EP4023152 - SYSTEM AND METHOD OF PATIENT PROFILE CREATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.05.2023 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 03.06.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.05.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.06.2023 [2023/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 52 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2022/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SREENIVASAN, Rithesh 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
BUSSA, Nagaraju 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 03 /
PALANISAMY, Krishnamoorthy 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 04 /
VOGTMEIER, Gereon 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 05 /
JOHNSON, Mark Thomas 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 06 /
SISODIA, Rajendra Singh 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 07 /
WIESS, Steffen 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 08 /
LEUSSLER, Christoph Günther 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2022/27] | Representative(s) | Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 52 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2022/27] | Application number, filing date | 21150189.5 | 05.01.2021 | [2022/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4023152 | Date: | 06.07.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.06.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/055, A61B5/00, G16H50/00 | [2022/27] | CPC: |
A61B5/4884 (EP);
G16H50/50 (US);
A61B5/0077 (EP,US);
A61B5/055 (EP);
A61B5/165 (EP,US);
A61B5/4833 (US);
A61B5/6803 (EP,US);
A61B5/7405 (EP);
A61B5/742 (EP);
A61B5/7455 (EP);
G16H10/60 (US);
G16H20/00 (US);
G16H30/20 (EP);
G16H40/20 (EP);
G16H40/63 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/27] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR ERSTELLUNG VON PATIENTENPROFILEN | [2022/27] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD OF PATIENT PROFILE CREATION | [2022/27] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE CRÉATION DE PROFIL DE PATIENT | [2022/27] | Examination procedure | 10.01.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/24] | 01.02.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2023/24] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2023 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP3381353 (KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS NV [NL]) [X] 1-3,6-10,12-15 * paragraphs [0011] - [0012] - [0 14] , [0 21] - [0023] - [0 29] , [0 58] , [0 60] , [0 62] - [0066] - [0 69] , [0 71] * * figures 1, 2 * [I] 4,5,11; | [XI]US2020233485 (CHAN EVELYN [AU], et al) [X] 1,3,6,7,9,12-15 * paragraphs [0168] - [0169] - [ 197] , [ 232] * [I] 2,4,5,8,10,11; | [A]US2020265745 (BURAS WILLIAM R [US], et al) [A] 11* paragraphs [0173] , [ 179] - [0180] - [ 184] *; | [XI]US2020381125 (HAO XIN [CN], et al) [X] 1,10,13-15 * paragraphs [0080] - [0084] - [0 94] * [I] 2-9,11,12 |