EP0100763 - Stretching device for stone sawing blades [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.02.1985 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.02.1985 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.05.1985 [1985/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Egleme, Paul Rue du Baillois, 42 B-1330 Rixensart / BE | [1984/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1984/07] | Application number, filing date | 83870070.6 | 08.07.1983 | [1984/07] | Priority number, date | FR19820013532 | 03.08.1982 Original published format: FR 8213532 | [1984/07] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0100763 | Date: | 15.02.1984 | Language: | FR | [1984/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.12.1983 | Classification | IPC: | B28D1/06 | [1984/07] | CPC: |
B27B3/30 (EP);
B23D51/08 (EP);
B28D1/068 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT [1984/07] | Title | German: | Spannvorrichtung für Steinsägeblätter | [1984/07] | English: | Stretching device for stone sawing blades | [1984/07] | French: | Equipage tendeur de lame de scie à pierre | [1984/07] | File destroyed: | 13.07.1991 | Examination procedure | 15.10.1984 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1985/18] | 14.11.1984 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1985/18] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR409956 ; | [A]FR1581852 ; | [A]US1746662 |