EP0991844 - IMPROVED CLOSURE SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.06.2003 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.04.2005 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FI | published on 25.05.2005 [2005/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cook, Gregory H. 3826 N. Highway Drive Tucson, AZ 85705 / US | For all designated states Cook, Charles E. 2416 Sierra Lane Plano, TX 75075 / US | [2000/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2000/15] | Representative(s) | Vleck, Jan Montagu Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/15] | Vleck, Jan Montagu Reddie & Grose, 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 97932275.7 | 25.06.1997 | [2000/15] | WO1997US11012 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9859144 | Date: | 30.12.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0991844 | Date: | 12.04.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.12.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0991844 | Date: | 21.08.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.12.1998 | Classification | IPC: | E06B9/06 | [2000/15] | CPC: |
E06B9/0676 (EP);
E06B9/0638 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [2000/15] | Title | German: | VERSCHLUSSSYSTEM | [2000/15] | English: | IMPROVED CLOSURE SYSTEM | [2000/15] | French: | SYSTEME DE FERMETURE AMELIORE | [2000/15] | Entry into regional phase | 06.01.2000 | National basic fee paid | 06.01.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.01.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.01.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 06.01.2000 | Examination requested [2000/15] | 02.05.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.07.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.12.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.02.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.05.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 07.05.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.05.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 21.08.2002 | BE | 21.08.2002 | CH | 21.08.2002 | FI | 21.08.2002 | GR | 21.08.2002 | LI | 21.08.2002 | NL | 21.08.2002 | DK | 21.11.2002 | SE | 21.11.2002 | PT | 05.12.2002 | ES | 28.02.2003 | [2005/21] |
Former [2005/01] | AT | 21.08.2002 | |
BE | 21.08.2002 | ||
CH | 21.08.2002 | ||
GR | 21.08.2002 | ||
LI | 21.08.2002 | ||
NL | 21.08.2002 | ||
DK | 21.11.2002 | ||
SE | 21.11.2002 | ||
PT | 05.12.2002 | ||
ES | 28.02.2003 | ||
Former [2004/04] | AT | 21.08.2002 | |
BE | 21.08.2002 | ||
CH | 21.08.2002 | ||
GR | 21.08.2002 | ||
LI | 21.08.2002 | ||
NL | 21.08.2002 | ||
DK | 21.11.2002 | ||
PT | 05.12.2002 | ||
ES | 28.02.2003 | ||
Former [2003/48] | AT | 21.08.2002 | |
BE | 21.08.2002 | ||
CH | 21.08.2002 | ||
GR | 21.08.2002 | ||
LI | 21.08.2002 | ||
NL | 21.08.2002 | ||
DK | 21.11.2002 | ||
PT | 05.12.2002 | ||
Former [2003/46] | AT | 21.08.2002 | |
CH | 21.08.2002 | ||
GR | 21.08.2002 | ||
LI | 21.08.2002 | ||
NL | 21.08.2002 | ||
DK | 21.11.2002 | ||
PT | 05.12.2002 | ||
Former [2003/31] | AT | 21.08.2002 | |
CH | 21.08.2002 | ||
GR | 21.08.2002 | ||
LI | 21.08.2002 | ||
NL | 21.08.2002 | ||
PT | 05.12.2002 | ||
Former [2003/22] | GR | 21.08.2002 | |
NL | 21.08.2002 | ||
PT | 05.12.2002 | ||
Former [2003/20] | GR | 21.08.2002 | |
NL | 21.08.2002 | ||
Former [2003/09] | NL | 21.08.2002 | Cited in | International search | [A]FR1303251 (GONTHIER) [A] 1,7 * figures 3-9 *; | [A]FR2486583 (SOUCHIER GEORGES [FR]) |