EP0564031 - Display device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 21.11.1997 Database last updated on 10.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.11.1997 | Refusal of application | published on 07.01.1998 [1998/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1993/40] | For all designated states Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 NL-5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pitt, Michael Geoffrey c/o Int. Octrooibureau B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [1993/40] | Representative(s) | Raap, Adriaan Yde, et al Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1993/40] | Raap, Adriaan Yde, et al INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 93200868.3 | 26.03.1993 | [1993/40] | Priority number, date | EP19920200951 | 03.04.1992 Original published format: EP 92200951 | [1993/40] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0564031 | Date: | 06.10.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.07.1993 | Classification | IPC: | G02F1/136 | [1993/40] | CPC: |
G02F1/1365 (EP,KR,US);
G02F1/136204 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1993/40] | Title | German: | Wiedergabeanordnung | [1993/40] | English: | Display device | [1993/40] | French: | Dispositif d'affichage | [1993/40] | Examination procedure | 23.03.1994 | Examination requested [1994/22] | 15.12.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.04.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.10.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.01.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.08.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [1998/02] | 18.08.1997 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1998/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.04.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.04.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP63029729 ; | [X]EP0369828 (NEC CORP [JP]); | [AD]EP0369450 (SEIKO INSTR INC [JP]) |