EP0715697 - TRANSMISSION MECHANISM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.04.2002 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aimbridge Pty. Ltd. 9th Floor, 161 Collins Street Melbourne, VIC 3000 / AU | [1996/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WILLMOT, Eric, Paul 19 Grevillea Crescent Stonyfell, S.A. 5066 / AU | [1996/24] | Representative(s) | Howden, Christopher A. FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/24] | Howden, Christopher Andrew FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Franz-Joseph-Strasse 38 80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 94922194.9 | 05.08.1994 | [1996/24] | WO1994AU00445 | Priority number, date | AU1993PM00912 | 30.08.1993 Original published format: AU PM091293 | [1996/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9506829 | Date: | 09.03.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0715697 | Date: | 12.06.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.03.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0715697 | Date: | 23.05.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 09.03.1995 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.02.1998 | Classification | IPC: | F16H29/16, F16H29/18, F16H29/20, F16H48/16 | [1996/24] | CPC: |
B62M9/08 (EP,KR,US);
F16H29/16 (EP,KR,US);
F16H29/20 (EP,KR,US);
Y10T74/151 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [1996/24] | Title | German: | GETRIEBEMECHANISMUS | [1996/24] | English: | TRANSMISSION MECHANISM | [1996/24] | French: | MECANISME DE TRANSMISSION | [1996/24] | Entry into regional phase | 08.02.1996 | National basic fee paid | 08.02.1996 | Search fee paid | 08.02.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.02.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.03.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed | 08.02.1996 | Examination requested [1996/24] | 26.02.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.05.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.06.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.12.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.09.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.11.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.12.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 11.12.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.02.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.08.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.08.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 23.05.2001 | BE | 23.05.2001 | CH | 23.05.2001 | GR | 23.05.2001 | IT | 23.05.2001 | LI | 23.05.2001 | NL | 23.05.2001 | IE | 06.08.2001 | DK | 23.08.2001 | PT | 23.08.2001 | SE | 23.08.2001 | ES | 30.11.2001 | [2008/05] |
Former [2004/07] | AT | 23.05.2001 | |
BE | 23.05.2001 | ||
CH | 23.05.2001 | ||
GR | 23.05.2001 | ||
LI | 23.05.2001 | ||
NL | 23.05.2001 | ||
IE | 06.08.2001 | ||
DK | 23.08.2001 | ||
PT | 23.08.2001 | ||
SE | 23.08.2001 | ||
ES | 30.11.2001 | ||
Former [2004/04] | AT | 23.05.2001 | |
BE | 23.05.2001 | ||
CH | 23.05.2001 | ||
LI | 23.05.2001 | ||
NL | 23.05.2001 | ||
IE | 06.08.2001 | ||
DK | 23.08.2001 | ||
PT | 23.08.2001 | ||
SE | 23.08.2001 | ||
ES | 30.11.2001 | ||
Former [2003/45] | AT | 23.05.2001 | |
BE | 23.05.2001 | ||
CH | 23.05.2001 | ||
LI | 23.05.2001 | ||
NL | 23.05.2001 | ||
IE | 06.08.2001 | ||
DK | 23.08.2001 | ||
PT | 23.08.2001 | ||
SE | 23.08.2001 | ||
Former [2003/08] | AT | 23.05.2001 | |
BE | 23.05.2001 | ||
CH | 23.05.2001 | ||
LI | 23.05.2001 | ||
NL | 23.05.2001 | ||
IE | 06.08.2001 | ||
PT | 23.08.2001 | ||
SE | 23.08.2001 | ||
Former [2002/48] | AT | 23.05.2001 | |
BE | 23.05.2001 | ||
CH | 23.05.2001 | ||
LI | 23.05.2001 | ||
IE | 06.08.2001 | ||
PT | 23.08.2001 | ||
SE | 23.08.2001 | ||
Former [2002/26] | AT | 23.05.2001 | |
BE | 23.05.2001 | ||
CH | 23.05.2001 | ||
LI | 23.05.2001 | ||
PT | 23.08.2001 | ||
SE | 23.08.2001 | ||
Former [2002/15] | AT | 23.05.2001 | |
BE | 23.05.2001 | ||
CH | 23.05.2001 | ||
LI | 23.05.2001 | ||
SE | 23.08.2001 | ||
Former [2002/14] | AT | 23.05.2001 | |
BE | 23.05.2001 | ||
SE | 23.08.2001 | ||
Former [2002/12] | BE | 23.05.2001 | |
SE | 23.08.2001 | ||
Former [2002/05] | SE | 23.08.2001 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]BE382384 (HAP MANUFACTURING LIMITED) [X] 15 * page 1, paragraph 1 - page 2, paragraph 4 * * page 4, paragraph 4 - page 6, paragraph 1 * * figures 1-3 *; | [A]FR1067935 (EXCENTRIC GETRIEBE G M B H) [A] 1,3,9,10,18-20 * page 1, column 2, paragraph 3 * * page 3, column 1, paragraph 3 - paragraph 4 * * figures 1-7 *; | [XA]FR1078473 (CHAMBON F, CHAMBON J) [X] 15,17 * page 3, column 1, paragraph 3 - page 4, column 2, paragraph 3 * * figures 1-6 * [A] 1,3,9,10,18-20; | [A]US2864259 (HENRY TROEGER) [A] 1,9,12-14* the whole document *; | [XA]US4712450 (TAKAMIYA KIKUZO [JP], et al) [X] 1,3,9,10,15-20 * abstract * * column 1, line 1 - column 2, line 25 * * column 4, line 59 - column 5, line 64 * * figures 1-9,15 * [A] 7,11,12; | [X]US4732054 (TAKAMIYA KIKUZO [JP], et al) [X] 1,3,9,10,18-20 * abstract * * column 1, line 11 - line 52 * * column 5, line 28 - line 19 * * column 7, line 8 - line 40 * * figures 1-5,8,9 *; | [X]US4983151 (PIRES PAUL B [US]) [X] 1,9,12-14 * abstract * * column 3, line 11 - column 4, line 22 * * column 11, line 45 - column 12, line 46 * * figures 1-9,20 *; | [A]US5029486 (MERCAT JEAN-PIERRE [FR]) [A] 1,9,10,18-20 * abstract * * figures 1-3 * | International search | [A]AU7648381 (WILLMOT ERIC PAUL); | [X]US4732054 (TAKAMIYA KIKUZO [JP], et al); | [A]US5029486 (MERCAT JEAN-PIERRE [FR]) |