EP4184856 - BLOCKCHAIN TRANSACTION COMPRISING RUNNABLE CODE FOR HASH-BASED VERIFICATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.01.2024 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.11.2023 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 21.04.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states nChain Licensing AG Grafenauweg 6 6300 Zug / CH | [2023/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WAHAB, Jad London, W1W 8AP / GB | 02 /
ZHANG, Wei London, W1W 8AP / GB | 03 /
DOIRON, Brock London, W1W 8AP / GB | 04 /
VAUGHAN, Owen London, W1W 8AP / GB | 05 /
WRIGHT, Craig Steven London, W1W 8AP / GB | [2023/21] | Representative(s) | Page White Farrer Bedford House 21a John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2023/21] | Townsend, Martyn, et al Page White & Farrer Limited Bedford House 21A John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | Application number, filing date | 23151264.1 | 22.04.2020 | [2023/21] | Priority number, date | GB20190007395 | 24.05.2019 Original published format: GB 201907395 | [2023/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4184856 | Date: | 24.05.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.02.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H04L9/00, H04L9/32 | [2023/21] | CPC: |
H04L9/3252 (EP,KR,US);
H04L9/3239 (KR,US);
H04L9/3218 (EP,US);
H04L9/50 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/50] |
Former [2023/21] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | BLOCKCHAIN TRANSAKTION, UMFASSEND AUSFÜHRBAREN CODE FÜR HASH-BASIERTE VERIFIZIERUNG | [2023/21] | English: | BLOCKCHAIN TRANSACTION COMPRISING RUNNABLE CODE FOR HASH-BASED VERIFICATION | [2023/21] | French: | TRANSACTION DANS UNE CHAÎNE À BLOCS, COMPRENANT DU CODE EXÉCUTABLE POUR LA VÉRIFICATION BASÉE SUR L'HACHAGE | [2023/21] | Examination procedure | 07.11.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.11.2023 | Examination requested [2023/50] | 07.11.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.12.2023 | Observations by third parties | 15.01.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP20724199.3 / EP3977673 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2018215876 (NCHAIN HOLDINGS LTD [AG]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * page 31, line 23 - page 37, line 16 *; | [A] - Rajput Ubaidullah ET AL, "A Solution towards Eliminating Transaction Malleability in Bitcoin", Journal of Information Processing Systems Vol. 14, No. 4, (20180801), pages 837 - 850, URL: http://jips-k.org/journals/jips/digital-library/manuscript/file/22921/JIPS-2018-14-4-837.pdf, (20200603), XP055700451 [A] 1-15 * abstract * * Chapter 3. "Bitcoin Basics"; pages 839-843 * | [A] - Simon Barber ET AL, "Bitter to Better - How to Make Bitcoin a Better Currency", doi:10.1007/978-3-642-32946-3_29, (20120218), URL: http://elaineshi.com/docs/bitcoin.pdf, (20170426), XP055367949 [A] 1-15 * abstract * * Chapter 3. "Under the Hood of the Bitcoin System" * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/978-3-642-32946-3_29 |