EP0004993 - Daylight loading system for microfiche cassettes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2016 Database last updated on 10.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Agfa-Gevaert N.V. Septestraat 27 2640 Mortsel / BE | [N/P] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Vackier, Leo Norbert Zonneweelde 6 B-2232 's-Gravenwezel / BE | 02 /
Van der Vliet, Lucien Philomon Berkenrodelei 121 B-2710 Hoboken / BE | 03 /
Bals, Roger Jean Parklaan 8 B-2621 Schelle / BE | [N/P] | Application number, filing date | 79200182.8 | 12.04.1979 | Priority number, date | GB19780015241 | 18.04.1978 Original published format: GB 1524178 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0004993 | Date: | 31.10.1979 | Language: | EN | [N/P] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0004993 | Date: | 09.02.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.09.1979 | Classification | IPC: | G03B17/26, G03B41/18 | [1983/06] | CPC: |
G03B17/26 (EP,US);
G03B42/045 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Laden von Mikrofichekassetten bei Tageslicht | English: | Daylight loading system for microfiche cassettes | French: | Système de chargement de cassettes de microfiches à la lumière du jour | Examination procedure | 08.04.1980 | Examination requested [1980/14] | 18.05.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.09.1981 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.10.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 05.12.1981 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.04.1982 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 16.07.1982 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.09.1982 | Fee for grant paid | 17.09.1982 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.11.1983 | No opposition filed within time limit [ N /P ] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.1981 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.04.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE2544818 [ ] (ALEX JACKNAU FILMAUFNAHME UND); | FR2302547 [ ] (AZZARONI CESARO [IT]); | FR1250802 [ ] (GEVAERT PHOTO PROD NV); | US3912932 [ ] (MATSUMOTO TAKAAKI, et al); | NL278019 [ ]; | DE1497446 [ ] (EUROGRAPH GMBH); | DE1182951 [ ] (GEVAERT PHOTO PROD NV) |