EP3803307 - SENSOR ARRANGEMENT AND METHOD OF OPERATING A SENSOR ARRANGEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.06.2024 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 14.07.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.03.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.03.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.12.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 15.04.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.07.2024 [2024/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sciosense B.V. High Tech Campus 10 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2021/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MACCIONI, Alberto c/o Sciosense B.V. High Tech Campus 10 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
BESLING, Willem Frederik Adrianus c/o Sciosense B.V. High Tech Campus 10 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2021/15] | Representative(s) | Epping - Hermann - Fischer Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Schloßschmidstraße 5 80639 München / DE | [2021/15] | Application number, filing date | 19715532.8 | 10.04.2019 | [2021/15] | WO2019EP59149 | Priority number, date | EP20180174623 | 28.05.2018 Original published format: EP 18174623 | [2021/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019228700 | Date: | 05.12.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3803307 | Date: | 14.04.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.12.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3803307 | Date: | 16.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.12.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G01L9/00, H03M3/00, G01L9/12, G01L27/00, G01L1/14, H03M1/10 | [2021/15] | CPC: |
G01L1/144 (EP);
G01L9/0072 (US);
G01L1/148 (EP);
G01L27/002 (EP);
G01L27/005 (US);
G01L9/0073 (EP);
G01L9/12 (EP,US);
H03M3/34 (EP,US);
H03M3/454 (EP,US);
H03M3/458 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/15] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SENSORANORDNUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM BETRIEB EINER SENSORANORDNUNG | [2021/15] | English: | SENSOR ARRANGEMENT AND METHOD OF OPERATING A SENSOR ARRANGEMENT | [2021/15] | French: | AGENCEMENT DE CAPTEURS ET PROCÉDÉ DE FONCTIONNEMENT D'AGENCEMENT DE CAPTEURS | [2021/15] | Entry into regional phase | 04.12.2020 | National basic fee paid | 04.12.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.12.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.12.2020 | Examination requested [2021/15] | 04.12.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.07.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.03.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.07.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 06.07.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.07.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 17.05.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 16.08.2023 | CZ | 16.08.2023 | DK | 16.08.2023 | EE | 16.08.2023 | ES | 16.08.2023 | FI | 16.08.2023 | HR | 16.08.2023 | LT | 16.08.2023 | LV | 16.08.2023 | NL | 16.08.2023 | PL | 16.08.2023 | RO | 16.08.2023 | RS | 16.08.2023 | SE | 16.08.2023 | SK | 16.08.2023 | SM | 16.08.2023 | NO | 16.11.2023 | GR | 17.11.2023 | IS | 16.12.2023 | PT | 18.12.2023 | [2024/23] |
Former [2024/22] | AT | 16.08.2023 | |
CZ | 16.08.2023 | ||
DK | 16.08.2023 | ||
FI | 16.08.2023 | ||
HR | 16.08.2023 | ||
LT | 16.08.2023 | ||
LV | 16.08.2023 | ||
NL | 16.08.2023 | ||
PL | 16.08.2023 | ||
RO | 16.08.2023 | ||
RS | 16.08.2023 | ||
SE | 16.08.2023 | ||
SM | 16.08.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | ||
IS | 16.12.2023 | ||
PT | 18.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AT | 16.08.2023 | |
FI | 16.08.2023 | ||
HR | 16.08.2023 | ||
LT | 16.08.2023 | ||
LV | 16.08.2023 | ||
NL | 16.08.2023 | ||
PL | 16.08.2023 | ||
RS | 16.08.2023 | ||
SE | 16.08.2023 | ||
SM | 16.08.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | ||
IS | 16.12.2023 | ||
PT | 18.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 16.08.2023 | |
FI | 16.08.2023 | ||
HR | 16.08.2023 | ||
LT | 16.08.2023 | ||
LV | 16.08.2023 | ||
NL | 16.08.2023 | ||
PL | 16.08.2023 | ||
RS | 16.08.2023 | ||
SE | 16.08.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | ||
IS | 16.12.2023 | ||
PT | 18.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 16.08.2023 | |
FI | 16.08.2023 | ||
LT | 16.08.2023 | ||
NL | 16.08.2023 | ||
SE | 16.08.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | ||
IS | 16.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 16.08.2023 | |
NL | 16.08.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2001020850 (MCINTOSH ROBERT B [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * paragraph [0004] - paragraph [0005]; figure 4; claim 1 * * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0020] * * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0046] *; | [A]US2008022762 (SKURNIK DAVID [US]) [A] 1-14 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0003]; figures 3,5; claims 1,5,7 * * paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0020] * * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0035] *; | [A]EP2653845 (NXP BV [NL]) [A] 1-14 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0004]; figures 1,3 * * paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0029] ** paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0035] *; | [A]US2015285701 (HAMMERSCHMIDT DIRK [AT]) [A] 1-14 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0002]; figures 1-7 * * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0031] *; | [AD]US2015295587 (GARCIA GONZALEZ JOSE MANUEL [ES], et al) [AD] 1-14 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0002]; figures 1-3 * * paragraph [0041] * * paragraph [0049] * * paragraph [0055] - paragraph [0060] * * paragraph [0072] - paragraph [0114] * * paragraph [0136] *; | [XAI]US2016265995 (WANG RONGTAI [US], et al) [X] 1,11-13 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0004]; figures 1,12,13; claims 1,4,5,13-16 * * paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0038] * * paragraph [0146] - paragraph [0183] * [A] 3-9,14 [I] 2,10; | [XI]US2017023429 (STRAEUSSNIGG DIETMAR [AT], et al) [X] 1-5,8,10-13 * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0033] * * paragraph [0039] - paragraph [0042] * * paragraph [0052] * * paragraph [0102] - paragraph [0113]; figures 1,2,6,17,18 * [I] 6,7,9,14 | Examination | US2007247171 | EP2653845 | by applicant | US2015295587 |