||
LV | 19.10.2022 | ||
MC | 19.10.2022 | ||
NL | 19.10.2022 | ||
PL | 19.10.2022 | ||
RO | 19.10.2022 | ||
RS | 19.10.2022 | ||
SI | 19.10.2022 | ||
SK | 19.10.2022 | ||
SM | 19.10.2022 | ||
NO | 19.01.2023 | ||
GR | 20.01.2023 | ||
IS | 19.02.2023 | ||
PT | 20.02.2023 | ||
LU | 09.06.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AL | 19.10.2022 | |
AT | 19.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2022 | ||
DK | 19.10.2022 | ||
EE | 19.10.2022 | ||
ES | 19.10.2022 | ||
FI | 19.10.2022 | ||
HR | 19.10.2022 | ||
LT | 19.10.2022 | ||
LV | 19.10.2022 | ||
MC | 19.10.2022 | ||
NL | 19.10.2022 | ||
PL | 19.10.2022 | ||
RO | 19.10.2022 | ||
RS | 19.10.2022 | ||
SI | 19.10.2022 | ||
SK | 19.10.2022 | ||
SM | 19.10.2022 | ||
NO | 19.01.2023 | ||
GR | 20.01.2023 | ||
IS | 19.02.2023 | ||
PT | 20.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AL | 19.10.2022 | |
AT | 19.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2022 | ||
DK | 19.10.2022 | ||
EE | 19.10.2022 | ||
ES | 19.10.2022 | ||
FI | 19.10.2022 | ||
HR | 19.10.2022 | ||
LT | 19.10.2022 | ||
LV | 19.10.2022 | ||
NL | 19.10.2022 | ||
PL | 19.10.2022 | ||
RO | 19.10.2022 | ||
RS | 19.10.2022 | ||
SI | 19.10.2022 | ||
SK | 19.10.2022 | ||
SM | 19.10.2022 | ||
NO | 19.01.2023 | ||
GR | 20.01.2023 | ||
IS | 19.02.2023 | ||
PT | 20.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AL | 19.10.2022 | |
AT | 19.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2022 | ||
DK | 19.10.2022 | ||
EE | 19.10.2022 | ||
ES | 19.10.2022 | ||
FI | 19.10.2022 | ||
HR | 19.10.2022 | ||
LT | 19.10.2022 | ||
LV | 19.10.2022 | ||
NL | 19.10.2022 | ||
PL | 19.10.2022 | ||
RO | 19.10.2022 | ||
RS | 19.10.2022 | ||
SK | 19.10.2022 | ||
SM | 19.10.2022 | ||
NO | 19.01.2023 | ||
GR | 20.01.2023 | ||
IS | 19.02.2023 | ||
PT | 20.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 19.10.2022 | |
AT | 19.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2022 | ||
DK | 19.10.2022 | ||
EE | 19.10.2022 | ||
ES | 19.10.2022 | ||
FI | 19.10.2022 | ||
HR | 19.10.2022 | ||
LT | 19.10.2022 | ||
LV | 19.10.2022 | ||
NL | 19.10.2022 | ||
PL | 19.10.2022 | ||
RO | 19.10.2022 | ||
RS | 19.10.2022 | ||
SM | 19.10.2022 | ||
NO | 19.01.2023 | ||
GR | 20.01.2023 | ||
IS | 19.02.2023 | ||
PT | 20.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AT | 19.10.2022 | |
CZ | 19.10.2022 | ||
DK | 19.10.2022 | ||
EE | 19.10.2022 | ||
ES | 19.10.2022 | ||
FI | 19.10.2022 | ||
HR | 19.10.2022 | ||
LT | 19.10.2022 | ||
LV | 19.10.2022 | ||
NL | 19.10.2022 | ||
PL | 19.10.2022 | ||
RO | 19.10.2022 | ||
RS | 19.10.2022 | ||
SM | 19.10.2022 | ||
NO | 19.01.2023 | ||
GR | 20.01.2023 | ||
IS | 19.02.2023 | ||
PT | 20.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | AT | 19.10.2022 | |
DK | 19.10.2022 | ||
EE | 19.10.2022 | ||
ES | 19.10.2022 | ||
FI | 19.10.2022 | ||
HR | 19.10.2022 | ||
LT | 19.10.2022 | ||
LV | 19.10.2022 | ||
NL | 19.10.2022 | ||
PL | 19.10.2022 | ||
RS | 19.10.2022 | ||
SM | 19.10.2022 | ||
NO | 19.01.2023 | ||
GR | 20.01.2023 | ||
IS | 19.02.2023 | ||
PT | 20.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | AT | 19.10.2022 | |
DK | 19.10.2022 | ||
ES | 19.10.2022 | ||
FI | 19.10.2022 | ||
HR | 19.10.2022 | ||
LT | 19.10.2022 | ||
LV | 19.10.2022 | ||
NL | 19.10.2022 | ||
PL | 19.10.2022 | ||
RS | 19.10.2022 | ||
SM | 19.10.2022 | ||
NO | 19.01.2023 | ||
GR | 20.01.2023 | ||
IS | 19.02.2023 | ||
PT | 20.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AT | 19.10.2022 | |
ES | 19.10.2022 | ||
FI | 19.10.2022 | ||
HR | 19.10.2022 | ||
LT | 19.10.2022 | ||
LV | 19.10.2022 | ||
NL | 19.10.2022 | ||
PL | 19.10.2022 | ||
RS | 19.10.2022 | ||
NO | 19.01.2023 | ||
GR | 20.01.2023 | ||
IS | 19.02.2023 | ||
PT | 20.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/23] | AT | 19.10.2022 | |
ES | 19.10.2022 | ||
FI | 19.10.2022 | ||
LT | 19.10.2022 | ||
LV | 19.10.2022 | ||
NL | 19.10.2022 | ||
NO | 19.01.2023 | ||
GR | 20.01.2023 | ||
PT | 20.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AT | 19.10.2022 | |
ES | 19.10.2022 | ||
FI | 19.10.2022 | ||
LT | 19.10.2022 | ||
NL | 19.10.2022 | ||
NO | 19.01.2023 | ||
PT | 20.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/20] | LT | 19.10.2022 | |
NL | 19.10.2022 | ||
NO | 19.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/17] | NL | 19.10.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]EP1798174 (HAUNI MASCHINENBAU AG [DE]) [X] 1,7,8 * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0018] * * paragraph [0029] * * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0032]; figure - * [A] 2-6; | [AP]WO2016173854 (KRONES AG [DE]) [AP] 1,7 * page 9, line 25 - page 10, line 18 * * page 14, line 12 - line 34 * * page 18, line 5 - page 19, line 21 * * page 25, line 11 - line 26 * * page 26, line 6 - page 30, line 2 *; | [XPA]CN106144711 (CHANGSHA CTR ROBOTICS CO LTD) [XP] 1,7 * the whole document *[A] 2-6,8; | [E]WO2018192808 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [E] 1,7 * page 18, line 19 - page 22, line 22; figure -; claim - * | International search | [A]JPH02291341 (YOKOHAMA RUBBER CO LTD) [A] 1-8 * , (Family: none) *; | [A]JPH08207914 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD) [A] 1-8 * , (Family: none) *; | [A]JPH09323847 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD) [A] 1-8 * , (Family: none) *; | [A]US2016060059 (MACURA MATTHEW JOSEPH [US], et al) [A] 1-8* , & WO 2016/033003 A1 & EP 3186177 A1 & CN 106660728 A * |