EP0835003 - Channel add-drop device over a multichannel bidirectional optical link [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.10.2001 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.09.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 12.11.2003 [2003/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALCATEL 54, rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | [1999/08] |
Former [1998/15] | For all designated states ALCATEL ALSTHOM COMPAGNIE GENERALE D'ELECTRICITE 54, rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gautheron, Olivier 10, rue Saint Martin 78180 Montigny Le Bretonneux / FR | 02 /
Letellier, Vincent 144, avenue d'Italie 75013 Paris / FR | [1998/15] | Representative(s) | Lamoureux, Bernard, et al Alcatel Lucent Intellectual Property & Standards 54 Rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1998/15] | Lamoureux, Bernard, et al Alcatel Alsthom, Département Propriété Industrielle, 30, avenue Kléber 75116 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 97402263.4 | 29.09.1997 | [1998/15] | Priority number, date | FR19960012057 | 03.10.1996 Original published format: FR 9612057 | [1998/15] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0835003 | Date: | 08.04.1998 | Language: | FR | [1998/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0835003 | Date: | 29.11.2000 | Language: | FR | [2000/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.02.1998 | Classification | IPC: | H04B10/24, H04J14/02 | [1998/15] | CPC: |
G02B6/2932 (EP,US);
G02B6/29383 (EP,US);
H04B10/25891 (EP,US);
H04J14/0213 (EP,US);
H04J14/0206 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, DK, GB, IT [1998/52] |
Former [1998/15] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Kanal Einfügungs/Ausblendungsvorrichtung über eine optische bidirektionale Mehrkanalverbindung | [1998/15] | English: | Channel add-drop device over a multichannel bidirectional optical link | [1998/15] | French: | Dispositif d'insertion/extraction de canaux sur une liaison optique multicanaux bidirectionnelle | [1998/15] | Examination procedure | 22.08.1998 | Examination requested [1998/45] | 20.01.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.04.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.08.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 31.03.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.07.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 10.07.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.08.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DK | 28.02.2001 | [2003/46] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2687030 (ALSTHOM CGE ALCATEL [FR]) [A] 1* page 9, line 1 - page 10, line 28; figures 3,4 *; | [A] - CHAWKI ET AL, "Evaluation of an Optical Boosted Add/Drop Multiplexer OBADM including circulators and fiber grating filters", 21ST EUROPEAN CONFERENCE ON OPTICAL COMMUNICATION ECOC 95, (19950917), vol. 1, pages 47 - 50, XP002032556 [A] 1,2 * page 47, paragraph 3; figures 1A,1B * | [A] - JONES K P ET AL, "OPTICAL WAVELENGTH ADD-DROP MULTIPLEXER IN INSTALLED SUBMARINE WDM NETWORK", ELECTRONICS LETTERS, (19951123), vol. 31, no. 24, page 2117/2118, XP000548194 [A] 1 * page 2117, column R, paragraph 2; figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1049/el:19951424 |