EP0753774 - Electrical connection device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.10.2001 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.03.2010 | Change - representative | published on 14.04.2010 [2010/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GEBRÜDER MERTEN GMBH & CO. KG Fritz-Kotz-Strasse 8 52674 Wiehl / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/03] | For all designated states Gebrüder Merten GmbH & Co. KG Fritz-Kotz-Strasse 8 52674 Wiehl / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Erbse, Karl-Ulrich, Dipl.-Phys. Hülsenweg 9 51647 Gummersbach / DE | 02 /
Gringmann, Klaus Hückeswagener Str. 9 51647 Gummersbach / DE | 03 /
Schmidt, Helmut, Dipl.-Ing. Am Rosberg 16 51647 Gummersbach / DE | 04 /
Stefanski, Manfred, Dipl.-Ing. Heiler Str. 63 51647 Gummersbach / DE | 05 /
Vicktorius, Richard, Dipl.-Ing. Siegmundstr. 11 50739 Köln / DE | [1997/03] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/15] | von Kreisler Selting Werner Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | ||
Former [1997/03] | Selting, Günther, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte von Kreisler-Selting-Werner, Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 (Deichmannhaus) 50667 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 96110352.0 | 27.06.1996 | [1997/03] | Priority number, date | DE1995125212 | 11.07.1995 Original published format: DE 19525212 | DE1995142166 | 11.11.1995 Original published format: DE 19542166 | [1997/03] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0753774 | Date: | 15.01.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/03] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0753774 | Date: | 05.08.1998 | [1998/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.06.1998 | Classification | IPC: | G02B6/38, G02B6/42 | [1998/32] | CPC: |
G02B6/3817 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1997/03] | G02B6/38 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [1997/03] | Title | German: | Elektrische Steckvorrichtung | [1997/03] | English: | Electrical connection device | [1997/03] | French: | Dispositif de connexion électrique | [1997/03] | Examination procedure | 23.12.1998 | Examination requested [1999/09] | 21.12.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.04.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.01.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.05.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2001/50] | 05.07.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2001/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2001 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP0142970 (AMERICAN TELEPHONE & TELEGRAPH [US]) [X] 1,2,4,7,8 * page 4, line 34 - page 6, line 10; figures 1-3 * [Y] 3,5; | [Y]EP0452688 (BOSCH SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE [DE]) [Y] 3,5 * the whole document *; | [XDA]DE3227770 (MERTEN GMBH & CO KG GEB [DE]) [XD] 8 * page 15, line 7 - page 16, line 6; figures 11,12 * [A] 1-7; | [A]US5033112 (BOWLING GEOFFREY N [CA], et al) [A] 1-8 * column 6, line 40 - column 11, line 59; figures 7-11 * | by applicant | DE3226265 | DE3227770 | EP0344609 |