EP0671249 - Process and device for the production of optical lenses [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.11.2000 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.11.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.01.2001 [2001/02] | Applicant(s) | For:BE
CH
DE
DK
ES
FR
GB
GR
IE
IT
LI
LU
NL
PT
SE
Novartis AG Schwarzwaldallee 215 4058 Basel / CH | For:AT
Novartis-Erfindungen Verwaltungsgesellschaft m.b.H. Brunner Strasse 59 1235 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [1999/09] | For:BE
CH
DE
DK
ES
FR
GB
GR
IE
IT
LI
LU
NL
PT
SE
Novartis AG Schwarzwaldallee 215 4058 Basel / CH | ||
For:AT
Novartis-Erfindungen Verwaltungsgesellschaft m.b.H. Brunner Strasse 59 1235 Wien / AT | |||
Former [1999/05] | For all designated states Novartis-Erfindungen Verwaltungsgesellschaft m.b.H. Brunner Strasse 59 1235 Wien / AT | ||
Former [1997/14] | For all designated states Novartis AG Schwarzwaldallee 215 4058 Basel / CH | ||
Former [1995/37] | For all designated states CIBA-GEIGY AG Klybeckstrasse 141 CH-4002 Basel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Haase, Lothar Hahner Strasse 55 D-51597 Morsbach/Sieg / DE | [1995/37] | Application number, filing date | 95810126.3 | 28.02.1995 | [1995/37] | Priority number, date | EP19940810141 | 07.03.1994 Original published format: EP 94810141 | [1995/37] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0671249 | Date: | 13.09.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0671249 | Date: | 26.01.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.07.1995 | Classification | IPC: | B29C43/36, B29D11/00, B29C31/06 | [1995/37] | CPC: |
B29C31/041 (EP,US);
B29C33/0055 (EP,US);
B29C43/021 (EP,US);
B29C43/34 (EP,US);
B29C43/361 (EP,US);
B29C43/40 (EP,US);
B29C43/50 (EP,US);
B29C45/561 (EP,US);
B29D11/00125 (EP,US);
B29D11/0023 (EP,US);
B29C2043/3444 (EP,US);
B29C2043/3615 (EP,US);
B29C2043/3634 (EP,US);
B29C2043/503 (EP,US);
B29C2045/5625 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1995/37] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Herstellung optischen Linsen | [1995/37] | English: | Process and device for the production of optical lenses | [1995/37] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour la fabrication de lentilles optiques | [1995/37] | Examination procedure | 22.02.1996 | Examination requested [1996/17] | 18.05.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.11.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.03.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.07.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.10.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 09.10.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.10.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US3670066 (VALYI EMERY I) [Y] 2,6* column 2, line 64 - column 3, line 18; figure 3 *; | [XY]US4138086 (MIZUTANI YUTAKA, et al) [X] 1,5 * column 3, line 53 - column 3, line 60; figure 1 * [Y] 2,6 |