EP4159783 - VERZWEIGTE ACRYLATFUNKTIONALE OLIGOMERE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.02.2024 Database last updated on 10.08.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 03.03.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.02.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.03.2024 [2024/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ARKEMA FRANCE 420, rue d'Estienne d'Orves 92700 Colombes / FR | [2023/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LI, Ling EXTON, 19341 / US | 02 /
HE, Yuhong EXTON, 19341 / US | 03 /
SHURDHA, Endrit EXTON, 19341 / US | [2023/14] | Representative(s) | Arkema Patent Arkema France DRD-DPI 420, rue d'Estienne d'Orves 92705 Colombes Cedex / FR | [2023/14] | Application number, filing date | 21306359.7 | 30.09.2021 | [2023/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4159783 | Date: | 05.04.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.03.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C08G59/17, C08G59/22, C08G59/40, C08G59/42 | [2023/14] | CPC: |
C08G59/1466 (EP,KR);
C08G59/42 (EP,KR);
C08G59/22 (EP,KR);
C08G59/4007 (EP,KR)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/14] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERZWEIGTE ACRYLATFUNKTIONALE OLIGOMERE | [2023/14] | English: | BRANCHED ACRYLATE FUNCTIONAL OLIGOMERS | [2023/14] | French: | OLIGOMÈRES FONCTIONNELS D'ACRYLATE RAMIFIÉS | [2023/14] | Examination procedure | 06.10.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/11] | 26.10.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2024/11] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2023 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE4109048 (TECH HOCHSCHULE C SCHORLEMMER [DE]); | [XI]GB2407574 (SHOWA HIGHPOLYMER [JP]); | [A]WO2017048949 (NDSU RES FOUND [US]) | by applicant | US5171763 | US5196485 | WO9527760 | US5548005 | US5891960 | US7041749 | US2008206471 | US2014336302 | US9234073 | US2016256363 | EP2350162 |