EP3473176 - ENDOTRACHEAL TUBE FOR NERVE MONITORING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.03.2021 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.11.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 22.03.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.10.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states COMEPA-INDUSTRIES 88 avenue du Général de Gaulle 93170 Bagnolet / FR | [2019/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PELLERIN DE BEAUVAIS, Gilles Helene Garden, Unit A2 22 Stanley Beach Road Hong-Kong / HK | [2019/17] | Representative(s) | Icosa 83 avenue Denfert-Rochereau 75014 Paris / FR | [2019/17] | Application number, filing date | 18201550.3 | 19.10.2018 | [2019/17] | Priority number, date | EP20170306450 | 20.10.2017 Original published format: EP 17306450 | [2019/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3473176 | Date: | 24.04.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.12.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/0488, A61B5/0492 | [2019/17] | CPC: |
A61B5/389 (EP);
A61B5/296 (EP);
A61B2560/0468 (EP);
A61B2562/0215 (EP);
A61B2562/046 (EP);
A61B2562/164 (EP);
A61B2562/166 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/49] |
Former [2019/17] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ENDOTRACHEALTUBUS ZUR ÜBERWACHUNG DER KEHLKOPFMUSKULATUR UND -NERVEN | [2019/17] | English: | ENDOTRACHEAL TUBE FOR NERVE MONITORING | [2019/17] | French: | TUBE ENDOTRACHÉAL POUR LE MONITORING DES NERFS ET MUSCLES LARYNGÉS | [2019/17] | Examination procedure | 24.10.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.10.2019 | Examination requested [2019/49] | 24.10.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.03.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.07.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO2011041684 (MEDTRONIC XOMED INC [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4-8,10,11,13,14 * paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0047] * * paragraph [0049] - paragraph [0053] * * paragraph [0064] * * paragraph [0085] * * paragraph [0091] * * figures 3-7,10 * [I] 3,9,12,15; | [A]EP0438863 (GOLDSTONE ANDREW C [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * page 4, column 6, line 26 - line 41 * * figures 1-4 * |