EP4327836 - AIRBORNE SURFACE DISINFECTION BY CHLORINE DIOXIDE GAS USING ULTRASONIC-ASSISTED FUMIGATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 26.01.2024 Database last updated on 10.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.01.2024 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 28.02.2024 [2024/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Konax BV Hondekensmolenstraat 56 8870 Izegem / BE | [2024/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Demyttenaere, Karel 8700 Izegem / BE | 02 /
Goudezeune, Stefaan 8700 Izegem / BE | [2024/09] | Representative(s) | Brantsandpatents bv Pauline Van Pottelsberghelaan 24 9051 Ghent / BE | [2024/09] | Application number, filing date | 23193436.5 | 25.08.2023 | [2024/09] | Priority number, date | BE20220005680 | 26.08.2022 Original published format: BE 202205680 | [2024/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4327836 | Date: | 28.02.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.01.2024 | Classification | IPC: | A61L2/20, A61L2/24, A61L9/12, A61L9/14 | [2024/09] | CPC: |
A61L2/206 (EP);
A61L2/24 (EP);
A61L9/12 (EP);
A61L9/14 (EP);
A61L2101/38 (EP);
A61L2202/11 (EP);
A61L2202/13 (EP);
A61L2202/14 (EP);
A61L2202/25 (EP);
A61L2209/111 (EP);
A61L2209/132 (EP);
A61L2209/21 (EP);
A61L9/122 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/09] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DESINFEKTION VON LUFTOBERFLÄCHEN DURCH CHLORDIOXIDGAS MITTELS ULTRASCHALLGESTÜTZTER BEGASUNG | [2024/09] | English: | AIRBORNE SURFACE DISINFECTION BY CHLORINE DIOXIDE GAS USING ULTRASONIC-ASSISTED FUMIGATION | [2024/09] | French: | DÉSINFECTION DE SURFACE EN SUSPENSION DANS L'AIR PAR DU DIOXYDE DE CHLORE GAZEUX À L'AIDE D'UNE FUMIGATION ASSISTÉE PAR ULTRASONS | [2024/09] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CN101366965 (FEILONG LI [CN]) [A] 11,15 * claims 1-2 *; | [XAI]JP2015155363 (TAKASAGO THERMAL ENGINEERING) [X] 1,4,6,13,14 * see especially fig. 2-3 &5-8 and the corresponding text passages * [A] 11,15 [I] 2,3,5,7-10,12; | [A]CN212619082U (QINGDAO SHUNDEXIN INNOVATION TECH CO LTD) [A] 11,15* claims 1-2 *; | [XAI]CN113499464 (GUANGDONG NANXING RAINBOW NUTS PRODUCTS CO LTD) [X] 14 * see especially fig. 1 and the corresponding text passages * [A] 11,15 [I] 1-10,12,13 |