EP3467828 - METHOD OF PREPARING A SINTERED MAGNET [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.11.2019 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.10.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 08.03.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.12.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Proterial, Ltd. 6-36, Toyosu 5-chome Koto-ku Tokyo 135-0061 / JP | [2023/17] |
Former [2019/15] | For all designated states Hitachi Metals, Ltd. 2-1, Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8614 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOSOKAWA, Seiichi c/o Yamazaki Works, HITACHI METALS, LTD. 2-15-17 Egawa Shimamoto-cho Mishima-gun, Osaka 6180013 / JP | 02 /
KOBAYASHI, Yoshinori c/o Yamazaki Works, HITACHI METALS, LTD. 2-15-17 Egawa Shimamoto-cho Mishima-gun, Osaka 6180013 / JP | 03 /
OGATA, Yasunobu c/o Yamazaki Works, HITACHI METALS, LTD. 2-15-17 Egawa Shimamoto-cho Mishima-gun, Osaka 6180013 / JP | 04 /
ODA, Etsushi c/o Yamazaki Works, HITACHI METALS, LTD. 2-15-17 Egawa Shimamoto-cho Osaka Mishima-gun, Osaka 6180013 / JP | [2019/15] | Representative(s) | Diehl & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei mbB Erika-Mann-Straße 9 80636 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/15] | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 18182479.8 | 26.12.2006 | [2019/15] | Priority number, date | JP20050378779 | 28.12.2005 Original published format: JP 2005378779 | [2019/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3467828 | Date: | 10.04.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.12.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G11B5/706, C01G49/00, C01G51/00, H01F1/113, C04B35/26 | [2019/15] | CPC: |
C01G51/006 (EP,US);
C04B35/26 (KR);
C01G49/0036 (EP,US);
C01G49/009 (EP,US);
C04B35/2641 (EP,US);
G11B5/70678 (EP,US);
H01F1/11 (KR);
H01F1/113 (EP,US);
C01P2002/54 (EP,US);
C01P2002/60 (EP,US);
C01P2004/03 (EP,US);
C01P2004/54 (EP,US);
C01P2004/61 (EP,US);
C01P2006/42 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3208 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3213 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3217 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3227 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3241 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3275 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3409 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3418 (EP,US);
C04B2235/5445 (EP,US);
C04B2235/767 (EP,US);
H01F41/0273 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2019/47] |
Former [2019/15] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON GESINTERTEM MAGNETEN | [2019/15] | English: | METHOD OF PREPARING A SINTERED MAGNET | [2019/15] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'AIMANT FRITTÉ | [2019/15] | Examination procedure | 10.10.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.10.2019 | Examination requested [2019/47] | 10.10.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.11.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.06.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.06.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 19.02.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP06843243.4 / EP1968077 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 08.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 08.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 08.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 08.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 08.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 08.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 20.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 28.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 10.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 08.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 17 | 06.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 18 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2005027153 (HITACHI METALS LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1-11 * paragraphs [0001] , [0010] , [0024] , [0050] , [0056] , [0059] , [0060] , [0087] * * page 22; examples 14,15 * * page 23; example 18 * * page 25; example 22 * * figure 18; claim 1 *; | [E]EP1798211 (TDK CORP [JP]) [E] 1-11 * page 5, line 10 - line 17 * * page 6, line 55 - page 7, line 10 * * page 10, line 21 - line 23 * * page 10, line 41 - line 43 * * page 11; examples 11-14 * * page 11, line 50 - line 52 * * page 13; examples 13,14 * * page 15; examples 41-43 * * page 17; examples 41-43 * * page 18; examples 51-58 ** page 20; examples 51-54,57 * | by applicant | JP3163279B | JP3181559B | WO2005027153 |