EP0709250 - Seat frame assembly for a motor vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.03.2001 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.12.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 11.02.2004 [2004/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ATOMA INTERNATIONAL INC. 521 Newpark Boulevard, P.O.Box 354 Newmarket, Ontario L3Y 4X7 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [1996/18] | For all designated states ATOMA INTERNATIONAL INC. 521 Newpark Boulevard, P.O.Box 354 Newmarket, Ontario L3Y 4X7 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schultz, Fred B. 33715 Bernadine Farmington Hills, Michigan 48335 / US | 02 /
MgGlinnen, Paul W. 24616 Naples Novi, Michigan 48374 / US | 03 /
Hadley, Philip W. 5808 Putnam West Bloomfield, Michigan 48323 / US | 04 /
Liu, Frank Q. 8225 Brooke Park Drive Canton, Michigan 48187 / US | [1996/18] | Representative(s) | Laight, Martin Harvey Beck Greener Fulwood House 12 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/18] | Laight, Martin Harvey W.H. Beck, Greener & Co. 7 Stone Buildings Lincoln's Inn London WC2A 3SZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 95307171.9 | 11.10.1995 | [1996/18] | Priority number, date | US19940323248 | 17.10.1994 Original published format: US 323248 | [1996/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0709250 | Date: | 01.05.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/18] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0709250 | Date: | 04.06.1997 | [1997/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0709250 | Date: | 31.05.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.04.1997 | Classification | IPC: | B60N2/44, B60N2/42 | [1996/18] | CPC: |
B60N2/58 (EP,US);
B60N2/00 (KR);
B60N2/682 (EP,US);
B60N2/688 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49805 (EP,US);
Y10T29/4984 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [1996/18] | Title | German: | Sitzarmatur für Kraftfahrzeuge | [1996/18] | English: | Seat frame assembly for a motor vehicle | [1996/18] | French: | Armature de siège pour véhicule automobiles | [1996/18] | Examination procedure | 10.11.1997 | Examination requested [1998/02] | 12.01.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.07.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.08.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.12.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.03.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 01.03.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.03.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 31.05.2000 | CH | 31.05.2000 | GR | 31.05.2000 | LI | 31.05.2000 | NL | 31.05.2000 | DK | 31.08.2000 | PT | 31.08.2000 | [2004/07] |
Former [2003/45] | BE | 31.05.2000 | |
CH | 31.05.2000 | ||
LI | 31.05.2000 | ||
NL | 31.05.2000 | ||
DK | 31.08.2000 | ||
PT | 31.08.2000 | ||
Former [2003/08] | BE | 31.05.2000 | |
CH | 31.05.2000 | ||
LI | 31.05.2000 | ||
NL | 31.05.2000 | ||
PT | 31.08.2000 | ||
Former [2002/02] | BE | 31.05.2000 | |
CH | 31.05.2000 | ||
LI | 31.05.2000 | ||
PT | 31.08.2000 | ||
Former [2001/16] | BE | 31.05.2000 | |
PT | 31.08.2000 | ||
Former [2001/11] | BE | 31.05.2000 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE1092322 (NSU WERKE AG) [X] 15 * figure - *; | [XA]DE3229857 (VOLKSWAGENWERK AG [DE]) [X] 15 * figures 1-3 * [A] 1; | [A]EP0506226 (HOOVER UNIVERSAL [US]) [A] 1,15* figure 2 *; | [A]DE9320333U (AUSTRIA METALL [AT]) [A] 1,15 * page 1, paragraph 1 - page 2, line 21 * * page 5, paragraph 2 - paragraph 3; figures 6A,,6B; claim 1 *; | [PX]US5437498 (WAELDE TODD W [US]) [PX] 15 * figure 2 * |