EP0657886 - Magnetic tape cartridge having triple lid assembly [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.12.2000 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.12.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.01.2001 [2001/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi Maxell Ltd. No 1-1-88, Ushitora Ibaraki-shi Osaka-fu / JP | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2000/05] | For all designated states Hitachi Maxell Ltd. No 1-1-88, Ushitora Ibaraki-shi Osaka-fu / JP | ||
For all designated states HITACHI, LTD. 6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo / JP | |||
Former [1995/24] | For all designated states Hitachi Maxell Ltd. No 1-1-88, Ushitora Ibaraki-shi Osaka-fu / JP | ||
For all designated states HITACHI, LTD. 6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mizutani, Hikaru 1-18-25, Sakurai Mino-shi, Osaka-fu / JP | 02 /
Inoue, Mikihisa 1, Koizumi, Oyamazaki-cho Otokuni-gun, Kyoto-fu / JP | 03 /
Masuda, Kenmei, E-205 Green Park Totsuka Hills, 1269, Shimokurata-cho, Totsuka-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | 04 /
Takeda, Hidekazu 407 Towa City-Coop, Hiratsuka, 3-18-33, Goten Hiratsuka-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | [1995/24] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/24] | Selting, Günther, et al Patentanwälte von Kreisler-Selting-Werner, Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 (Deichmannhaus) D-50667 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 94118640.5 | 29.11.1994 | [1995/24] | Priority number, date | JP19930326195 | 29.11.1993 Original published format: JP 32619593 | [1995/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0657886 | Date: | 14.06.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/24] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0657886 | Date: | 28.06.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0657886 | Date: | 02.02.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.05.1995 | Classification | IPC: | G11B23/087 | [1995/24] | CPC: |
G11B23/08735 (EP,US);
G11B33/04 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1995/24] | Title | German: | Magnetische Bandkassette mit dreifachem Türzusammenbau | [1995/24] | English: | Magnetic tape cartridge having triple lid assembly | [1995/24] | French: | Cassette pour bande magnétique avec un assemblage pour triple couvercle | [1995/24] | Examination procedure | 22.12.1995 | Examination requested [1996/08] | 08.07.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.11.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.01.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 01.06.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 10.06.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.08.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 26.08.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP99109988.8 / EP0935250 | Opposition(s) | 03.11.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.11.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.11.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DX]FR2508223 (SONY CORP [JP]) [DX] 1 * page 4, line 18 - page 6, line 33; figures 4,7-9 *; | [X]EP0570132 (SONY CORP [JP]) [X] 1 * column 9, line 40 - column 12, line 53; figures 5,10B * |