EP0159910 - Method and apparatus for centrifugal separation of dispersed phase from continuous liquid phase [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.01.1991 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.01.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.03.1991 [1991/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EXXON RESEARCH AND ENGINEERING COMPANY P.O.Box 390 180 Park Avenue Florham Park New Jersey 07932-0390 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1985/44] | For all designated states EXXON RESEARCH AND ENGINEERING COMPANY P.O.Box 390, 180 Park Avenue Florham Park, New Jersey 07932-0390 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ryan, Douglas Giles 145 Andrea Drive Rockaway New Jersey 07866 / US | [1985/44] | Representative(s) | Somers, Harold Arnold, et al ESSO Engineering (Europe) Ltd. Patents & Licences Mailpoint 12 Esso House, Ermyn Way Leatherhead, Surrey KT22 8XE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/39] | Somers, Harold Arnold, et al ESSO Engineering (Europe) Ltd. Patents & Licences Mailpoint 72 Esso House Ermyn Way Leatherhead, Surrey KT22 8XE / GB | ||
Former [1985/44] | Pitkin, Robert Wilfred ESSO Engineering (Europe) Ltd. Patents & Licences Apex Tower High Street New Malden Surrey KT3 4DJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 85302676.3 | 17.04.1985 | [1985/44] | Priority number, date | US19840601254 | 17.04.1984 Original published format: US 601254 | US19840601271 | 17.04.1984 Original published format: US 601271 | US19840601275 | 17.04.1984 Original published format: US 601275 | US19850722164 | 11.04.1985 Original published format: US 722164 | [1985/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0159910 | Date: | 30.10.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0159910 | Date: | 12.02.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0159910 | Date: | 28.03.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.12.1985 | Classification | IPC: | B01D17/038, B01D17/06, B04B5/10, C10G32/02, C10G73/28 | [1990/13] | CPC: |
B01D11/04 (EP);
B01D17/0217 (EP);
B01D17/06 (EP);
B03C5/024 (EP);
C10G73/28 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1986/06] | B01D17/038, B01D35/06, B03C5/00, B04B5/10, C10G32/02, C10G73/28 | ||
Former IPC [1985/44] | B01D17/038, C10G73/28 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1985/44] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum zentrifugalen Trennen einer dispersen Phase von einer zusammenhängenden flüssigen Phase | [1985/44] | English: | Method and apparatus for centrifugal separation of dispersed phase from continuous liquid phase | [1985/44] | French: | Méthode et appareil de séparation centrifuge de phase dispersée d'une phase liquide continue | [1985/44] | Examination procedure | 10.07.1986 | Examination requested [1986/37] | 21.01.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.04.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.05.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M09) | 04.02.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.08.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 11.04.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.06.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.09.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.12.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 01.12.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.12.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.03.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.03.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4116790 (PRESTRIDGE FLOYD LEON); | [A]GB1359874 (BRONSWERK APPARATENBOUW); | [AD]US2151318 (LYLE DILLON, et al); | [AD]US2174938 (LYLE DILLON, et al); | [A]US2061197 (KIECH CLARENCE F); | [AD]US4255777 (KELLY ARNOLD J); | [A]US4194956 (SEGUINE EDWARD S [US]); | [A]US4139441 (BOSE PHILLIP R) | Examination | US1838920 | US2108258 | US3129157 | US3616460 | US4469582 | by applicant | US4435261 | US4116790 | GB1359874 | US4255777 | US4581112 | US4622118 | US4627901 | US4622119 | US19850772163 | US19850722162 | US19850722160 | US19850722107 |